Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-10019

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:15-ap-02266
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2015
Terminated:Jun 20, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Eric LaSure
615 Martin Luther King, Jr. Boulevard
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Eric LaSure
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Bennett, Jr.
1009 Chancellor Avenue Apt. 105
Irvington, NJ 07111
Represented By
Kevin Bennett, Jr.
contact info
Defendant
Angel Colon
4 Copper Place
Belleville, NJ 07109
Represented By
Angel Colon
contact info
Defendant
Shon Dixon
46 Maple Street
West Orange, NJ 07052
Represented By
Shon Dixon
contact info
Defendant
Darnell Frost
15A New England Avenue
Summit, NJ 07901
Represented By
Darnell Frost
contact info
Defendant
Myles Guilford
15A New England Avenue
Summit, NJ 07901
Represented By
Myles Guilford
contact info
Defendant
Denarius Hemhill
123 S. Munn Avenue
East Orange, NJ 07018
Represented By
Denarius Hemhill
contact info
Defendant
Ronald Jeter
125 Richelieu Terrace
Newark, NJ 07106
Represented By
Ronald Jeter
contact info
Defendant
Corey Joseph
1418 Jean Terrace
Plainfield, NJ 07062
Represented By
Corey Joseph
contact info
Defendant
Aubrey Beckles
1547 Elaine Terrace
Union, NJ 07083
Represented By
Aubrey Beckles
contact info
Defendant
Dennis Leonard
76 Alexander Street
Newark, NJ 07106
Represented By
Dennis Leonard
contact info
Defendant
Marcos Lopez
54 Fitzrandolph Road
West Orange, NJ 07052
Represented By
Marcos Lopez
contact info
Defendant
Carter Mangan
68 Shephard Avenue
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Carter Mangan
contact info
Defendant
Al-Hassan Neblett
181 Schuyler Ave.
Newark, NJ 07112
Represented By
Al-Hassan Neblett
contact info
Defendant
Lamont Nickerson
19 Sheridan Street
Irvington, NJ 07111
Represented By
Lamont Nickerson
contact info
Defendant
Jesse Quadrel
33 Park Street
Monclair, NJ 07042
Represented By
Jesse Quadrel
contact info
Defendant
Majeedah Shariah
379 Fairmount Avenue
Newark, NJ 07103
Represented By
Majeedah Shariah
contact info
Defendant
Robert Murray
33 Cohocton
Highland Lakes, NJ 07422
Represented By
Robert Murray
contact info
Defendant
Edwin S. Moran
1037 Brighton Street
Union, NJ 07083
Represented By
Edwin S. Moran
contact info
Defendant
Robert Lincoln
21 Lakeville Road
Sussex, NJ 07461
Represented By
Robert Lincoln
contact info
Defendant
Jewayne Jones
275 Prospect Street Apt. 6E
East Orange, NJ 07017
Represented By
Jewayne Jones
contact info
Defendant
Aniyan Jacob
554 Windsor Road
Bergenfield, NJ 07621
Represented By
Aniyan Jacob
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Greer
32 Ellis Avenue
Irvington, NJ 07111
Represented By
Kevin Greer
contact info
Defendant
Praful Goswami
64 Bell Street
Belleville, NJ 07109
Represented By
Praful Goswami
contact info
Defendant
Vasant Gosai
19 King Street 1st Floor
Belleville, NJ 07109
Represented By
Vasant Gosai
contact info
Defendant
Kovao-Eric Ekoue
112 Isabella Avenue
Newark, NJ 07106
Represented By
Kovao-Eric Ekoue
contact info
Defendant
Jacqueline P. Brown
486 18th Avenue
Newark, NJ 07103
Represented By
Jacqueline P. Brown
contact info
Defendant
Karrim Beverett
19 Sheridan Street
Irvington, NJ 07111
Represented By
Karrim Beverett
contact info
Defendant
Arthur Beauchamp
64 Holland Road
Sussex, NJ 07461
Represented By
Arthur Beauchamp
contact info
Defendant
Marvin Bailey
765 Clifton Avenue Apt. A4-2
Clifton, NJ 07013
Represented By
Marvin Bailey
contact info
Defendant
Michael Awertschenko
67 Woodmount Road
Pine Brook, NJ 07058
Represented By
Michael Awertschenko
contact info
Plaintiff
Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
1 Gateway Center Suite 2616
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Daniel Stolz
Wasserman, Jurista & Stolz
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, June 20, 2019
utility Close Adversary Case Thu 06/20 10:58 AM
Adversary Case (2:15-ap-2266) Closed. (sg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2016
court Notice of Returned Mail Thu 12/22 9:22 AM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Jewayne Jones , Related [+] (sg)
Related: [-] 46 Order on Amended Motion
Friday, December 16, 2016
court Notice of Returned Mail Mon 01/23 2:53 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Marvin Bailey 765 Clifton Avenue Apt. A4-2 Clifton, NJ 07013-1854 , Related [+] (sjp)
Related: [-] 46 Order on Amended Motion
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
court Notice of Returned Mail Wed 01/18 4:38 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Robert Murray 33 Cohocton Highland Lakes, NJ 07422-1413 , Related [+] (sjp)
Related: [-] 46 Order on Amended Motion
Thursday, November 17, 2016
court Notice of Returned Mail Tue 01/10 4:09 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Denarius Hemhill 123 S. Munn Avenue East Orange, NJ 07018-3436 , Related [+] (sjp)
Related: [-] 46 Order on Amended Motion
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
court Notice of Returned Mail Tue 11/15 3:19 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Kovao-Eric Ekoue and Jess Quadrel, Related [+]. (sg)
Related: [-] 46 Order on Amended Motion
Wednesday, November 02, 2016
47 47 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 11/03 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 34. Notice Date 11/02/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
court Notice of Returned Mail Tue 01/10 4:00 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Dorothea Wefing Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS , Related [+] (sjp)
Related: [-] 46 Order on Amended Motion
court Notice of Returned Mail Tue 01/10 4:03 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: James R. Zazzali Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS , Related [+] (sjp)
Related: [-] 46 Order on Amended Motion
Monday, October 31, 2016
46 46 order Amended Motion Mon 10/31 4:16 PM
Order Approving Settlemen Related [+] . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/31/2016. (mcp)
Related: [-] 41
Thursday, October 20, 2016
court Hearing Held Fri 10/21 9:11 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Granted Revised Order Related [+] (mcp )
Related: [-] 41 Amended Motion filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
court Hearing Held Fri 10/21 9:12 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Granted Revised Order Related [+] (mcp )
Related: [-] 36 Motion (Generic) filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
Thursday, October 13, 2016
45 45 answer Response Thu 10/13 3:33 PM
Response to Related [+] filed by James A. Rybka on behalf of City of Newark. (Rybka, James)
Related: [-] 41 Amended Motion. (related document:36 Motion re: Approval of Settlement of Adversary Proceeding and Seeking Authorization for Partial Payment to Creditors filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation) Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation.Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Joseph Hartnett # 2 Exhibit A to Certification # 3 Memorandum of Law) filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 10/13 5:00 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 10/18/2016 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2016 at 03:00 PM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (jf )
Related: [-] 41 Amended Motion filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 10/13 5:02 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 10/18/2016 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2016 at 03:00 PM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (jf )
