Nevada District Court
Judge:James C Mahan
Referred: Cam Ferenbach
Case #: 2:15-cv-01821
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2015
Terminated:Jul 11, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Mar 20, 2016 6:53 AM PDT
Defendant
Lieutenant Dennis Flynn
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Sergeant Roderick Hunt
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Officer Silva
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Detective Jeffrey Tabor
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Willis Sylva
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Plaintiff
Westley McNeal
Represented By
Cal J. Potter, IV
contact info
Cal J. Potter, III
Potter Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
Courtney Rogalski
Represented By
Cal J. Potter, IV
contact info
Cal J. Potter, III
Potter Law Offices
contact info

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, July 11, 2018
47 47 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Case Wed 07/11 11:28 AM
ORDER granting46 Stipulation with prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
46 46 motion Stipulation Tue 07/10 11:21 AM
STIPULATION and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Anderson, Craig)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 05, 2018
45 45 notice Notice Other Tue 06/05 10:29 AM
NOTICE re: Settlement; filed by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Anderson, Craig)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 08, 2018
44 44 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 05/08 3:59 PM
ORDER granting43 Motion to Remove Attorney Brianna Smith from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Related: [-]
43 43 motion Motion Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List Tue 05/08 7:55 AM
MOTION to remove attorney Brianna Smith from the Electronic Service List in this case by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Anderson, Craig)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 07, 2018
42 42 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/07 2:14 PM
ORDER that the parties shall file a joint status report within thirty (30) days of the date of this order indicating the status of the current action. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2017
41 41 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/03 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mitchell S Bisson on behalf of Plaintiff Westley McNeal. (Bisson, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2017
40 40 order Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Tue 08/08 11:35 AM
ORDER that25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2017
39 39 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 05/15 1:33 PM
REPLY to Response to25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Dennis Flynn, Roderick Hunt, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Willis Sylva, Jeffrey Tabor. (Smith, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
38 38 order Order on Stipulation Tue 05/02 2:48 PM
ORDER re37 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Reply re25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Replies due by 5/15/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2017
37 37 motion Stipulation Mon 05/01 2:37 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re35 Response to Motion,25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ; by Defendants Dennis Flynn, Roderick Hunt, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Willis Sylva, Jeffrey Tabor. (Smith, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2017
36 36 misc Errata Fri 04/21 4:29 PM
ERRATA to35 Response to Motion ; filed by Plaintiffs Westley McNeal, Courtney Rogalski.(Potter, Cal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Wednesday, April 19, 2017
35 35 respm Response to Motion Wed 04/19 8:46 PM
RESPONSE to25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiffs Westley McNeal, Courtney Rogalski. Replies due by 5/3/2017.(Potter, Cal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Tuesday, April 18, 2017
34 34 order Order on Stipulation Tue 04/18 1:29 PM
ORDER Granting33 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) to Respond re25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 4/19/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Stipulation Tue 04/18 11:03 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ; by Plaintiffs Westley McNeal, Courtney Rogalski. (Potter, Cal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2017
32 32 order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/12 4:54 PM
ORDER Granting31 Stipulation to Extend Response re25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Related [+] Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-] sponses due by 4/18/2017.
