Rhode Island District Court
Judge:John J Mcconnell, Jr
Referred: Lincoln D Almond
Case #: 1:15-cv-00404
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2015
Terminated:Dec 01, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 22, 2016 9:37 AM EDT
Defendant
Health-Chem Diagnostics, LLC
Represented By
Stephen J. MacGillivray
Pierce Atwood, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PharmLogic, LLC
Represented By
Robert Clark Corrente
Whelan, Corrente, Kinder & Siket LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago
Tuesday, December 01, 2015
order Order Tue 12/01 3:44 PM
TEXT ORDER entering9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PharmLogic, LLC - So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/1/2015. (Barletta, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2015
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 11/30 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PharmLogic, LLC (Corrente, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2015
order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 11/20 10:59 AM
TEXT ORDER entering8 Stipulation to extend time; Reset Deadlines: Health-Chem Diagnostics, LLC answer due 11/27/2015- So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/20/2015. (Barletta, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2015
8 8 misc Stipulation Thu 11/19 10:18 AM
STIPULATION SECOND STIPULATION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME by All Defendants. (MacGillivray, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2015
order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 11/03 12:53 PM
TEXT ORDER entering6 Stipulation to extend time to file answer; Reset Deadlines: Health-Chem Diagnostics, LLC answer due 11/20/2015.- So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/3/2015. (Barletta, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/02 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. MacGillivray on behalf of All Defendants (MacGillivray, Stephen)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Stipulation Mon 11/02 4:21 PM
STIPULATION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME by All Defendants. (MacGillivray, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2015
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 10/19 11:20 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by PharmLogic, LLC. Health-Chem Diagnostics, LLC served on 10/13/2015, answer due 11/3/2015. (Corrente, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2015
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 10/06 4:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Health-Chem Diagnostics, LLC. (McGuire, Vickie)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Request Tue 10/06 11:41 AM
Summons Request filed by PharmLogic, LLC. (Corrente, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2015
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 09/24 1:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Health-Chem Diagnostics, LLC. (Melendez, Filipa)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs cmp Complaint - New Case Thu 09/24 11:57 AM
COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-886490 ), filed by PharmLogic, LLC.(Corrente, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/24 1:07 PM
Case assigned to Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Melendez, Filipa)
Related: [-]