Rhode Island District Court
Judge:William E Smith
Referred: Patricia A Sullivan
Case #: 1:15-cv-00419
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2015
Terminated:Aug 14, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 30, 2016 5:05 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Reuben Klamer
Represented By
Eric E. Renner
Renner Law, LLC
contact info
Erica J. Van Loon
Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Hasbro, Inc.
Represented By
Joshua C. Krumholz
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Joseph Avanzato
Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.
contact info
Brenna Anatone Force
Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC
contact info
Courtney L Batliner
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Patricia K. Rocha
Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Lorraine Markham
Represented By
Louis M. Solomon
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Markham Concepts, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph V. Cavanagh, Jr.
Blish & Cavanagh, LLP
contact info
Mary C. Dunn
Blish & Cavanagh, LLP
contact info
Robert J. Cavanagh, Jr.
Blish & Cavanagh
contact info
Kyle G Grimm
Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP
contact info
Michael S. Lazaroff
Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP
contact info
Louis M. Solomon
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Hasbro, Inc.
Represented By
Joshua C. Krumholz
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Joseph Avanzato
Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.
contact info
Brenna Anatone Force
Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC
contact info
Courtney L Batliner
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Patricia K. Rocha
Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Laura Linkletter Rich
Represented By
Ryan M. Gainor
Hinckley, Allen & Snyder LLP
contact info
Christine K. Bush
Hinckley, Allen & Snyder LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sharon Linkletter
Represented By
Ryan M. Gainor
Hinckley, Allen & Snyder LLP
contact info
Christine K. Bush
Hinckley, Allen & Snyder LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael Linkletter
Represented By
Ryan M. Gainor
Hinckley, Allen & Snyder LLP
contact info
Christine K. Bush
Hinckley, Allen & Snyder LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dennis Linkletter
Defendant
Reuben Klamer
10639 Roselle Street
Suite C, CA 92121
Represented By
Eric E. Renner
Renner Law, LLC
contact info
Erica J. Van Loon
Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dawn Linkletter Griffin
Represented By
Ryan M. Gainor
Hinckley, Allen & Snyder LLP
contact info
Christine K. Bush
Hinckley, Allen & Snyder LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ida Mae Atkins
Defendant
Hasbro, Inc.
Represented By
Joshua C. Krumholz
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Joseph Avanzato
Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.
contact info
Brenna Anatone Force
Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC
contact info
Courtney L Batliner
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Patricia K. Rocha
Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.
contact info
Intervenor
Reuben Klamer
10639 Roselle Street
Suite C, CA 92121
Represented By
Eric E. Renner
Renner Law, LLC
contact info
Erica J. Van Loon
Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Markham Concepts, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph V. Cavanagh, Jr.
Blish & Cavanagh, LLP
contact info
Mary C. Dunn
Blish & Cavanagh, LLP
contact info
Robert J. Cavanagh, Jr.
Blish & Cavanagh
contact info
Kyle G Grimm
Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP
contact info
Michael S. Lazaroff
Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP
contact info
Louis M. Solomon
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lorraine Markham
Represented By
Louis M. Solomon
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info

GPO Jul 22 2016
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 75 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Attorney Michael S. Lazaroff and Louis M. Solomon terminated- So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/22/2016. (Barletta, Barbara)
GPO Oct 17 2017
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 49 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/17/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
GPO Dec 15 2017
ORDER denying as moot 129 Motion to Compel; denying 144 Motion for Attorney Fees- So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 12/15/2017. (Barletta, Barbara)
GPO Dec 19 2017
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 130 Motion in Limine to Exclude Bill Markham's 1989 Deposition Testimony. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 12/19/2012. (Jackson, Ryan)
GPO Jan 25 2019
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/25/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
GPO Aug 14 2019
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Hasbro, Inc., Reuben Klamer, Dawn Linkletter Griffin, Sharon Linkletter, Michael Linkletter, Laura Linkletter Rich, Dennis Linkletter, Thomas Feiman (in his capacity as co-trustee of the Irvin S. and Ida Mae Atkins Family Trust), Robert Miller (in his capacity as co-trustee of the Irvin S. and Ida Mae Atkins Family Trust), and Max Candiotty (in his capacity as co-trustee of the Irvin S. and Ida Mae Atkins Family Trust) and against the Plaintiffs Markham Concepts, Inc., Lorraine Markham, and Susan Garretson as to Count III of the Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. 127). The remaining counts of the complaint were dismissed by this Court's July 25, 2019 Text Order entering the parties Stipulation of Partial Dismissal with Prejudice (ECF No. 249). (Urizandi, Nisshy)
GPO Nov 05 2021
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 258 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 259 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 265 Motion for Attorney Fees. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 11/5/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)

1. Struggle over The Game of Life sparks lawsuit against Hasbro (komonews.com)
Submitted Mon 11/16/2015
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, June 23, 2023
301 301 appeal USCA Opinion Fri 06/23 2:18 PM
OPINION issued by William J. Kayatta, Jr., Appellate Judge; Kermit V. Lipez, Appellate Judge and Ojetta Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge. Published. 19-1927 21-1957 21-1958 of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit entered as to296 Notice of Appeal, filed by Hasbro, Inc,267 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Lorraine Markham, Susan Garretson, Markham Concepts, Inc.,298 Notice of Appeal, filed by Reuben Klamer. (Kenny, Meghan)
Related: [-]