Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Gregory A Presnell
Referred: Gregory J Kelly
Case #: 6:14-cv-01064
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2014
Terminated:Oct 13, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 14, 2016 12:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Healogics, Inc.
Plaintiff
Michelle Arnold
Represented By
Kevin J. Darken
The Barry A. Cohen Legal Team
contact info
Johnathan P. Seredynski
Milberg, LLP
contact info
J. Birt Reynolds
Milberg, LLP
contact info
Roland W. Riggs
Milberg, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Willie Arnold
Represented By
Kevin J. Darken
The Barry A. Cohen Legal Team
contact info
Johnathan P. Seredynski
Milberg, LLP
contact info
J. Birt Reynolds
Milberg, LLP
contact info
Roland W. Riggs
Milberg, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Lacy R. Harwell, Jr.
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info
Sara McLean
Us Department Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Katherine M. Ho
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info
Andy J. Mao
U.S. Dept. Of Justice
contact info
Michael D. Granston
Us Department Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Stephen Chartey Quarcoo
Us Department Of Justice
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 13, 2015
36 36 order Order on motion to dismiss Tue 10/13 4:39 PM
ORDER granting 34 motion to dismiss, dismissing case without prejudice, directing Clerk to close file. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/13/2015. (ED)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 08, 2015
35 35 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/08 6:39 PM
NOTICE by United States of America of consent re34 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss, without prejudice to the United States (Harwell, Lacy) Modified on 10/9/2015 (JET).
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Dismiss Thu 10/08 4:43 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily by Michelle Arnold, Willie Arnold.(Darken, Kevin) Modified on 10/9/2015 (JET).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, October 05, 2015
33 33 order Interested persons order Mon 10/05 11:28 AM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/19/2015. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/5/2015. Copies mailed.(LAM)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Related case order and track 2 notice Mon 10/05 11:27 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/19/2015. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/5/2015. Copies mailed.(LAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2015
29 29 order *Order pdf Thu 10/01 11:37 AM
ORDER that the complaint be unsealed and served upon the defendant by the relators; all other contents of the Court's file in this action remain under seal except for this Order and the Notice of the United States that it is not intervening at this time Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/30/2015. (MAL)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/01 11:30 AM
NOTICE of the United States that it is not Intervening at this time by United States of America (MAL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2015
Sealed Document S-27 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2015
Sealed Document S-25 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Sealed Document S-26 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 17, 2015
Sealed Document S-24 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 13, 2015
Sealed Document S-23 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 16, 2014
Sealed Document S-20 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Sealed Document S-21 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Sealed Document S-22 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 16, 2014
Sealed Document S-19 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 15, 2014
Sealed Document S-17 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Sealed Document S-18 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 12, 2014
Sealed Document S-16 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 10, 2014
Sealed Document S-14 (IGC).
Related: [-]
Sealed Document S-15 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 21, 2014
Sealed Document S-11 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Sealed Document S-12 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Sealed Document S-13 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Sealed Document S-30 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Sealed Document S-31 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 15, 2014
Sealed Document S-10 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 04, 2014
Sealed Document S-9 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 01, 2014
Sealed Document S-8 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 24, 2014
Sealed Document S-7 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 16, 2014
Sealed Document S-5 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Sealed Document S-6 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 07, 2014
Sealed Document S-4 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 01, 2014
1 1 COMPLAINT against Healogics, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by United States of America, Michelle Arnold, Willie Arnold. (Originally filed under seal; unsealed on 9/30/2015)(MAL)
Related: [-]
Sealed Document S-2 (IGC)
Related: [-]
Sealed Document S-3 (IGC)
Related: [-]