New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:15-cv-07299
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause05:8705 Declaratory Judgment - Insurance
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2015
Last checked: Monday Mar 14, 2016 7:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Cindy Gaston
13 Halsey Street
Brooklyn, NY 11216
Represented By
Stuart R. Wolk
Wolk,neuman,maziara & Lanzet
contact info
Defendant
Elizabeth McQuail
989 Wilson Avenue
Teaneck, NJ 07666
Defendant
Madeline McQuail
989 Wilson Avenue
Teaneck, NJ 07666
Defendant
Richard McQuail
989 Wilson Avenue
Teaneck, NJ 07666
Defendant
Dezmon Sardina
712 Salem Street
Teaneck, NJ 07666
Plaintiff
Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic
175 Berkeley Street
Boston, MA 02116
Represented By
William Douglas Deveau
Connell Foley LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, October 10, 2016
41 41 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 10/10 3:21 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Cindy Gaston and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic.(Deveau, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2016
40 40 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/10 12:03 PM
REVISED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is not to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 7/13/2016. Joinder of Parties due by 7/13/2016. Expert Deposition due by 12/30/2016. All Discovery due by 12/30/2016. The Magistrate Judge assigned to this case is the Hon. James L. Cott. Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/9/2016) (kko)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc Letter Mon 05/09 1:01 PM
PROPOSED LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from William D. Deveau dated 05/09/2016 re: Initial Rule 16 Conference. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic.(Deveau, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Revised Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Prder
Tuesday, April 26, 2016
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 04/27 3:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/26/2016. Plaintiff's counsel present. Counsel for Defendant Cindy Gaston present. Counsel for Defendants Dezmon Sardina, Elizabeth McQuail, Madeline McQuail, and Richard McQuiail did not appear. Status conference scheduled for January 4, 2017, at 10:00 am. (Status Conference set for 1/4/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Court Reporter Eve Giniger) (jar)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2016
38 38 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/25 2:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Cindy Gaston.(Nemerov, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
37 37 discov Rule 26 Disclosure Mon 04/25 1:43 PM
RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Cindy Gaston.(Nemerov, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2016
36 36 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 03/21 6:21 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, on April 26, 2016 at 11:30 am, at the United States Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, Courtroom 619, New York, New York 10007. (Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2016 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 619, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Scheduling Conference set for 4/26/2016 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 619, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Edgardo Ramos.)(mt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2016
35 35 discov Rule 26 Disclosure Tue 03/08 11:50 AM
RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic.(Deveau, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Rule 26 Disclosures
Tuesday, January 05, 2016
34 34 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/05 10:40 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Cindy Gaston.(Wolk, Stuart)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/05 10:37 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart R. Wolk on behalf of Cindy Gaston. (Wolk, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2015
32 32 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 12/16 6:55 PM
ORDER granting31 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. The application is granted. Defendant Cindy Gaston's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to January 8, 2016. (Cindy Gaston answer due 1/8/2016) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 15, 2015
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 12/15 2:08 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Jeffrey Lanzet dated 12 15-2015 Document filed by Cindy Gaston. Return Date set for 1/8/2016 at 01:00 PM.(Wolk, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2015
minutes Pre-Motion Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 12/03 2:27 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Pre-Motion Conference held on 12/3/2015. Plaintiff's counsel present. Defendant Cindy Gaston's counsel present. Defendant granted leave to file a motion to dismiss with the following briefing schedule: moving papers due January 8, 2016; opposition due January 22, 2016; reply due January 29, 2016. (Motions due by 1/8/2016. Responses due by 1/22/2016. Replies due by 1/29/2016.) (Court Reporter Ellen Ford) (jar)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2015
30 30 service Certificate of Service Complaints Fri 11/20 2:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Dezmon Sardina served on 11/11/2015, answer due 12/2/2015. Service was accepted by Dezmon Sardina. Document filed by Dezmon Sardina. (Deveau, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2015
29 29 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 11/19 12:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Madeline McQuail served on 9/30/2015, answer due 10/21/2015. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Madeline McQuail. (Deveau, William)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 11/19 12:48 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Elizabeth McQuail served on 9/30/2015, answer due 10/21/2015. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Elizabeth McQuail. (Deveau, William)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 11/19 12:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Richard McQuail served on 9/30/2015, answer due 10/21/2015. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic. (Deveau, William)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 11/19 12:46 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Cindy Gaston served on 9/30/2015, answer due 10/21/2015. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic. (Deveau, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2015