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
31 31 motion Stipulation Tue 04/11 1:57 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ; by Plaintiffs Westley McNeal, Courtney Rogalski. (Potter, Cal)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2017
30 30 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Tue 03/28 11:13 AM
ORDER Granting24 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2017
29 29 order Order on Stipulation Fri 03/17 4:01 PM
ORDER Granting28 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond re25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 4/11/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2017
28 28 motion Stipulation Thu 03/16 2:24 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ; by Plaintiffs Westley McNeal, Courtney Rogalski. (Potter, Cal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
27 27 misc Appendix Tue 02/28 3:13 PM
APPENDIX Volume 2 of Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment to25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ; filed by Defendants Dennis Flynn, Roderick Hunt, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Willis Sylva, Jeffrey Tabor.(Smith, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit D,
Att: 2 Exhibit E,
Att: 3 Exhibit F-G,
Att: 4 Exhibit H,
Att: 5 Exhibit I-K
26 26 misc Appendix Tue 02/28 3:09 PM
APPENDIX Volume 1 of Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment to25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ; filed by Defendants Dennis Flynn, Roderick Hunt, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Willis Sylva, Jeffrey Tabor.(Smith, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-1,
Att: 4 Exhibit C-2
25 25 motion Partial Summary Judgment Tue 02/28 3:06 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendants Dennis Flynn, Roderick Hunt, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Willis Sylva, Jeffrey Tabor. Responses due by 3/21/2017. (Smith, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2017
24 24 motion File Excess Pages Mon 02/27 10:06 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Dennis Flynn, Roderick Hunt, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Willis Sylva, Jeffrey Tabor. (Smith, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
23 23 order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls) Wed 01/18 2:32 PM
ORDER Granting22 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re Discovery. Motions due by 2/28/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Stipulation re Discovery Matters Fri 01/13 1:37 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) [Proposed] Stipulation and Order to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline (First Request) by Defendants Dennis Flynn, Roderick Hunt, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Willis Sylva, Jeffrey Tabor. (Smith, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2016
21 21 order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls) Mon 06/13 2:06 PM
ORDER Granting20 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 12/28/2016, Motions due by 1/26/2017, Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/10/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Stipulation re Discovery Matters Fri 06/10 1:54 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re Discovery Deadlines by Defendants Dennis Flynn, Roderick Hunt, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Silva, Willis Sylva, Jeffrey Tabor. (Smith, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2016
19 19 order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls) Mon 03/28 9:16 AM
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting18 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines (First Request). Discovery due by 9/29/2016. Motions due by 10/28/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/28/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 03/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Stipulation Fri 03/25 12:57 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Extend Discovery by Plaintiffs Westley McNeal, Courtney Rogalski. (Potter, Cal)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2015
17 17 order Scheduling Order Tue 12/08 8:24 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER re16 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/1/2016. Motions due by 7/1/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/7/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2015
16 16 misc Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order Fri 12/04 5:00 PM
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs Westley McNeal, Courtney Rogalski Special Scheduling Review Requested . (Potter, Cal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2015
15 15 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Tue 11/03 2:59 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Westley McNeal, Courtney Rogalski. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Potter, Cal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2015
14 14 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 10/21 1:35 PM
ANSWER to10 Amended Complaint, filed by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/31/2015. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/5/2015.(Anderson, Craig)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 08, 2015
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/08 12:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westley McNeal, Courtney Rogalski re12 Summons Issued. Roderick Hunt served on 10/6/2015, answer due 10/27/2015; Silva served on 10/5/2015, answer due 10/26/2015.(Potter, Cal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Friday, October 02, 2015
12 12 service Summons Issued Fri 10/02 2:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Roderick Hunt, Willis Sylva. (MMM)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Proposed Summons to be issued Fri 10/02 12:59 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Westley McNeal, Courtney Rogalski.(Potter, Cal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/02 12:52 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Dennis Flynn, Roderick Hunt, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Silva, Jeffrey Tabor, filed by Courtney Rogalski, Westley McNeal. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 1/30/2016. (Potter, Cal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2015
9 9 order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls) Fri 10/02 9:35 AM
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting8 STIPULATION to Amend Complaint. Amended Complaint deadline: 10/18/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2015
8 8 motion Stipulation Wed 09/30 3:50 PM
STIPULATION to Amend re:1 Amended Complaint; filed by Plaintiffs Westley McNeal, Courtney Rogalski.(Potter, Cal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Second Amended Complaint
Friday, September 25, 2015
7 7 misc Statement in Removal Case Fri 09/25 8:51 AM
STATEMENT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Anderson, Craig)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2015
6 6 service Certificate of Service Thu 09/24 10:04 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for3 Minute Order re Removal, by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Anderson, Craig)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2015
5 5 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Wed 09/23 9:08 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Anderson, Craig)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Jury Demand Wed 09/23 9:07 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Anderson, Craig)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2015
3 3 minord Minute Order re Removal - FORM Tue 09/22 5:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 9/22/2015. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/10/2015. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notices re AO 85 Consent to Mag & Gen Order 2013-1 Short Trial Rules Tue 09/22 5:08 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (MMM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Removal Tue 09/22 3:30 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-15-723298-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-3825340), filed by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. Proof of service due by 12/26/2015. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/2/2015. (Anderson, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 09/22 5:08 PM
Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MMM)
Related: [-]