Hempton v. Pond5, Inc. et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Barbara J Rothstein |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-05696 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 26, 2016 2:00 AM PDT |
Defendant
Pond5 user ckennedy342
|
|
Defendant
Pond5, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mr Gordon Hempton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
82 | 82
appeal
Mandate of USCA
Wed 03/15 2:27 PM
MANDATE of USCA 17-35125 as to76 Notice of Appeal filed by Gordon Hempton. Pursuant to stipulation of the parties (docket #3), this appeal is voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own fees and costs. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. (CDA) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
81 | 81
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 03/13 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Settlement of All Claims by Defendant Pond5, Inc. (Feig, Curt) |