Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin Gross
Case #: 1:15-bk-12054
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Nov 16, 2015
Dismissed:Mar 31, 2017
Terminated:Apr 17, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
City Sports, Inc.
77 N Washington St
Boston, MA 02114-1908
Represented By
Stuart M. Brown
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Kaitlin MacKenzie Edelman
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Dienna Corrado
Dla Piper
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Rust Consulting/Omni Bankruptcy
www.omnimgt.com 5955 DeSoto Avenue Suite 100
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Creditor Committee
The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Richelle Kalnit
Cooley LLP
contact info
Jason A. Gibson
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Julia Bettina Klein
Klein LLC
contact info
Jeffrey L. Cohen
Cooley LLP
contact info
Jay R. Indyke
Cooley LLP
contact info
Scott J. Leonhardt
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Frederick B. Rosner
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Mark S. Kenney
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info
Hannah Mufson McCollum
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


1. Athletic Retailer City Sports Files for Bankruptcy (wsj.com)
Submitted Tue 10/06/2015
Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago
Monday, October 16, 2017
959 959 court Standing Order/Transcripts Mon 10/16 9:10 AM
The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 10/16/2017 to 10/30/2017. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, eScribers, Telephone number (973)406-2250. (BJM) Modified on 10/16/2017 (BJM)
Related: [-]