Related: [-] 36 Motion re: Approval of Settlement of Adversary Proceeding and Seeking Authorization for Partial Payment to Creditors Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Joseph Hartnett # 2 Exhibit A to Certification # 3 Memorandum of Law # 4 Proposed Order Approving Settlement) (Stolz, Daniel) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
Tuesday, October 11, 2016
44 44 answer Response Tue 10/11 2:48 PM
Memorandum of Law/Response to Related [+] filed by David M Hoffman on behalf of Michael Awertschenko, Marvin Bailey, Arthur Beauchamp, Aubrey Beckles, Kevin Bennett, Jr., Karrim Beverett, Jacqueline P. Brown, Angel Colon, Shon Dixon, Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Darnell Frost, Vasant Gosai, Praful Goswami, Kevin Greer, Myles Guilford, Denarius Hemhill, Aniyan Jacob, Ronald Jeter, Jewayne Jones, Corey Joseph, Eric LaSure, Dennis Leonard, Robert Lincoln, Marcos Lopez, Carter Mangan, Edwin S. Moran, Robert Murray, Al-Hassan Neblett, Lamont Nickerson, Jesse Quadrel, Majeedah Shariah. (clb)
Related: [-] 43 Objection to (related document:41 Amended Motion. (related document:36 Motion re: Approval of Settlement of Adversary Proceeding and Seeking Authorization for Partial Payment to Creditors filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation) Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation.Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Joseph Hartnett # 2 Exhibit A to Certification # 3 Memorandum of Law) filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation) filed by Fran B. Steele on behalf of United States Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) filed by U.S. Trustee
Wednesday, October 05, 2016
43 43 answer Objection Wed 10/05 10:53 AM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Fran B. Steele on behalf of United States Trustee. (Steele, Fran)
Related: [-] 41 Amended Motion. (related document:36 Motion re: Approval of Settlement of Adversary Proceeding and Seeking Authorization for Partial Payment to Creditors filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation) Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation.Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Joseph Hartnett # 2 Exhibit A to Certification # 3 Memorandum of Law) filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, September 26, 2016
42 42 misc Certificate of Service Mon 09/26 12:23 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Daniel Stolz on behalf of Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation. (Stolz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 41 Amended Motion. (related document:36 Motion re: Approval of Settlement of Adversary Proceeding and Seeking Authorization for Partial Payment to Creditors filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation) Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation.Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Joseph Hartnett # 2 Exhibit A to Certification # 3 Memorandum of Law) filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
Friday, September 23, 2016
41 41 motion Amended Motion Fri 09/23 4:14 PM
Amended Motion. Related [+] Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation.Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Stolz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 36 Motion re: Approval of Settlement of Adversary Proceeding and Seeking Authorization for Partial Payment to Creditors filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
Att: 1 Certification of Joseph Hartnett
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Certification
Att: 3 Memorandum of Law
Tuesday, September 20, 2016
40 40 misc Stipulation Tue 09/20 10:30 AM
Stipulation Between Michael Awertschenko, Marvin Bailey, Arthur Beauchamp, Aubrey Beckles, Kevin Bennett, Jr., Karrim Beverett, Jacqueline P. Brown, Angel Colon, Shon Dixon, Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Darnell Frost, Vasant Gosai, Praful Goswami, Kevin Greer, Myles Guilford, Denarius Hemhill, Aniyan Jacob, Ronald Jeter, Jewayne Jones, Corey Joseph, Eric LaSure, Dennis Leonard, Robert Lincoln, Marcos Lopez, Carter Mangan, Edwin S. Moran, Robert Murray, Al-Hassan Neblett, Lamont Nickerson, Jesse Quadrel, Majeedah Shariah and Plaintiff, re:Settlement filed by David M Hoffman on behalf of Michael Awertschenko, Marvin Bailey, Arthur Beauchamp, Aubrey Beckles, Kevin Bennett, Jr., Karrim Beverett, Jacqueline P. Brown, Angel Colon, Shon Dixon, Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Darnell Frost, Vasant Gosai, Praful Goswami, Kevin Greer, Myles Guilford, Denarius Hemhill, Aniyan Jacob, Ronald Jeter, Jewayne Jones, Corey Joseph, Eric LaSure, Dennis Leonard, Robert Lincoln, Marcos Lopez, Carter Mangan, Edwin S. Moran, Robert Murray, Al-Hassan Neblett, Lamont Nickerson, Jesse Quadrel, Majeedah Shariah. (clb)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held and Continued Tue 09/27 9:23 AM
Minute of Hearing Held and Continued from 9/20/2016 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp )
Related: [-] 36 Motion (Generic) filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
Monday, September 19, 2016
39 39 answer Response Mon 09/19 12:16 PM
Response to Related [+] filed by Daniel Stolz on behalf of Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation. (Stolz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 38 Objection to (related document:36 Motion re: Approval of Settlement of Adversary Proceeding and Seeking Authorization for Partial Payment to Creditors Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation.Hearing scheduled for 9/20/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Joseph Hartnett # 2 Exhibit A to Certification # 3 Memorandum of Law # 4 Proposed Order Approving Settlement) filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation) filed by Fran B. Steele on behalf of United States Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee
Monday, September 12, 2016
38 38 answer Objection Mon 09/12 2:43 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Fran B. Steele on behalf of United States Trustee. (Steele, Fran)
Related: [-] 36 Motion re: Approval of Settlement of Adversary Proceeding and Seeking Authorization for Partial Payment to Creditors Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation.Hearing scheduled for 9/20/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Joseph Hartnett # 2 Exhibit A to Certification # 3 Memorandum of Law # 4 Proposed Order Approving Settlement) filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, August 29, 2016
37 37 misc Certificate of Service Mon 08/29 4:36 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Daniel Stolz on behalf of Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation. (Stolz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 36 Motion re: Approval of Settlement of Adversary Proceeding and Seeking Authorization for Partial Payment to Creditors Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation.Hearing scheduled for 9/20/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Joseph Hartnett # 2 Exhibit A to Certification # 3 Memorandum of Law # 4 Proposed Order Approving Settlement) filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
36 36 motion Motion (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable Mon 08/29 3:00 PM
Motion re: Approval of Settlement of Adversary Proceeding and Seeking Authorization for Partial Payment to Creditors Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation.Hearing scheduled for 9/20/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Stolz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Joseph Hartnett
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Certification
Att: 3 5 pgs Memorandum of Law
