In re: Motor Fuel Temperature, et al
Original Case: 2:07-md-01840
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:15-cv-03221 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 22, 2017 2:31 AM MDT |
Defendant
BP CORPORATION NORTH AMERICA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CASEY'S GENERAL STORE, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CHEVRON USA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CITGO PETROLEUM CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CONOCO PHILLIPS COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SINCLAIR OIL CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
VALERO MARKETING AND SUPPLY COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EZ MART STORES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SUNOCO CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SHELL OIL PRODUCTS COMPANY, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TESORO REFINING AND MARKETING COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SAM'S CLUB
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LOVE'S TRAVEL STOP & COUNTRY STORES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THORNTONS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
G AND M OIL COMPANY, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UNITED EL SEGUNDO, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WORLD OIL CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
M.M. FOLWER, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
B-B OIL COMPANY, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
COULSON OIL COMPANY, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PORT CITIES OIL LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FLASH MARKET, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J&P FLASH, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DANSK INVESTMENT GROUP, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DIAMOND STATE OIL, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MAGNESS OIL COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PORT CITIES OIL, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EQUILON ENTERPRISES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MOTIVA ENTERPRISES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
CIRCLE K STORES, INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
KUM&GO, L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
QUICKTRIP CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
MURPHY OIL USA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
RACE TRAC PETROLEUM, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
MARATHON PETROLEUM COMPANY, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
THE PANTRY, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
SPEEDWAY SUPERAMERICA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
SHEETZ, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
WAWA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
FLYING J INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
7-ELEVEN, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
PTCAA TEXAS, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
CIRCLE K STORES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CHEVRON USA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CASEY'S GENERAL STORES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
SINCLAIR OIL CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ESSO VIRGIN ISLANDS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MOBIL OIL GUAM, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CONOCO PHILLIPS COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant Third-Party Defendant
MOTIVA ENTERPRISES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
IN RE: MOTOR FUEL TEMPERATURE SALES PRACTICES LITIGATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
ZACHARY WILSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
MATHEW COOK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
BRENT DONALDSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
SAMANTHA BAYLARD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CRAIG MASSEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
RICHARD GALAUSKI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
WILLIAM BOYD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
LISA MCBRIDE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
TAMARA MILLER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
HEARTLAND LANDSCAPE GROUP LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
TEAM TRUCKING
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JAMES ANLIKER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
DENNIS K. MANN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
PHYLLIS LERNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
HERB GLASER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
STEVEN RUBIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
MAX CANDIOTTY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
FRED AGUIRRE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JAMES JARVAIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
MARA REDSTONE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
RAPHAEL SAGALYN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
J.C. WASH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JEAN W. NEESE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CECIL R. WILKINS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
WAYNE BYRAM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
GARY KOHUT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
DEBRA BERG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
TIA GOMEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
SHONNA S. BUTLER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
BEN DOZIER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
MARK SCIVNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
BARBARA CUMBO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JAMES GRAHAM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
KENNEDY G. KRAATZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
MELISSA D. MURRAY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
MICHAEL A. WARNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CLINTON J. DAVIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
STEVEN R. RUTHERFORD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
LISA ANN LEE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
BRENT CRAWFORD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
DIXCEE MILLSAP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CARL RITTERHOUSE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
SAMUEL ELY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
VICTOR RUYBALID
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
HADLEY BOWER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
KRISTY DEANN MOTT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CHARLES COCKRELL, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
WILLIAM RUTTHERFORD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JAN RUTHERFORD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
MARK WYATT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
DAWN LALOR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
GERALD PANTO, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
EDGER PAZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CHARLES D. JONES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
MICHAEL GAUTHREAUX
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JOANN KORLESKI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JEFF JENKINS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
SARA TERRY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JACOB STEED
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
MARVIN BRYAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JOHN TELLES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CHRISTOPHER PAYNE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
SCOTT CAMPBELL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JONATHAN CHARLES CONLIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
PRISCILLA CRAFT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
ROBERT HICKS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
RICHARD PATRICK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JESSICA HONIGBERG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
RAYSHAUN GLANTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
GARLAND WILLIAMS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
ANNIE SMITH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
BOBBY ROBERSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
SAM HOTCHKISS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
ANNA LEGATES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
ANDREA FRAYSER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
MELVIN ELLISON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CECIL WILKINS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
BETTY CHERRY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JOY HOWELL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
ALLEN RAY KLEIN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/22/2017 2:31 AM MDT |
Friday, September 18, 2015 | ||
![]() |