Pyle v. Southern Health Partners, Inc. et al
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | P K Holmes, III |
Referred: | Erin L Setser |
Case #: | 5:15-cv-05245 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 02, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order of Dismissal
Fri 02/17 3:46 PM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE as set forth in34 Order. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 17, 2017. (src) |
|
34 | 34
order
Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Fri 02/17 3:44 PM
ORDER ADOPTING33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 17, 2017. (src) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation of Mailing
Fri 02/17 4:00 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION OF MAILING: A copy of the following document(s)The letter re Appeal Procedures and a new IFP Application35 Order of Dismissal,34 Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order Adopting Report and Recommendations was/were mailed to non-ECF Case Participant(s) David Martin Pyle on 2/17/2017. (src) |
||
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 01/30 10:15 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John or Jane Doe, Judy Madewell, Robin Sims. Objections to R&R due by 2/16/2017. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on January 30, 2017. (lw) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation of Mailing
Mon 01/30 10:44 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION OF MAILING: A copy of the following document(s)33 Report and Recommendations was/were mailed to non-ECF Case Participant(s) on 1/30/2017. (lw) |
||
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Supplement
Wed 01/25 1:59 PM
SUPPLEMENT by Defendants Phebe Grothaus, Judy Madewell, Andrew Piazza, Robin Sims to29 Order .(Cook, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order Regarding Change of Address - TEXT ONLY
Thu 01/19 2:52 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING CHANGE OF ADDRESS for David Martin Pyle: The Court has been notified that the Plaintiff has a new address. The Clerk is directed to enter this new address of record for the Plaintiff. The Clerk is also directed to re-send any pleadings or correspondence which may have been returned as undeliverable. Plaintiff is reminded that failure to keep the Court apprised of a valid current address will result in dismissal of this case. The new address is Stagecoach Ave, Springdale AR . Plaintiff is directed to provide the Court with a phone number by February 2, 2017. There are no documents to resend. ONLY the Notice of Change of Address of Pro Se Case Participant attached. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on January 19, 2017. (src) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation of Mailing
Thu 01/19 2:53 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION OF MAILING: A copy of the following document(s)31 Order Regarding Change of Address - TEXT ONLY, was mailed to non-ECF Case Participant(s) David Martin Pyle on 1/19/2017. (src) |
||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Supplement
Fri 01/13 4:08 PM
SUPPLEMENT by Defendants Phebe Grothaus, Judy Madewell, Andrew Piazza, Robin Sims to29 Order to Supplement Motion for Summary Judgment .(Cook, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order
Mon 12/19 3:51 PM
ORDER directing defendants to supplement their Summary Judgment Motion by filing affidavits; see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on December 19, 2016. (rg) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation of Mailing
Mon 12/19 3:51 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION OF MAILING: A copy of the following document(s)29 Order was mailed to non-ECF Case Participant(s) David Martin Pyle on 12/19/2016. (rg) |
||
Wednesday, November 23, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 11/23 11:16 AM
Response to Supplement to Motion for Summary Judgement re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David Martin Pyle. (rg) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation of Mailing
Wed 11/23 11:35 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION OF MAILING: A copy of the following document(s)28 Response to Motion was mailed to non-ECF Case Participant(s) David Martin Pyle on 11/23/2016. (rg) |
||
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Supplement
Mon 11/07 10:51 AM
SUPPLEMENT by Defendants Phebe Grothaus, Judy Madewell, Andrew Piazza, Robin Sims to25 Order to Supplement Motion for Summary Judgment .(Cook, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
order
~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 11/04 10:07 AM
ORDER directing the Clerk to note on the docket sheet the correct name of the Defendant listed as Judy Maywell is Judy Madewell and to substitute defendants; see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on November 4, 2016. (rg) (rg) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation of Mailing
Fri 11/04 10:09 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION OF MAILING: A copy of the following document(s)26 Add and Terminate Parties was mailed to non-ECF Case Participant(s) David Martin Pyle on 11/4/2016. (rg) |
||
Wednesday, October 19, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order
Wed 10/19 3:11 PM
ORDER directing Defendants to supplement their Summary Judgment Motion by filing affidavit(s); see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on October 19, 2016. (rg) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 10/19 3:13 PM
A copy of document number25 was mailed to non-ECF Case Participant(s) David Martin Pyle on 10/19/2016. (rg) |
||
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order
Wed 09/28 8:47 AM
ORDER regarding Summary Judgment Hearing; see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on September 23, 2016. (Mailed to non-ECF Participant)(rg) |
|
Thursday, September 22, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 09/22 3:07 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked No ADC #. Mail originally sent to David Martin Pyle at PO Box 970, Marianna, AR 72360 including22 Response to Motion filed by David Martin Pyle. Resent to same address with ADC number. (rg) |
|
Thursday, September 08, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 09/08 3:09 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David Martin Pyle. (jn) |
|
notice
Notice of Change of Address - TEXT ONLY
Thu 09/08 3:08 PM
TEXT ONLY NOTICE of Change of Address for David Pyle per new address provided in Doc#22. (jn) |
||
Monday, August 08, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
