Original Case: 3:15-cv-01159

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:15-cv-16878
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2015
Terminated:Jan 27, 2016
Last checked: Thursday Jan 28, 2016 3:15 AM PST
Defendant - Appellee
LYFT, INC.
Represented By
Albert Giang
Caldwell Leslie & Proctor PC
contact info
Christopher G. Caldwell
Caldwell Leslie & Proctor PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CASEY LOEWEN
Represented By
John M. Bickford
R. Rex Parris Law Firm
contact info
Alexander R. Wheeler
R. Rex Parris Law Firm
contact info
R. Rex Parris
R. Rex Parris Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JONATHAN WRIGHT
Represented By
John M. Bickford
R. Rex Parris Law Firm
contact info
Alexander R. Wheeler
R. Rex Parris Law Firm
contact info
R. Rex Parris
R. Rex Parris Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/28/2016 2:51 AM PST
Tuesday, September 22, 2015
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/29/2015. Transcript ordered by 10/21/2015. Transcript due 11/20/2015. Appellants Casey Loewen and Jonathan Wright opening brief due 12/30/2015. Appellee Lyft, Inc. answering brief due 01/29/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9691246] (SML) [Entered: 09/22/2015 08:43 AM]
Related: [-]