Kentucky Eastern District Court
Case #: 5:15-cr-00087
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2015
Defendant
Samuel A. Girod
Plaintiff
USA

GPO Jun 08 2016
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION as to Samuel A. Girod: The Court RECOMMENDS that the District Court DENY Dft's 45 MOTION in its entirety. Within 14 days after being served with a copy, any party may serve and file written objections. Parties should consult the statute and rule for specific appeal rights/mechanics. Failure to object in accordance with the Rule waives a party's right to review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert E. Wier on June 8, 2016. (AWD) cc: COR,USP,Dft via US Mail
GPO Jun 22 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as to Samuel A. Girod: Dft's 59 Motion in limine to exclude the opinion testimony of Dr. Jane E. Liedtka at trial is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on June 22, 2016.(AWD) cc: COR,USP,Dft via US Mail
GPO Jun 24 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as to Samuel A. Girod: (1) The 61 Recommended Disposition of US Magistrate Judge Robert E. Wier is ADOPTED and INCORPORATED by reference. (2) Dft's 65 Objections to Magistrate Wier's Recommended Disposition are OVERRULED. (3) Dft's 45 Motion to Dismiss and/or motion in limine is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on June 24, 2016. (AWD) cc: COR,USP,Dft via US Mail
GPO Jul 21 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as to Samuel A. Girod: (1) USA's 68 Motion in limine to exclude Dft's proposed expert testimony is GRANTED. Opinion testimony from the witnesses identified by Girod in his Expert Witness Notification will be excluded at trial. (2) USA's 67 Motion in limine to exclude evidence regarding Private Membership Associations as a defense is GRANTED. Inasmuch as the Dft seeks to present such evidence as a defense to his criminal conduct, it will be excluded at trial. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on July 21, 2016. (AWD) cc: COR,USP,Dft via US Mail
GPO Feb 27 2017
MEMORANDUM ORDER as to Samuel A. Girod: Dft's 111 Motion to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on February 27, 2017. (AWD) cc: COR,USM,USP,Dft via US Mail
GPO May 22 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER as to Samuel A. Girod: 1. Defendant/Movant Girod's 155 Motion to Vacate is DENIED. 2. This collateral proceeding is DISMISSED, with prejudice, and STRICKEN from the docket. 3. A Certificate of Appealability shall not issue. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/22/2019. (JJ)cc: COR,USM,USP,Pro Se Movant via US Mail
GPO Apr 21 2020
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Dft Girod's 162 Motion to Reduce Sentence is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/21/2020. (STC)cc: COR,USP and Samuel Girod by US Mail
GPO May 14 2020
MEMORANDUM ORDER as to Samuel A. Girod: 1) Dft's 170 MOTION to Appointment of Counsel is DENIED. 2) Dft's 169 MOTION for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED on the terms set forth in this Order. 3) W/in 28 days from this date, dft must pay $36.00 to the Clerk of the Court as an initial partial filing fee. 4) The Clerk of Court shall open an account in Dft Girod's name for receipt of the filing fee. Clerk to complete of Notice of Payment Form and serve a copy of this Order + Notice of Payment Form upon the Jailer/Warden of the institution in which Girod is currently confined and the USCCA. 4) Each month, Girod's custodian shall send the Clerk of the Court a payment in an amount equal to 20% of Girod's income for the preceding month out of his inmate trust fund account, but only if the amount in the account exceeds $10.00. 6) The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Court for the USCA for the Sixth Circuit. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 05/14/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Form EDKy 525) (MDC) cc: COR,USM,USP, FINANCE, USCA for the Sixth Circuit and Samuel A. Girod & Jailer/Warden at RRM Cincinnati by US Mail


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.