Att: 4 Proposed Order Approving Settlement
Tuesday, July 19, 2016
court Notice of Returned Mail Tue 07/19 1:04 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Marvin Bailey , Related [+] (dmc)
Related: [-] 30 Transcript
Tuesday, July 05, 2016
35 35 motion Shorten Time Tue 07/05 10:09 AM
Application to Shorten Time Related [+] Filed by Daniel Stolz on behalf of Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation. (Stolz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 34 Motion to Compel mediation filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
Att: 1 Proposed Order shortening time period for notice and setting hearing
34 34 motion Compel Tue 07/05 10:07 AM
Motion to Compel mediation Filed by Daniel Stolz on behalf of Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation. (Stolz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application in support of motion to compel mediation
Att: 2 Certification of Joseh Hartnett
Att: 3 Proposed Order compelling mediation
court Notice of Docketing Error Tue 07/05 8:52 AM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing Related [+]. Type of Error: MAIN DOCUMENT MUST BE SIGNED BY EFILER, filed by D. CLARKE. Please correct and refile with the court. (clb)
Related: [-] 32 Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation,33 Application to Shorten Time filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
Friday, July 01, 2016
33 33 motion Shorten Time Fri 07/01 1:59 PM
Application to Shorten Time Related [+] Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation. (Clarke, Donald)
Related: [-] 32 Motion to Compel mediation filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
Att: 1 Proposed Order SHORTENING TIME PERIOD FOR NOTICE AND SETTING HEARING
32 32 motion Compel Fri 07/01 1:57 PM
Motion to Compel mediation Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation. (Clarke, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION
Att: 2 Certification of Joseph Hartnett
Att: 3 Proposed Order compelling mediation
Wednesday, June 22, 2016
court Notice of Returned Mail Wed 06/22 11:01 AM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Dorothea Wefing, James R. Zazzali , Related [+] (dmc)
Related: [-] 30 Transcript
Saturday, June 18, 2016
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Notice (generic) Sun 06/19 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 34. Notice Date 06/18/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2016
30 30 38 pgs court Transcript Wed 06/15 12:58 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/29/16 Related [+]. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/22/2016. List of Items to be Redacted Due By 07/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 07/18/2016. Remote electronic access to the transcript will be restricted through 09/13/2016. (J&J Court Transcribers)
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko
Friday, May 13, 2016
29 29 misc Certification of Non Compliance Mon 05/16 10:35 AM
Certification of Non Compliance Related [+] filed by David M Hoffman. (smz)
Related: [-] 28 Letter in support of (related document: Hearing Held) filed by David M Hoffman on behalf of Michael Awertschenko, Marvin Bailey, Arthur Beauchamp, Aubrey Beckles, Kevin Bennett, Jr., Karrim Beverett, Jacqueline P. Brown, Angel Colon, Shon Dixon, Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Darnell Frost, Vasant Gosai, Praful Goswami, Kevin Greer, Myles Guilford, Denarius Hemhill, Aniyan Jacob, Ronald Jeter, Jewayne Jones, Corey Joseph, Eric LaSure, Dennis Leonard, Robert Lincoln, Marcos Lopez, Carter Mangan, Edwin S. Moran, Robert Murray, NWCDC, Al-Hassan Neblett, Lamont Nickerson, Jesse Quadrel, Majeedah Shariah, Edwin Stier. (clb) filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Aniyan Jacob, Defendant Aniyan Jacob, 3rd Party Plaintiff Al-Hassan Neblett, Defendant Al-Hassan Neblett, 3rd Pty Defendant Edwin Stier, 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko, 3rd Party Plaintiff Marvin Bailey, Defendant Marvin Bailey, 3rd Party Plaintiff Arthur Beauchamp, Defendant Arthur Beauchamp, 3rd Party Plaintiff Karrim Beverett, Defendant Karrim Beverett, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jacqueline P. Brown, Defendant Jacqueline P. Brown, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Defendant Kovao-Eric Ekoue, 3rd Party Plaintiff Vasant Gosai, Defendant Vasant Gosai, 3rd Party Plaintiff Praful Goswami, Defendant Praful Goswami, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kevin Greer, Defendant Kevin Greer, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jewayne Jones, Defendant Jewayne Jones, 3rd Party Plaintiff Robert Lincoln, Defendant Robert Lincoln, 3rd Party Plaintiff Edwin S. Moran, Defendant Edwin S. Moran, 3rd Party Plaintiff Robert Murray, Defendant Robert Murray, 3rd Party Plaintiff Aubrey Beckles, Defendant Aubrey Beckles, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kevin Bennett, Jr., Defendant Kevin Bennett, Jr., 3rd Party Plaintiff Angel Colon, Defendant Angel Colon, 3rd Party Plaintiff Shon Dixon, Defendant Shon Dixon, 3rd Party Plaintiff Darnell Frost, Defendant Darnell Frost, 3rd Party Plaintiff Myles Guilford, Defendant Myles Guilford, 3rd Party Plaintiff Denarius Hemhill, Defendant Denarius Hemhill, 3rd Party Plaintiff Ronald Jeter, Defendant Ronald Jeter, 3rd Party Plaintiff Corey Joseph, Defendant Corey Joseph, 3rd Party Plaintiff Eric LaSure, Defendant Eric LaSure, 3rd Party Plaintiff Dennis Leonard, Defendant Dennis Leonard, 3rd Party Plaintiff Marcos Lopez, Defendant Marcos Lopez, 3rd Party Plaintiff Carter Mangan, Defendant Carter Mangan, 3rd Party Plaintiff Lamont Nickerson, Defendant Lamont Nickerson, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jesse Quadrel, Defendant Jesse Quadrel, 3rd Party Plaintiff Majeedah Shariah, Defendant Majeedah Shariah, Counter-Defendant NWCDC
Friday, April 29, 2016
court Hearing Scheduled (Document) Fri 04/29 9:19 AM
Hearing Scheduled. Related [+] Opinion to be Issued; Hearing scheduled for 4/29/2016 at 03:00 PM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (jf)
Related: [-] 13 Motion For Summary Judgment RE: as to Liability and Damages on Account of Severance, Vacation, and Sick Pay Together With Whatever is Determined to be Their Pension Plan Entitlement in favor of Defendant-CounterClaimant and against Plaintiff. Filed by Michael Awertschenko.(Attachments: # 1 Certification # 2 Memorandum of Law # 3 Proposed Order) (rah) filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko,19 Cross Motion, filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
court Hearing Held Mon 05/02 3:41 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Denying Related [+] (mcp )
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Awertschenko
Monday, April 18, 2016
28 28 misc Support Tue 04/19 8:56 AM
Letter in support of Related [+] filed by David M Hoffman on behalf of Michael Awertschenko, Marvin Bailey, Arthur Beauchamp, Aubrey Beckles, Kevin Bennett, Jr., Karrim Beverett, Jacqueline P. Brown, Angel Colon, Shon Dixon, Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Darnell Frost, Vasant Gosai, Praful Goswami, Kevin Greer, Myles Guilford, Denarius Hemhill, Aniyan Jacob, Ronald Jeter, Jewayne Jones, Corey Joseph, Eric LaSure, Dennis Leonard, Robert Lincoln, Marcos Lopez, Carter Mangan, Edwin S. Moran, Robert Murray, NWCDC, Al-Hassan Neblett, Lamont Nickerson, Jesse Quadrel, Majeedah Shariah, Edwin Stier. (clb)
Related: [-] Hearing Held
Wednesday, April 13, 2016
court Hearing Held Wed 04/13 12:37 PM
