Connecticut District Court
Judge:Michael P Shea
Referred: Donna F Martinez
Case #: 3:15-cv-01379
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2015
Terminated:Sep 30, 2020
Last checked: Monday Mar 14, 2016 9:49 AM EDT
Defendant
Gerard I. Adelman
Defendant
Judicial Branch
Defendant
Hunt Leibert Jacobson PC
Defendant
Green & Gross, P.C.
Defendant
Jonathan P. Whitcomb
Defendant
George N. Thim
Defendant
State of Connecticut Judicial Branch
Defendant
Benjamin T. Staskiewicz
Defendant
Thomas G. Smith
Defendant
Judith Rossi
Defendant
Chase T. Rogers
Defendant
Portanova and Rutigliano, P.C.
Defendant
Daniel D. Portanova
Defendant
Sandra Lugo Gines
Defendant
Jason T. Lovallo
Defendant
Martin R. Libbin
Defendant
Corinne L. Klatt
Defendant
Barbara N. Bellis
Defendant
Patrick L. Carroll, III.
Defendant
Mark J. Ciarciello
Defendant
Diserio Martin O'Connor & Castiglioni LLP
Defendant
J. Doe
Defendant
Doe Insurance Company
Defendant
Christopher T. Goulden
Defendant
Elizabeth K. Graham
Defendant
Green And Gross, P.C.
Defendant
Eric M. Gross
Defendant
Hunt Leibert Jacobson, P.C.
Defendant
Daniel Irace
Defendant
Alfred J. Jennings
Defendant
Larracuente & Goulden, LLC
Plaintiff
Daniel M. Lynch
P.O. Box 40
Trumbull, CT 06611

GPO Aug 07 2019
ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the attached, Lynch's claims under the ADA and the Rehabilitation Act stemming from the dissolution action and the collection action are DISMISSED. Lynch's sole remaining claims are his claims under the ADA and the Rehabilitation Act stemming from the foreclosure action and the small claims action. Lynch's other state and federal claims are also DISMISSED. The Judicial Branch's 63 motion to strike is DENIED. Lynch's 65 motion to stay is DENIED as moot because the case is no longer assigned to Judge Covello. As noted, the parties shall within 14 days submit a memorandum of no more than five double-spaced pages providing an update on the status of the foreclosure action.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/7/2019. (Karpman, Michael)
GPO Sep 30 2020
For the reasons stated in the attached ruling, I hereby GRANT Defendant's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 105). The Clerk is directed to close this case.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/30/2020. (Super, John) Modified on 10/5/2020 to mark as an opinion (Pesta, J.).

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
133 133 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 03/04 4:33 PM
MANDATE of USCA dated 03/02/2021; Dismissing131 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel M. Lynch,130 Notice of Appeal, filed by Daniel M. Lynch (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]