25 25 misc Letter Wed 11/18 1:06 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from William D. Deveau dated November 18, 2015 re: Response to application for pre-motion conference. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic.(Deveau, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2015
24 24 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 11/09 4:26 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:21 Letter filed by Cindy Gaston. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. A pre-motion conference is scheduled for Thursday, December 3, 2015 at 12:00 pm. Plaintiff is directed to submit a written response not longer than 3 pages by 5:00 pm, November 19, 2015. ( Pre-Motion Conference set for 12/3/2015 at 12:00 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/9/2015) (mro)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 08, 2015
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Sun 11/08 9:53 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart R. Wolk on behalf of Cindy Gaston. (Wolk, Stuart)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Sun 11/08 9:51 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart R. Wolk on behalf of Cindy Gaston. (Wolk, Stuart)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Letter Sun 11/08 9:48 AM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Stuart R. Wolk dated 11/4/15 re: Request for Pre Motion Conference. Document filed by Cindy Gaston.(Wolk, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2015
20 20 service Amended Summons Issued Fri 10/23 12:30 PM
ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cindy Gaston. (cde)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2015
19 19 service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Thu 10/22 4:47 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Cindy Gaston, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic. (Deveau, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2015
18 18 service Summons Issued Tue 10/06 10:11 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dezmon Sardina. (moh)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2015
17 17 service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Mon 10/05 10:56 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Dezmon Sardina, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic. (Deveau, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2015
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 10/02 3:44 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney to RE-FILE Document No. 16 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): This is not an Amended Summons form. Get the word AMENDED next to SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION and re file using request for issuance of Amended summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2015
16 16 service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Wed 09/30 11:21 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED IS NOT AN AMENDED SUMMONS - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Dezmon Sardina, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic. (Deveau, William) Modified on 10/2/2015 (dgo).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2015
15 15 service Summons Issued Tue 09/22 11:27 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cindy Gaston. (pc)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Tue 09/22 11:26 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard McQuail. (pc)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Tue 09/22 11:26 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Madeline McQuail. (pc)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Tue 09/22 11:25 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elizabeth McQuail. (pc)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Tue 09/22 11:25 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dezmon Sardina. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2015
10 10 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/21 1:47 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. for Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic.(Deveau, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2015
9 9 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 09/18 11:23 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cindy Gaston, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic. (Deveau, William)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 09/18 11:22 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Richard McQuail, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic. (Deveau, William)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 09/18 11:19 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Madeline McQuail, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic. (Deveau, William)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 09/18 11:16 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Elizabeth McQuail, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic. (Deveau, William)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 09/18 11:12 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dezmon Sardina, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Dezmon Sardina. (Deveau, William)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error Fri 09/18 9:58 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney William Douglas Deveau to RE-FILE Document 4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2015
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 09/17 4:03 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (dgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 09/17 4:04 PM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. (dgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 09/17 4:04 PM
Case Designated ECF. (dgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 09/17 4:06 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons must be requested separately. Each filed under its own event;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2015
4 4 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic.(Deveau, William) Modified on 9/18/2015 (lb).
Related: [-]
3 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED FOR ALL PARTIES - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dezmon Sardina, Elizabeth McQuail, Richard McQuail, Madeline McQuail, Cindy Gaston, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic. (Deveau, William) Modified on 9/17/2015 (dgo).
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Deveau, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Cindy Gaston, Elizabeth McQuail, Madeline McQuail, Richard McQuail, Dezmon Sardina. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11393102)Document filed by Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic.(Deveau, William)
Related: [-]