Status Conference Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Off the Record Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Newark Watershed Conservation & Development Corp.13 Motion For Summary Judgment RE: as to Liability and Damages on Account of Severance, Vacation, and Sick Pay Together With Whatever is Determined to be Their Pension Plan Entitlement in favor of Defendant-CounterClaimant and against Plaintiff.16 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, Production of Documents, and Scheduling of Depositions .19 Cross Motion (related document:13 Motion For Summary Judgment.) (mcp
Wednesday, April 06, 2016
27 27 misc Document Wed 04/06 10:50 AM
Document re: Letter Response re Status Conference re Motion for Summary Judgment Related [+] filed by Daniel Stolz on behalf of Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation. (Stolz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko
Tuesday, March 22, 2016
court Hearing Held and Continued Wed 03/23 11:25 AM
Minute of Hearing Held and Continued as Status Conference from 3/22/2016 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp )
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Awertschenko
court Hearing Held and Continued Wed 03/23 11:25 AM
Minute of Hearing Held and Continued as Status Conference from 3/22/2016 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp )
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
court Hearing Held and Continued Wed 03/23 11:26 AM
Minute of Hearing Held and Continued. as Status Conference from 3/22/2016 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp )
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Compel
court Hearing Held and Continued Wed 03/23 11:27 AM
Minute of Hearing Held and Continued. as Status Conference from 3/22/2016 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp )
Related: [-] 19 Cross Motion filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
Thursday, March 17, 2016
26 26 misc Document Thu 03/17 10:10 AM
Document re: Letter Memorandum Related [+] filed by Daniel Stolz on behalf of Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation. (Stolz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 22 Response filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Aniyan Jacob, Defendant Aniyan Jacob, 3rd Party Plaintiff Al-Hassan Neblett, Defendant Al-Hassan Neblett, 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko, 3rd Party Plaintiff Marvin Bailey, Defendant Marvin Bailey, 3rd Party Plaintiff Arthur Beauchamp, Defendant Arthur Beauchamp, 3rd Party Plaintiff Karrim Beverett, Defendant Karrim Beverett, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jacqueline P. Brown, Defendant Jacqueline P. Brown, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Defendant Kovao-Eric Ekoue, 3rd Party Plaintiff Vasant Gosai, Defendant Vasant Gosai, 3rd Party Plaintiff Praful Goswami, Defendant Praful Goswami, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kevin Greer, Defendant Kevin Greer, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jewayne Jones, Defendant Jewayne Jones, 3rd Party Plaintiff Robert Lincoln, Defendant Robert Lincoln, 3rd Party Plaintiff Edwin S. Moran, Defendant Edwin S. Moran, 3rd Party Plaintiff Robert Murray, Defendant Robert Murray, 3rd Party Plaintiff Aubrey Beckles, Defendant Aubrey Beckles, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kevin Bennett, Jr., Defendant Kevin Bennett, Jr., 3rd Party Plaintiff Angel Colon, Defendant Angel Colon, 3rd Party Plaintiff Shon Dixon, Defendant Shon Dixon, 3rd Party Plaintiff Darnell Frost, Defendant Darnell Frost, 3rd Party Plaintiff Myles Guilford, Defendant Myles Guilford, 3rd Party Plaintiff Denarius Hemhill, Defendant Denarius Hemhill, 3rd Party Plaintiff Ronald Jeter, Defendant Ronald Jeter, 3rd Party Plaintiff Corey Joseph, Defendant Corey Joseph, 3rd Party Plaintiff Eric LaSure, Defendant Eric LaSure, 3rd Party Plaintiff Dennis Leonard, Defendant Dennis Leonard, 3rd Party Plaintiff Marcos Lopez, Defendant Marcos Lopez, 3rd Party Plaintiff Carter Mangan, Defendant Carter Mangan, 3rd Party Plaintiff Lamont Nickerson, Defendant Lamont Nickerson, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jesse Quadrel, Defendant Jesse Quadrel,23 Support filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Aniyan Jacob, Defendant Aniyan Jacob, 3rd Party Plaintiff Al-Hassan Neblett, Defendant Al-Hassan Neblett, 3rd Pty Defendant Edwin Stier, 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko, 3rd Party Plaintiff Marvin Bailey, Defendant Marvin Bailey, 3rd Party Plaintiff Arthur Beauchamp, Defendant Arthur Beauchamp, 3rd Party Plaintiff Karrim Beverett, Defendant Karrim Beverett, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jacqueline P. Brown, Defendant Jacqueline P. Brown, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Defendant Kovao-Eric Ekoue, 3rd Party Plaintiff Vasant Gosai, Defendant Vasant Gosai, 3rd Party Plaintiff Praful Goswami, Defendant Praful Goswami, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kevin Greer, Defendant Kevin Greer, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jewayne Jones, Defendant Jewayne Jones, 3rd Party Plaintiff Robert Lincoln, Defendant Robert Lincoln, 3rd Party Plaintiff Edwin S. Moran, Defendant Edwin S. Moran, 3rd Party Plaintiff Robert Murray, Defendant Robert Murray, 3rd Party Plaintiff Aubrey Beckles, Defendant Aubrey Beckles, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kevin Bennett, Jr., Defendant Kevin Bennett, Jr., 3rd Party Plaintiff Angel Colon, Defendant Angel Colon, 3rd Party Plaintiff Shon Dixon, Defendant Shon Dixon, 3rd Party Plaintiff Myles Guilford, Defendant Myles Guilford, 3rd Party Plaintiff Denarius Hemhill, Defendant Denarius Hemhill, 3rd Party Plaintiff Ronald Jeter, Defendant Ronald Jeter, 3rd Party Plaintiff Corey Joseph, Defendant Corey Joseph, 3rd Party Plaintiff Eric LaSure, Defendant Eric LaSure, 3rd Party Plaintiff Dennis Leonard, Defendant Dennis Leonard, 3rd Party Plaintiff Marcos Lopez, Defendant Marcos Lopez, 3rd Party Plaintiff Carter Mangan, Defendant Carter Mangan, 3rd Party Plaintiff Lamont Nickerson, Defendant Lamont Nickerson, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jesse Quadrel, Defendant Jesse Quadrel, 3rd Party Plaintiff Majeedah Shariah, Defendant Majeedah Shariah, Counter-Defendant NWCDC
Monday, March 14, 2016
25 25 misc Certification of Non Compliance Tue 03/15 10:21 AM
Certification of Non Compliance Related [+] filed by David M Hoffman on behalf of David Hoffman. (clb)
Related: [-] 23 Certification in support of (related document:13 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko,16 Motion to Compel) filed by David M Hoffman on behalf of Michael Awertschenko, Marvin Bailey, Arthur Beauchamp, Aubrey Beckles, Kevin Bennett, Jr., Karrim Beverett, Jacqueline P. Brown, Angel Colon, Shon Dixon, Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Vasant Gosai, Praful Goswami, Kevin Greer, Myles Guilford, Denarius Hemhill, Aniyan Jacob, Ronald Jeter, Jewayne Jones, Corey Joseph, Eric LaSure, Dennis Leonard, Robert Lincoln, Marcos Lopez, Carter Mangan, Edwin S. Moran, Robert Murray, NWCDC, Al-Hassan Neblett, Lamont Nickerson, Jesse Quadrel, Majeedah Shariah, Edwin Stier. (clb) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2016 (clb). filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Aniyan Jacob, Defendant Aniyan Jacob, 3rd Party Plaintiff Al-Hassan Neblett, Defendant Al-Hassan Neblett, 3rd Pty Defendant Edwin Stier, 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko, 3rd Party Plaintiff Marvin Bailey, Defendant Marvin Bailey, 3rd Party Plaintiff Arthur Beauchamp, Defendant Arthur Beauchamp, 3rd Party Plaintiff Karrim Beverett, Defendant Karrim Beverett, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jacqueline P. Brown, Defendant Jacqueline