California Central District Court
Judge:John A Kronstadt
Referred: Michael R Wilner
Case #: 2:15-cv-06676
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause31:3731 Fraud
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2015
Terminated:Mar 02, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Feb 28, 2016 4:08 AM PST
Defendant
CBS Radio, Inc.
Defendant
Dennis Hof
Defendant
KROQ
Defendant
Moonlight Bunny Ranch
Plaintiff
Gregory Ackers
503 W Olympic Blvd.
Santa Monica, CA 90401


Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Thursday, March 17, 2016
14 14 misc Mail Returned Fri 03/18 8:49 AM
Mail Returned addressed to Gregory Ackers re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Terminated Case13 (pso)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 03/03 8:29 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING CASE (DKT. 6 ,12 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt:Plaintiff has not paid the fee required for the filing of the Complaint. Accordingly, the Court orders this case DISMISSED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (ah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2016
12 12 1 pgs appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Wed 02/24 1:56 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,7 filed by Gregory Ackers. CCA # 15-56542 This appeal is dismissed for failure to pay the docketing/filing fees in this case. This order served on the district court shall constitute the mandate of this court. (mat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2016
11 11 2 pgs appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Wed 01/27 4:28 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,7 filed by Gregory Ackers. CCA # 15-56542 Appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, including the addendum thereto, is denied because we find that the appeal is frivolous. If appellant wishes to pursue this appeal despite the court's finding that it is frivolous then, within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay $505.00 to the district court as the docketing and filing fees for this appeal and file proof of payment with this court. Otherwise, the appeal will be dismissed by the Clerk for failure to prosecute, regardless of further filings. [See document for all details] (mat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2015
10 10 9 pgs appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Thu 10/08 2:48 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,7 filed by Gregory Ackers. CCA # 15-56542 A review of the docket reflects that appellant has not paid the docketing and filing fees for this appeal. Within 21 days from the date of this order, appellant shall: [See document] If appellant fails to comply with this order, this appeal will be dismissed automatically by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. [See document for all details] (mat)
Related: [-]
9 9 appeal 9th CCA Assigned Case Number Notice Thu 10/08 8:34 AM
NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-56542 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,7 as to Plaintiff Gregory Ackers. (mat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2015
8 8 appeal Filing Fee Letter (A-15CV) Tue 10/06 4:07 PM
FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Plaintiff Gregory Ackers, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,7 (mat)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Form-Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis.
Monday, October 05, 2015
7 7 appeal Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Tue 10/06 4:04 PM
Motion to Appeal in 9th Circuit for Supervisory Writ filed by Plaintiff Gregory Ackers. Appeal of Order on Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)5 Filed On: 9/17/15; Entered On: 9/17/15; Filing fee $ 505 billed. (mat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2015
6 6 testxtonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 09/17 12:56 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF TO PAY FILING FEE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: On September 17, 2015, the Court denied the Plaintiff's request to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Dkt.5 . In light of the denial, Plaintiff shall pay the fee associated with the filing of this action by no later than October 8, 2015. A failure to pay the fee will result in the dismissal of this action. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pso) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Related: [-]
5 5 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Thu 09/17 12:52 PM
ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: DENYING2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (pso)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2015
reportrecommend Report and Recommendation (Miscellaneous) Tue 09/15 9:44 AM
RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval. Re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support2 . (vm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2015
4 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa)
Related: [-]
2 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Gregory Ackers. (esa)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against defendants CBS Radio, Inc., Dennis Hof, KROQ, Moonlight Bunny Ranch.Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Micahel R Wilner, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Gregory Ackers. [NO CV30] (esa)
Related: [-]