Missouri Western District Court
Case #: 2:15-cr-04054
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2015
Defendant
Ramelus D. Bradley
Plaintiff
USA

GPO May 30 2017
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Ramelus D. Bradley re 44 MOTION to suppress Evidence and Quash Search Warrants. Objections to R&R due by 6/13/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 5/30/2017 by Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth. (HDR) (Beaver, Cameron)
GPO Jun 14 2017
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS66. After an independent and careful review of the record, the applicable law, and the parties arguments, the Court OVERRULES Defendants objections 67, and ADOPTS Judge Whitworths Report and Recommendation 66. Defendants Motion to Quash Search Warrants and Suppress Evidence and Statements44is DENIED. Signed on 6/14/2017 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough.(Travis, Kendra)
GPO Oct 10 2017
ORDERED that the Court OVERRULES Defendant's objections (Doc. #78), and ADOPTS Judge Epps's Report and Recommendation (Doc. #77). Defendant's Motion for Franks Hearing, Disclosure and Production and Suggestions in Support (Doc. #71) is DENIED. Signed on 10/10/17 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough.(Diefenbach, Tracy)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.