P. Brown, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Defendant Kovao-Eric Ekoue, 3rd Party Plaintiff Vasant Gosai, Defendant Vasant Gosai, 3rd Party Plaintiff Praful Goswami, Defendant Praful Goswami, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kevin Greer, Defendant Kevin Greer, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jewayne Jones, Defendant Jewayne Jones, 3rd Party Plaintiff Robert Lincoln, Defendant Robert Lincoln, 3rd Party Plaintiff Edwin S. Moran, Defendant Edwin S. Moran, 3rd Party Plaintiff Robert Murray, Defendant Robert Murray, 3rd Party Plaintiff Aubrey Beckles, Defendant Aubrey Beckles, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kevin Bennett, Jr., Defendant Kevin Bennett, Jr., 3rd Party Plaintiff Angel Colon, Defendant Angel Colon, 3rd Party Plaintiff Shon Dixon, Defendant Shon Dixon, 3rd Party Plaintiff Myles Guilford, Defendant Myles Guilford, 3rd Party Plaintiff Denarius Hemhill, Defendant Denarius Hemhill, 3rd Party Plaintiff Ronald Jeter, Defendant Ronald Jeter, 3rd Party Plaintiff Corey Joseph, Defendant Corey Joseph, 3rd Party Plaintiff Eric LaSure, Defendant Eric LaSure, 3rd Party Plaintiff Dennis Leonard, Defendant Dennis Leonard, 3rd Party Plaintiff Marcos Lopez, Defendant Marcos Lopez, 3rd Party Plaintiff Carter Mangan, Defendant Carter Mangan, 3rd Party Plaintiff Lamont Nickerson, Defendant Lamont Nickerson, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jesse Quadrel, Defendant Jesse Quadrel, 3rd Party Plaintiff Majeedah Shariah, Defendant Majeedah Shariah, Counter-Defendant NWCDC
24 24 misc Certification of Non Compliance Tue 03/15 10:20 AM
Certification of Non Compliance Related [+] filed by David M Hoffman on behalf of David Hoffman. (clb)
Related: [-] 22 Memorandum of Law in Response to (related document:13 Motion For Summary Judgment RE: as to Liability and Damages on Account of Severance, Vacation, and Sick Pay Together With Whatever is Determined to be Their Pension Plan Entitlement in favor of Defendant-CounterClaimant and against Plaintiff. Filed by Michael Awertschenko.Hearing scheduled for 2/16/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Certification # 2 Memorandum of Law # 3 Proposed Order) (rah) filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko,16 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, Production of Documents, and Scheduling of Depositions (Attachments: # 1 Certification in Support # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Proposed Order) (jf),19 Cross Motion (related document:13 Motion For Summary Judgment RE: as to Liability and Damages on Account of Severance, Vacation, and Sick Pay Together With Whatever is Determined to be Their Pension Plan Entitlement in favor of Defendant-CounterClaimant and against Plaintiff. filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko) Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation.Hearing scheduled for 3/1/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment # 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts # 3 Exhibit A to Statement # 4 Exhibit B to Statement # 5 Exhibit C to Statement (Part 1) # 6 Exhibit C to Statement (Part 2) # 7 Exhibit D to Statement # 8 Exhibit E to Statement # 9 Exhibit F to Statement (Part 1) # 10 Exhibit F to Statement (Part 2) # 11 Exhibit F to Statement (Part 3) # 12 Exhibit F to Statement (Part 4) # 13 Exhibit G to Statement # 14 Certification of Joseph Hartnett # 15 Memorandum of Law) filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation,20 Certification in Opposition to (related document:16 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, Production of Documents, and Scheduling of Depositions (Attachments: # 1 Certification in Support # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Proposed Order) (jf)) filed by Daniel Stolz on behalf of Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Certification) filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation) filed by David M Hoffman on behalf of Michael Awertschenko, Marvin Bailey, Arthur Beauchamp, Aubrey Beckles, Kevin Bennett, Jr., Karrim Beverett, Jacqueline P. Brown, Angel Colon, Shon Dixon, Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Darnell Frost, Vasant Gosai, Praful Goswami, Kevin Greer, Myles Guilford, Denarius Hemhill, Aniyan Jacob, Ronald Jeter, Jewayne Jones, Corey Joseph, Eric LaSure, Dennis Leonard, Robert Lincoln, Marcos Lopez, Carter Mangan, Edwin S. Moran, Robert Murray, Al-Hassan Neblett, Lamont Nickerson, Jesse Quadrel. (clb) filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Aniyan Jacob, Defendant Aniyan Jacob, 3rd Party Plaintiff Al-Hassan Neblett, Defendant Al-Hassan Neblett, 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko, 3rd Party Plaintiff Marvin Bailey, Defendant Marvin Bailey, 3rd Party Plaintiff Arthur Beauchamp, Defendant Arthur Beauchamp, 3rd Party Plaintiff Karrim Beverett, Defendant Karrim Beverett, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jacqueline P. Brown, Defendant Jacqueline P. Brown, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Defendant Kovao-Eric Ekoue, 3rd Party Plaintiff Vasant Gosai, Defendant Vasant Gosai, 3rd Party Plaintiff Praful Goswami, Defendant Praful Goswami, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kevin Greer, Defendant Kevin Greer, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jewayne Jones, Defendant Jewayne Jones, 3rd Party Plaintiff Robert Lincoln, Defendant Robert Lincoln, 3rd Party Plaintiff Edwin S. Moran, Defendant Edwin S. Moran, 3rd Party Plaintiff Robert Murray, Defendant Robert Murray, 3rd Party Plaintiff Aubrey Beckles, Defendant Aubrey Beckles, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kevin Bennett, Jr., Defendant Kevin Bennett, Jr., 3rd Party Plaintiff Angel Colon, Defendant Angel Colon, 3rd Party Plaintiff Shon Dixon, Defendant Shon Dixon, 3rd Party Plaintiff Darnell Frost, Defendant Darnell Frost, 3rd Party Plaintiff Myles Guilford, Defendant Myles Guilford, 3rd Party Plaintiff Denarius Hemhill, Defendant Denarius Hemhill, 3rd Party Plaintiff Ronald Jeter, Defendant Ronald Jeter, 3rd Party Plaintiff Corey Joseph, Defendant Corey Joseph, 3rd Party Plaintiff Eric LaSure, Defendant Eric LaSure, 3rd Party Plaintiff Dennis Leonard, Defendant Dennis Leonard, 3rd Party Plaintiff Marcos Lopez, Defendant Marcos Lopez, 3rd Party Plaintiff Carter Mangan, Defendant Carter Mangan, 3rd Party Plaintiff Lamont Nickerson, Defendant Lamont Nickerson, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jesse Quadrel, Defendant Jesse Quadrel
23 23 misc Support Tue 03/15 10:17 AM
Certification in support of Related [+] filed by David M Hoffman on behalf of Michael Awertschenko, Marvin Bailey, Arthur Beauchamp, Aubrey Beckles, Kevin Bennett, Jr., Karrim Beverett, Jacqueline P. Brown, Angel Colon, Shon Dixon, Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Vasant Gosai, Praful Goswami, Kevin Greer, Myles Guilford, Denarius Hemhill, Aniyan Jacob, Ronald Jeter, Jewayne Jones, Corey Joseph, Eric LaSure, Dennis Leonard, Robert Lincoln, Marcos Lopez, Carter Mangan, Edwin S. Moran, Robert Murray, NWCDC, Al-Hassan Neblett, Lamont Nickerson, Jesse Quadrel, Majeedah Shariah, Edwin Stier. (clb) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2016 (clb)
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko,16 Motion to Compel
22 22 answer Response Tue 03/15 10:15 AM
Memorandum of Law in Response to Related [+] filed by David M Hoffman on behalf of Michael Awertschenko, Marvin Bailey, Arthur Beauchamp, Aubrey Beckles, Kevin Bennett, Jr., Karrim Beverett, Jacqueline P. Brown, Angel Colon, Shon Dixon, Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Darnell Frost, Vasant Gosai, Praful Goswami, Kevin Greer, Myles Guilford, Denarius Hemhill, Aniyan Jacob, Ronald Jeter, Jewayne Jones, Corey Joseph, Eric LaSure, Dennis Leonard, Robert Lincoln, Marcos Lopez, Carter Mangan, Edwin S. Moran, Robert Murray, Al-Hassan Neblett, Lamont Nickerson, Jesse Quadrel. (clb)
