New York Eastern District Court
Judge:I Leo Glasser
Referred: Steven M Gold
Case #: 1:02-cv-04118
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2002
Terminated:Mar 31, 2010
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
Defendant
American Cyanamid
Defendant
American Home Products Corporation
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals
Defendant
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Defendant
Burroughs Wellcome Company
Defendant
Caremark, Inc.
Defendant
Ciba-Geigy Corporation
Defendant
Dupont Merck Pharmaceutical Company
Defendant
Eli Lilly & Company
Defendant
Express Pharmacy Services
Defendant
G.D. Searle & Company
Defendant
Glaxo Inc.
Defendant
Hoffman-La Roche, Inc.
Defendant
J.C. Penny Co., Inc.
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
Defendant
Link Brothers Pharmacy,Inc.
Defendant
Marion Merrel Dow Inc.
Defendant
Medco Containment Services Inc.
Defendant
Merck & Co. Inc.
Defendant
Pfizer, Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company
Defendant
Rhone-Poulenc Rorer Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Sandoz Pharmaceutical Corp.
Defendant
Schering-Plough Corporation
Defendant
SmithKline Beecham Corporation
Defendant
Upjohn Company
Defendant
Womble Drug, Inc.
Defendant
Zeneca Inc.
Plaintiff
Allen's Discount Drug,Inc.
Plaintiff
Alvin D. Woody
Plaintiff
Arthur E. Brothers
Plaintiff
Avery Moore, Jr.
Plaintiff
Bailey Pharmacy
Plaintiff
Bakersville Pharmacy, Inc
Plaintiff
Banner Elk Pharmacy
Plaintiff
Barbee Pharmacy, Inc
Plaintiff
Barrett & Tanner, Inc.
Plaintiff
Belmont Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff
Bethel Pharmacy, Inc
Plaintiff
Blount Mutual Drugs, Inc
Plaintiff
Brookshire Pharmacy, Inc
Plaintiff
Bryan Drugs of Tarboro, Inc
Plaintiff
Burton's Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff
Capps-Daniels, Inc.
Plaintiff
Carl D. Taylor's Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff
Carolina Apothecary, Inc.
Plaintiff
Coats Pharmacy
Plaintiff
Copeland Drug, Inc
Plaintiff
Crabtree Pharmacy, iNc.
Plaintiff
Creech Drug Company, Inc.
Plaintiff
Crossnore Rexall Drug Store, Inc.
Plaintiff
Crouch's, Inc.
Plaintiff
Dees Drug Store, Inc.
Plaintiff
Disy
Plaintiff
Donald J. Smith
Plaintiff
Eden Drug, Inc.
Plaintiff
Family Pharmacy of Siler City, Inc.
Plaintiff
Farmville Discount Drug,Inc.
Plaintiff
Gate City Pahrmacy, Inc
Plaintiff
Graham Drug Co.
Plaintiff
Greenson's Pharmacy
Plaintiff
Harvey C. Greeson
Plaintiff
Hawkins Drug, Inc.
Plaintiff
Hick's Pahmacy
Plaintiff
Hollingsworht Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff
Johnnie E. Sutton
Plaintiff
Johnson Drug, Inc.
Plaintiff
Jones Pharmacy Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff
Joseph Hicks
Plaintiff
Kevin M. Wilson
Plaintiff
Kinard Battleground Drug, Inc
Plaintiff
Lee N. Lee Johnson, Inc.
Plaintiff
Lincoln Drug, Inc.
Plaintiff
Lincoln Drugs, Inc.
Plaintiff
Link Brothers Pharmacy,Inc.
Plaintiff
Littletown Pharmacy,Inc
Plaintiff
Lord's Drug Store
Plaintiff
Malone Drugs, Inc
Plaintiff
Marion Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff
Mark Smith
Plaintiff
Medicine Shoppe
Plaintiff
Michael Overman
Plaintiff
Miller Drug Co., Inc.
Plaintiff
Millikan Pharmacy, Inc
Plaintiff
Mitchell's Discount Drugs, Inc.
Plaintiff
Moore Drug Store
Plaintiff
Nicholas S. Stevenson
Plaintiff
Northside Phamacy, Inc.
Plaintiff
Overman & Stevenson
Plaintiff
Prescription Shoppe
Plaintiff
Rock Drug Store, Inc.
Plaintiff
Rowan Drug, Inc.
Plaintiff
Rx Center, Inc.
Plaintiff
Segedpedem, Inc
Plaintiff
Smith's Drug of Forest City, Inc.
Plaintiff
Southside Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff
Springs Road Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff
Stantonsburg Drug Co., Inc.
Plaintiff
Stewart Pharmacuticals, Inc
Plaintiff
Tart & West Drug
Plaintiff
Tele-Tector of Eastern NC, Inc.
Plaintiff
Thomas L. West
Plaintiff
Todd's Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff
Town Center Pharmacy
Plaintiff
Towne Pharmacy,Inc.
Plaintiff
Tripp, Inc.
Plaintiff
Troutman Drug Store
Plaintiff
Valurx Discount Drug Store
Plaintiff
Vaughn Independent Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff
Wall & Millikan, Inc.
Plaintiff
Ward Drug Co. of Benson, inc
Plaintiff
Ward Drug Co. of Nashville
Plaintiff
White Discount Pharmacy of Troy, Inc.
Plaintiff
Whitley Drug, Inc.
Plaintiff
Woolard's Drugs, Inc

GPO Jul 13 2005
Memorandum and Order granting 463 defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings dismissing plaintiffs' claims for conspiracy under the Robinson-Patman Act and precluding plaintiffs from seeking joint and several liability under the Act. The Court directs counsel to appear for a status conference on Tuesday, July 26, 2005 at 11:00 am. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on July 13, 2005. (Kathawala, Rene)
GPO Dec 20 2007
ORDER granting (525) Motion to Amend/Correct; granting (537) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:93-cv-05148-ILG-SMG. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 12/20/2007. Associated Cases: 1:93-cv-05148-ILG-SMG et al. (Dillon, James)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.