Independence Air, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:05-bk-20012 |
Case Filed: | Nov 07, 2005 |
Terminated: | Mar 17, 2011 |
Debtor
Independence Air, Inc.
45200 Business Court
Dulles, VA 20166 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago |
Thursday, March 17, 2011 | ||
Bankruptcy Case Closed (MEB) | ||
Wednesday, March 16, 2011 | ||
5 | 5 Final Decree and Order (I) Closing The Chapter 11 Cases and (II) (A) Authorizing The Distribution Trust and The Post- Confirmation Debtors to Abandon and Destroy all of the Books and Records of The Debtors and The Post- Confirmation Debtors, (B) Terminating The Services of The Claims and Noticing Agent Appointed in the Chapter 11 Cases and (C) Granting Certain Related Relief Signed on 3/15/2011. (NAB) | |
Tuesday, November 08, 2005 | ||
4 | 4 Order Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases; 05-20011 05-20012 05-20013 05-20014 05-20015 05-20016 and 05-20017 An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of FLYi, Inc.; Independence Air, Inc.; Atlantic Coast Jet, LLC; Atlantic Coast Academy, Inc.; IA Sub, Inc.; WaKeeney, Inc.; and Atlantic Coast Airlines, Inc. The docket of FLYi, Inc. in Case No. 05-20011 (MFW) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed in Court on 11/7/2005. (LCN, ) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Monday, November 07, 2005 | ||
3 | 3 List of Creditors Filed by Independence Air, Inc. (Cleary, M. Blake) | |
2 | 2 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 05-20012 [misc,volp11a] (1039.00). Receipt Number 2314984, amount $1039.00. (U.S. Treasury) | |
1 | 1 18 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1039. Filed by Independence Air, Inc.. (Shannon, Brendan) | |
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case (GVW, ) |