Related: [-] 13 Motion For Summary Judgment RE: as to Liability and Damages on Account of Severance, Vacation, and Sick Pay Together With Whatever is Determined to be Their Pension Plan Entitlement in favor of Defendant-CounterClaimant and against Plaintiff. Filed by Michael Awertschenko.Hearing scheduled for 2/16/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Certification # 2 Memorandum of Law # 3 Proposed Order) (rah) filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko,16 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, Production of Documents, and Scheduling of Depositions (Attachments: # 1 Certification in Support # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Proposed Order) (jf),19 Cross Motion (related document:13 Motion For Summary Judgment RE: as to Liability and Damages on Account of Severance, Vacation, and Sick Pay Together With Whatever is Determined to be Their Pension Plan Entitlement in favor of Defendant-CounterClaimant and against Plaintiff. filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko) Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation.Hearing scheduled for 3/1/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment # 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts # 3 Exhibit A to Statement # 4 Exhibit B to Statement # 5 Exhibit C to Statement (Part 1) # 6 Exhibit C to Statement (Part 2) # 7 Exhibit D to Statement # 8 Exhibit E to Statement # 9 Exhibit F to Statement (Part 1) # 10 Exhibit F to Statement (Part 2) # 11 Exhibit F to Statement (Part 3) # 12 Exhibit F to Statement (Part 4) # 13 Exhibit G to Statement # 14 Certification of Joseph Hartnett # 15 Memorandum of Law) filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation,20 Certification in Opposition to (related document:16 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, Production of Documents, and Scheduling of Depositions (Attachments: # 1 Certification in Support # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Proposed Order) (jf)) filed by Daniel Stolz on behalf of Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Certification) filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
Tuesday, March 01, 2016
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 03/01 3:31 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 3/1/2016 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp )
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Awertschenko
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 03/01 3:32 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 3/1/2016 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp )
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 03/01 3:33 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 3/1/2016 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp )
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Compel
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 03/01 3:33 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 3/1/2016 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp )
Related: [-] 19 Cross Motion filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
Friday, February 26, 2016
21 21 misc Document Fri 02/26 1:04 PM
Document re: Letter to the Honorable Vincent F. Papalia Confirming Adjournment Related [+] filed by Daniel Stolz on behalf of Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation. (Stolz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko,16 Motion to Compel,19 Cross Motion filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
Monday, February 22, 2016
20 20 answer Opposition Mon 02/22 12:51 PM
Certification in Opposition to Related [+] filed by Daniel Stolz on behalf of Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation. (Stolz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, Production of Documents, and Scheduling of Depositions (Attachments: # 1 Certification in Support # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Proposed Order) (jf)
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Certification
19 19 motion Cross Motion Mon 02/22 12:44 PM
Cross Motion Related [+] Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation.Hearing scheduled for 3/1/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Stolz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 13 Motion For Summary Judgment RE: as to Liability and Damages on Account of Severance, Vacation, and Sick Pay Together With Whatever is Determined to be Their Pension Plan Entitlement in favor of Defendant-CounterClaimant and against Plaintiff. filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko
Att: 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment
Att: 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Statement
Att: 4 Exhibit B to Statement
Att: 5 Exhibit C to Statement (Part 1)
Att: 6 Exhibit C to Statement (Part 2)
Att: 7 Exhibit D to Statement
Att: 8 Exhibit E to Statement
Att: 9 Exhibit F to Statement (Part 1)
Att: 10 Exhibit F to Statement (Part 2)
Att: 11 Exhibit F to Statement (Part 3)
Att: 12 Exhibit F to Statement (Part 4)
Att: 13 Exhibit G to Statement
Att: 14 Certification of Joseph Hartnett
Att: 15 21 pgs Memorandum of Law
Thursday, February 11, 2016
court Notice of Returned Mail Thu 02/11 2:16 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Marvin Bailey, Denarius Hemhill , Related [+] (dmc)
Related: [-] 11 Order (Generic)
court Notice of Returned Mail Thu 02/11 2:21 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Myles Guilford , Related [+] (dmc)
Related: [-] 11 Order (Generic)
Wednesday, February 10, 2016
court Hearing Scheduled (Document) Wed 02/10 11:39 AM
Hearing Scheduled. Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 3/1/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (jf)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, Production of Documents, and Scheduling of Depositions (Attachments: # 1 Certification in Support # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Proposed Order) (jf)
Monday, February 08, 2016
18 18 misc Certification of Non Compliance Wed 02/10 11:41 AM
Certification of Non Compliance Related [+] filed by David M Hoffman. (jf)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, Production of Documents, and Scheduling of Depositions (Attachments: # 1 Certification in Support # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Proposed Order) (jf)
17 17 misc Correspondence Wed 02/10 11:33 AM
Correspondence re: Letter in Support Related [+] filed by David M Hoffman. (jf)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Compel. (Attachments: # 1 Certification in Support # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Proposed Order) (jf)
16 16 motion Compel Wed 02/10 11:31 AM
Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, Production of Documents, and Scheduling of Depositions (jf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification in Support
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Monday, February 01, 2016
15 15 court Determination of Adjournment Request Mon 02/01 3:13 PM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to 3/1/2016 @ 10:00am. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. Related [+] (jf)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued,13 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 02/01 3:14 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 2/16/2016 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/01/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (jf )
