New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Kathryn C Ferguson
Case #: 3:15-ap-02170
Nature of Suit71 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - imposition of stay
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2015
Terminated:Apr 22, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
WELLS FARGO BANK HOME MTG
Phelan Hallinan & Schmieg, PC 400 Fellowship Road Suite 100
Mt. Laurel, NJ 08054
Represented By
WELLS FARGO BANK HOME MTG
contact info
Plaintiff
Gervasio Aquino
14 Ruppert Dr
Somerset, NJ 08873
Represented By
Edward Hanratty
Edward Hanratty, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Sunday, April 24, 2016
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 04/25 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/24/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
13 13 order To Close Case Fri 04/22 10:53 AM
Order to Close Case (Case Number: 3:15-ap-2170). Reason: Dismissed for Lack of Prosecution. Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/22/2016 (fed)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Gervasio Aquino
utility Close Adversary Case Fri 04/22 11:07 AM
Adversary Case (3:15-ap-2170) Closed. (fed)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 12, 2016
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 03/13 4:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 03/12/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2016
11 11 order File Settlement Documents Thu 03/10 2:03 PM
Order to File Settlement Documents. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/9/2016. Stipulation of Settlement Deadline is 4/11/2016. (fed)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2016
court Hearing Held Tue 03/08 3:36 PM
Minute of 3/8/2016, OUTCOME: SETTLED Related [+] (ghm )
Related: [-] 7 Mediation Order
Wednesday, February 24, 2016
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Wed 02/24 2:29 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 2/23/2016. Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 3/8/2016 at 02:00 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (ghm)
Related: [-] 7 Mediation Order. Nona Ostrove added to the case. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/16/2015. Status hearing to be held on 2/23/2016 at 02:00 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (slf)
Wednesday, December 23, 2015
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 12/24 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/23/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 12/24 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/23/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2015
8 8 order Joint Scheduling Order Mon 12/21 8:01 AM
Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/16/2015. Discovery due by 3/1/2016. Trial date set for 9/15/2016 at 10:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (slf)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Mediation Order Mon 12/21 8:00 AM
Mediation Order. Nona Ostrove added to the case. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/16/2015. Status hearing to be held on 2/23/2016 at 02:00 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (slf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 15, 2015
court Hearing Held Tue 12/15 2:16 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Mediation Order and Joint Scheduling Order Submitted Related [+] (ghm) Modified on 12/15/2015 (ghm)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Gervasio Aquino for Service on WELLS FARGO BANK HOME MTG Answer due on 10/15/2015 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/15/2015 at 02:00 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Pre-Trial Instructions, Mediation Order, Joint Scheduling Order) (srm)
Thursday, October 15, 2015
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/15 3:01 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Barbara K. Hager on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK HOME MTG. (Hager, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2015
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 10/13 2:45 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Barbara K. Hager on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK HOME MTG. (Hager, Barbara)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 10/13 1:47 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Barbara K. Hager on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK HOME MTG. (Hager, Barbara) Modified on 10/13/2015 (Gilmore, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2015
3 3 misc Support Mon 09/21 9:43 AM
complaint in support of Related [+] filed by Edward Hanratty on behalf of Gervasio Aquino. (Hanratty, Edward)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Gervasio Aquino
Wednesday, September 16, 2015
court Notice of Docketing Error Wed 09/16 9:41 AM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing Related [+]. Type of Error: COMPLAINT IS MISSING /S/ SIGNATURE, filed by Edward Hanratty. Please correct and refile AS A SUPPORT with the court. (mmf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Gervasio Aquino
Tuesday, September 15, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 09/15 2:36 PM
Summons Issued to Gervasio Aquino for Service on WELLS FARGO BANK HOME MTG Answer due on 10/15/2015 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/15/2015 at 02:00 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (srm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre-Trial Instructions, Mediation Order, Joint Scheduling Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/15 9:26 AM
Adversary case 15-02170 Complaint by Gervasio Aquino against WELLS FARGO BANK HOME MTG. Fee Amount $ 350.. (71 (Injunctive relief - reinstatement of stay)) (Hanratty, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Tue 09/15 9:30 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 15-02170 KCF) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number WAIVED, fee amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (las)
Related: [-] Doc#1