New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referred: Cheryl L Pollak
Case #: 2:15-cv-05756
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2015
Terminated:Jan 31, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Apr 02, 2016 6:12 AM EDT
Defendant
Department of Homeland Secuirty
Defendant
Jeh Johnson
Plaintiff
David Maldonado
Represented By
Jose G Santiago
Ackerman Levine Cullen Brickman & Limmer LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Transportation Security Administration
Terminated: 12/05/2015
Defendant
U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Terminated: 12/05/2015


1. Captain boots cranky air marshal from his plane (nydailynews.com)
Submitted Mon 10/12/2015
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 31, 2020
65 65 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 02/03 9:50 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2), by and between Plaintiff DAVID MALDONADO and Defendant CHAD WOLF, ACTING SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, by and through the undersigned parties, that this action be dismissed on the merits with prejudice without costs, Maldonado v. Wolf, I5-CV-5756 (KAM)(CLP), Stipulation and Order of Dismissal attorneys' fees, expenses or disbursements to any party. SO Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 1/31/2020. (Herrera, Isaiah)
Related: [-]
64 64 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/31 8:24 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Jeh Johnson, Transportation Security Administration, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Leonardo-Beckmann, Diane)
Related: [-]