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Awertschenko
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 02/01 3:14 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 2/16/2016 Related [+] Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 03/01/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (jf )
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, January 28, 2016
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 01/28 3:03 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 1/28/2016 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 02/16/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp )
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
14 14 misc Certification of Non Compliance Thu 01/21 1:55 PM
Certification of Non Compliance Related [+] filed by David M Hoffman on behalf of David Hoffman. (rah)
Related: [-] 13 Motion For Summary Judgment RE: as to Liability and Damages on Account of Severance, Vacation, and Sick Pay Together With Whatever is Determined to be Their Pension Plan Entitlement in favor of Defendant-CounterClaimant and against Plaintiff. Filed by Michael Awertschenko.Hearing scheduled for 2/16/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Certification # 2 Memorandum of Law # 3 Proposed Order) (rah) filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko
13 13 motion Summary Judgment Thu 01/21 1:54 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment RE: as to Liability and Damages on Account of Severance, Vacation, and Sick Pay Together With Whatever is Determined to be Their Pension Plan Entitlement in favor of Defendant-CounterClaimant and against Plaintiff. Filed by Michael Awertschenko.Hearing scheduled for 2/16/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (rah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
Att: 2 10 pgs Memorandum of Law
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, December 25, 2015
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 12/26 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 33. Notice Date 12/25/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2015
11 11 order Motion (Generic) Wed 12/23 4:04 PM
Order Dismissing Count Two of Counterclaim and for Other Relief Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/17/2015. (jf)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, December 15, 2015
court Hearing Held Thu 12/17 10:17 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Order to be Submitted Related [+] (mcp )
Related: [-] 7 Motion (Generic) filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
Friday, December 11, 2015
10 10 answer Response Fri 12/11 2:35 PM
Response to Related [+] filed by Daniel Stolz on behalf of Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation. (Stolz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 7 Motion re: Dismissing Count Two of Counterclaim Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation.Hearing scheduled for 12/1/2015 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Application in Support of Motion # 2 Exhibit A to Motion # 3 Proposed Order Dismissing Count Two of Counterclaim) filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation,8 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to (related document:7 Motion re: Dismissing Count Two of Counterclaim Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation.Hearing scheduled for 12/1/2015 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Application in Support of Motion # 2 Exhibit A to Motion # 3 Proposed Order Dismissing Count Two of Counterclaim) filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation) filed by David M Hoffman on behalf of Michael Awertschenko, Marvin Bailey, Arthur Beauchamp, Aubrey Beckles, Kevin Bennett, Jr., Karrim Beverett, Jacqueline P. Brown, Angel Colon, Shon Dixon, Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Darnell Frost, Vasant Gosai, Praful Goswami, Kevin Greer, Myles Guilford, Denarius Hemhill, Aniyan Jacob, Ronald Jeter, Jewayne Jones, Corey Joseph, Eric LaSure, Dennis Leonard, Robert Lincoln, Marcos Lopez, Carter Mangan, Edwin S. Moran, Robert Murray, NWCDC, Al-Hassan Neblett, Lamont Nickerson, Jesse Quadrel, Majeedah Shariah. (Attachments: # 1 Certification # 2 Certification) (clb) filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Aniyan Jacob, Defendant Aniyan Jacob, 3rd Party Plaintiff Al-Hassan Neblett, Defendant Al-Hassan Neblett, 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko, 3rd Party Plaintiff Marvin Bailey, Defendant Marvin Bailey, 3rd Party Plaintiff Arthur Beauchamp, Defendant Arthur Beauchamp, 3rd Party Plaintiff Karrim Beverett, Defendant Karrim Beverett, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jacqueline P. Brown, Defendant Jacqueline P. Brown, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Defendant Kovao-Eric Ekoue, 3rd Party Plaintiff Vasant Gosai, Defendant Vasant Gosai, 3rd Party Plaintiff Praful Goswami, Defendant Praful Goswami, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kevin Greer, Defendant Kevin Greer, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jewayne Jones, Defendant Jewayne Jones, 3rd Party Plaintiff Robert Lincoln, Defendant Robert Lincoln, 3rd Party Plaintiff Edwin S. Moran, Defendant Edwin S. Moran, 3rd Party Plaintiff Robert Murray, Defendant Robert Murray, 3rd Party Plaintiff Aubrey Beckles, Defendant Aubrey Beckles, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kevin Bennett, Jr., Defendant Kevin Bennett, Jr., 3rd Party Plaintiff Angel Colon, Defendant Angel Colon, 3rd Party Plaintiff Shon Dixon, Defendant Shon Dixon, 3rd Party Plaintiff Darnell Frost, Defendant Darnell Frost, 3rd Party Plaintiff Myles Guilford, Defendant Myles Guilford, 3rd Party Plaintiff Denarius Hemhill, Defendant Denarius Hemhill, 3rd Party Plaintiff Ronald Jeter, Defendant Ronald Jeter, 3rd Party Plaintiff Corey Joseph, Defendant Corey Joseph, 3rd Party Plaintiff Eric LaSure, Defendant Eric LaSure, 3rd Party Plaintiff Dennis Leonard, Defendant Dennis Leonard, 3rd Party Plaintiff Marcos Lopez, Defendant Marcos Lopez, 3rd Party Plaintiff Carter Mangan, Defendant Carter Mangan, 3rd Party Plaintiff Lamont Nickerson, Defendant Lamont Nickerson, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jesse Quadrel, Defendant Jesse Quadrel, 3rd Party Plaintiff Majeedah Shariah, Defendant Majeedah Shariah, Counter-Defendant NWCDC
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit B - 1
Att: 4 Exhibit B-2
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex B3
Att: 6 Exhibit C
Thursday, December 10, 2015
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 12/22 4:52 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 12/10/2015 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2016 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp )
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, December 04, 2015
9 9 misc Certification of Non Compliance Mon 12/07 10:43 AM
Certification of Non Compliance Related [+] filed by David M Hoffman on behalf of David Hoffman. (clb)
