Jorge Dell'Aquila et al v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:15-cv-01525 |
Nature of Suit | 355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Sep 21, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 11, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 19, 2016 7:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
|
|
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Volkswagen of America, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Jorge Dell'Aquila
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carrie Ullmer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, December 11, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Transferring Case
Fri 12/11 2:45 PM
TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multi Litigation, MDL 2672, that the action is transferred to USDC, Northern District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to Honorable Charles R. Breyer for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lwag) |
|
Friday, November 13, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Case Stayed
Fri 11/13 10:52 AM
ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING DECISION BY UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION by Judge David O. Carter. (See document for details). Case stayed. (dgo) |
|
Monday, November 09, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
attorney
Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06)
Mon 11/09 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Richard E Donahoo counsel for Plaintiffs Jorge Dell'Aquila, Carrie Ullmer. Changing Firm Name to Donahoo & Associates, PC. Filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Dell'Aquila and Carrie Ullmer, et al.. (Donahoo, Richard) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 10/26 6:17 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., identifying Volkswagen AG. (Marmolejo, Matthew) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Related Case(s)
Mon 10/26 6:15 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. Related Case(s): 5:15-cv-1930-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07390-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-7375-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07432-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07391-DOC-SP, 5:15-cv-01948-DOC-SP, 5:15-cv-02024-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07431-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07429-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07430-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07563-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07475-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07394-MMM-SP, 2:15-cv-07473-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07474-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07615-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07477-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07517-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07560-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-7395-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-7367-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07566-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07604-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07570-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07605-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07688-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07637-DOC-SP, 8:15-cv-01554-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07629-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07650-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07655-DOC-SP, 8:15-cv-01571-DOC-KES, 2:15-cv-07564-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07716-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07741-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07997-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07962-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-08016-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-08126-DOC-SP, 5:15-cv-02152-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-08228-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-08259-DOC-SP, 5:15-cv-02140-DOC-SP (Marmolejo, Matthew) |
|
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 10/26 6:12 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. answer now due 11/30/2015, re Amended Complaint/Petition,9 filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc..(Attorney Matthew Henry Marmolejo added to party Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Marmolejo, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 29, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Tue 09/29 5:04 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Dell'Aquila, Carrie Ullmer(Donahoo, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to First Amended Complaint | ||
Tuesday, September 22, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 09/22 4:05 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 09/22 10:50 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., and Volkswagen of America, Inc. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 09/22 10:45 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 09/22 10:42 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) |
|
Monday, September 21, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 09/21 7:17 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Dell'Aquila, Carrie Ullmer, (Donahoo, Richard) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Mon 09/21 7:15 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Dell'Aquila, Carrie Ullmer. (Donahoo, Richard) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 09/21 7:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Dell'Aquila, Carrie Ullmer. (Donahoo, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 09/21 7:12 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16483481 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Dell'Aquila, Carrie Ullmer. (Attorney Richard E Donahoo added to party Jorge Dell'Aquila(pty:pla), Attorney Richard E Donahoo added to party Carrie Ullmer(pty:pla))(Donahoo, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Class Action Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Class Action Complaint |