msupport
Statement of Facts
Mon 08/08 10:50 AM
STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of19 MOTION for Summary Judgment by John or Jane Doe, Judy Maywell, Robin Sims. (Cook, James) |
|
20 | 20
10
pgs
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Mon 08/08 10:49 AM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of19 MOTION for Summary Judgment by John or Jane Doe, Judy Maywell, Robin Sims.(Cook, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 08/08 10:47 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by John or Jane Doe, Judy Maywell, Robin Sims. Motions referred to Erin L. Setser.(Cook, James) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/06 10:18 AM
NOTICE by Judy Maywell, Robin Sims (Notice of Disclosures) (Cook, James) |
|
Monday, April 04, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice of Change of Address - TEXT ONLY
Mon 04/04 12:15 PM
TEXT ONLY NOTICE regarding Address for David Pyle. The Clerk contacted Washington County Jail on 4/4/16 and an official confirmed that David Pyle is still incarcerated in the facility.14 Initial Scheduling Order - PC cases,13 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, will be resent to Washington County Jail. (src) |
||
Friday, April 01, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 04/01 3:59 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Return to sender paroled. Mail originally sent to David Martin Pyle at Washington County Jail 1155 Clydesdale Drive, Fayetteville, AR including14 Initial Scheduling Order - PC cases,. No new address available. (rg) |
|
Thursday, March 31, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Directing Change of Address
Thu 03/31 2:19 PM
ORDER directing the clerk to Change the Address of David Martin Pyle. Documents previously returned to be resent including13 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Add and Terminate Parties. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on March 31, 2016. (rg) |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 03/24 1:22 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS No Longer With ADC. Mail originally sent to David Pyle at ADC-Ouachita River Unit including13 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Add and Terminate Parties. No new address available. (tg) |
|
Tuesday, March 22, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Scheduling Order - PC cases
Tue 03/22 3:38 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Please see attached document for complete deadline information. Summary Judgment Motion due by 8/8/2016 Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 9/22/2016 01:30 PM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable Erin L. Setser.Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on March 22, 2016. (gh) |
|
Monday, March 14, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 03/14 2:17 PM
OPINION AND ORDER granting9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Southern Health Partners, Inc. terminated. Plaintiff's official-capacity claims against the individual Defendants are likewise DISMISSED; see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on March 14, 2016. (rg) |
|
Wednesday, November 04, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 11/04 2:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Martin Pyle. Southern Health Partners, Inc. served on 10/13/2015, answer due 11/03/2015. (tg) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint Referred (42:1983)
Thu 10/15 11:23 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) by John or Jane Doe, Judy Maywell, Robin Sims, Southern Health Partners, Inc..(Cook, James) |
|
10 | 10
4
pgs
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Thu 10/15 11:22 AM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by John or Jane Doe, Judy Maywell, Robin Sims, Southern Health Partners, Inc.. (Cook, James) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 10/15 11:21 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by John or Jane Doe, Judy Maywell, Robin Sims, Southern Health Partners, Inc.. Motions referred to Erin L. Setser.(Cook, James) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Directing Change of Address
Wed 10/14 4:54 PM
ORDER directing the clerk to Change the Address of David Pyle. Documents previously returned to be resent including6 Clerk's Order PLRA Initial Fee,. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on October 14, 2015. (src) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 10/13 5:03 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked No Longer at Facility. Mail originally sent to David Pyle at Washington Co. Jail including6 Clerk's Order PLRA Initial Fee,. No new address available. (src) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Clerk's Order PLRA Initial Fee
Mon 10/05 8:02 AM
CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing SHERIFF, WASHINGTON COUNTY to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $$21.60; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ $350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: SHERIFF, WASHINGTON COUNTY). (rg) |
|
Friday, October 02, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 10/02 5:32 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Issued as to Judy Maywell, Robin Sims, Southern Health Partners, Inc. and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished, 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), 3 Order Granting IFP and Directing Prisoner Payment, Order Directing Service. (rg) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished
Fri 10/02 5:08 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished. (rg) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order Granting IFP and Directing Prisoner Payment Order Directing Service
Fri 10/02 5:08 PM
ORDER Granting IFP, directing Clerk to assess filing fee and collect funds from Prison Account of David Martin Pyle, ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE John or Jane Doe, Judy Maywell, Robin Sims, Southern Health Partners, Inc. and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on October 2, 2015. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(rg) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Application to Proceed IFP (42:1983)
Fri 10/02 5:04 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff David Martin Pyle. (rg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint Referred (42:1983)
Fri 10/02 5:03 PM
COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against John or Jane Doe, Judy Maywell, Robin Sims, Southern Health Partners, Inc., filed by David Martin Pyle.(rg) |