Related: [-] 8 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to (related document:7 Motion re: Dismissing Count Two of Counterclaim Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation.Hearing scheduled for 12/1/2015 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Application in Support of Motion # 2 Exhibit A to Motion # 3 Proposed Order Dismissing Count Two of Counterclaim) filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation) filed by David M Hoffman on behalf of Michael Awertschenko, Marvin Bailey, Arthur Beauchamp, Aubrey Beckles, Kevin Bennett, Jr., Karrim Beverett, Jacqueline P. Brown, Angel Colon, Shon Dixon, Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Darnell Frost, Vasant Gosai, Praful Goswami, Kevin Greer, Myles Guilford, Denarius Hemhill, Aniyan Jacob, Ronald Jeter, Jewayne Jones, Corey Joseph, Eric LaSure, Dennis Leonard, Robert Lincoln, Marcos Lopez, Carter Mangan, Edwin S. Moran, Robert Murray, NWCDC, Al-Hassan Neblett, Lamont Nickerson, Jesse Quadrel, Majeedah Shariah. (Attachments: # 1 Certification # 2 Certification) (clb) filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Aniyan Jacob, Defendant Aniyan Jacob, 3rd Party Plaintiff Al-Hassan Neblett, Defendant Al-Hassan Neblett, 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko, 3rd Party Plaintiff Marvin Bailey, Defendant Marvin Bailey, 3rd Party Plaintiff Arthur Beauchamp, Defendant Arthur Beauchamp, 3rd Party Plaintiff Karrim Beverett, Defendant Karrim Beverett, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jacqueline P. Brown, Defendant Jacqueline P. Brown, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Defendant Kovao-Eric Ekoue, 3rd Party Plaintiff Vasant Gosai, Defendant Vasant Gosai, 3rd Party Plaintiff Praful Goswami, Defendant Praful Goswami, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kevin Greer, Defendant Kevin Greer, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jewayne Jones, Defendant Jewayne Jones, 3rd Party Plaintiff Robert Lincoln, Defendant Robert Lincoln, 3rd Party Plaintiff Edwin S. Moran, Defendant Edwin S. Moran, 3rd Party Plaintiff Robert Murray, Defendant Robert Murray, 3rd Party Plaintiff Aubrey Beckles, Defendant Aubrey Beckles, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kevin Bennett, Jr., Defendant Kevin Bennett, Jr., 3rd Party Plaintiff Angel Colon, Defendant Angel Colon, 3rd Party Plaintiff Shon Dixon, Defendant Shon Dixon, 3rd Party Plaintiff Darnell Frost, Defendant Darnell Frost, 3rd Party Plaintiff Myles Guilford, Defendant Myles Guilford, 3rd Party Plaintiff Denarius Hemhill, Defendant Denarius Hemhill, 3rd Party Plaintiff Ronald Jeter, Defendant Ronald Jeter, 3rd Party Plaintiff Corey Joseph, Defendant Corey Joseph, 3rd Party Plaintiff Eric LaSure, Defendant Eric LaSure, 3rd Party Plaintiff Dennis Leonard, Defendant Dennis Leonard, 3rd Party Plaintiff Marcos Lopez, Defendant Marcos Lopez, 3rd Party Plaintiff Carter Mangan, Defendant Carter Mangan, 3rd Party Plaintiff Lamont Nickerson, Defendant Lamont Nickerson, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jesse Quadrel, Defendant Jesse Quadrel, 3rd Party Plaintiff Majeedah Shariah, Defendant Majeedah Shariah, Counter-Defendant NWCDC
8 8 answer Opposition Mon 12/07 10:41 AM
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Related [+] filed by David M Hoffman on behalf of Michael Awertschenko, Marvin Bailey, Arthur Beauchamp, Aubrey Beckles, Kevin Bennett, Jr., Karrim Beverett, Jacqueline P. Brown, Angel Colon, Shon Dixon, Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Darnell Frost, Vasant Gosai, Praful Goswami, Kevin Greer, Myles Guilford, Denarius Hemhill, Aniyan Jacob, Ronald Jeter, Jewayne Jones, Corey Joseph, Eric LaSure, Dennis Leonard, Robert Lincoln, Marcos Lopez, Carter Mangan, Edwin S. Moran, Robert Murray, NWCDC, Al-Hassan Neblett, Lamont Nickerson, Jesse Quadrel, Majeedah Shariah. (clb)
Related: [-] 7 Motion re: Dismissing Count Two of Counterclaim Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation.Hearing scheduled for 12/1/2015 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Application in Support of Motion # 2 Exhibit A to Motion # 3 Proposed Order Dismissing Count Two of Counterclaim) filed by Plaintiff Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation
Att: 1 Certification
Att: 2 Certification
Tuesday, November 17, 2015
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 11/17 1:48 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 12/1/2015 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2015 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (jf )
Related: [-] 7 Motion re: Dismissing Count Two of Counterclaim Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Application in Support of Motion # 2 Exhibit A to Motion # 3 Proposed Order Dismissing Count Two of Counterclaim) (Stolz, Daniel) (EOD: 11/06/2015)
Friday, November 06, 2015
7 7 motion Motion (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable Fri 11/06 1:29 PM
Motion re: Dismissing Count Two of Counterclaim Filed by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation.Hearing scheduled for 12/1/2015 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Stolz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application in Support of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion
Att: 3 Proposed Order Dismissing Count Two of Counterclaim
Monday, October 19, 2015
6 6 misc Document Tue 10/20 9:25 AM
Document re: Letter consenting to an Order waiving his clients' right to appeal (oral argument) filed by David M Hoffman on behalf of Michael Awertschenko, Marvin Bailey, Arthur Beauchamp, Aubrey Beckles, Kevin Bennett, Jr., Karrim Beverett, Jacqueline P. Brown, Angel Colon, Shon Dixon, Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Darnell Frost, Vasant Gosai, Praful Goswami, Kevin Greer, Myles Guilford, Denarius Hemhill, Aniyan Jacob, Ronald Jeter, Jewayne Jones, Corey Joseph, Eric LaSure, Dennis Leonard, Robert Lincoln, Marcos Lopez, Carter Mangan, Edwin S. Moran, Robert Murray, NWCDC, Al-Hassan Neblett, Lamont Nickerson, Jesse Quadrel, Majeedah Shariah, Edwin Stier. (clb)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Support Tue 10/20 9:21 AM
Amended Answer & Counterclaim in support of Related [+] filed by David M Hoffman on behalf of Michael Awertschenko, Marvin Bailey, Arthur Beauchamp, Aubrey Beckles, Kevin Bennett, Jr., Karrim Beverett, Jacqueline P. Brown, Angel Colon, Shon Dixon, Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Darnell Frost, Vasant Gosai, Praful Goswami, Kevin Greer, Myles Guilford, Denarius Hemhill, Aniyan Jacob, Ronald Jeter, Jewayne Jones, Corey Joseph, Eric LaSure, Dennis Leonard, Robert Lincoln, Marcos Lopez, Carter Mangan, Edwin S. Moran, Robert Murray, NWCDC, Al-Hassan Neblett, Lamont Nickerson, Jesse Quadrel, Majeedah Shariah, Edwin Stier. (clb)
Related: [-] 3 Answer to Complaint filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Aniyan Jacob, Defendant Aniyan Jacob, 3rd Party Plaintiff Al-Hassan Neblett, Defendant Al-Hassan Neblett, 3rd Party Plaintiff Michael Awertschenko, Defendant Michael Awertschenko, 3rd Party Plaintiff Marvin Bailey, Defendant Marvin Bailey, 3rd Party Plaintiff Arthur Beauchamp, Defendant Arthur Beauchamp, 3rd Party Plaintiff Karrim Beverett, Defendant Karrim Beverett, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jacqueline P. Brown, Defendant Jacqueline P. Brown, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Defendant Kovao-Eric Ekoue, 3rd Party Plaintiff Vasant Gosai, Defendant Vasant Gosai, 3rd Party Plaintiff Praful Goswami, Defendant Praful Goswami, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kevin Greer, Defendant Kevin Greer, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jewayne Jones, Defendant Jewayne Jones, 3rd Party Plaintiff Robert Lincoln, Defendant Robert Lincoln, 3rd Party Plaintiff Edwin S. Moran, Defendant Edwin S. Moran, 3rd Party Plaintiff Robert Murray, Defendant Robert Murray, 3rd Party Plaintiff Aubrey Beckles, Defendant Aubrey Beckles, 3rd Party Plaintiff Kevin Bennett, Jr., Defendant Kevin Bennett, Jr., 3rd Party Plaintiff Angel Colon, Defendant Angel Colon, 3rd Party Plaintiff Shon Dixon, Defendant Shon Dixon, 3rd Party Plaintiff Darnell Frost, Defendant Darnell Frost, 3rd Party Plaintiff Myles Guilford, Defendant Myles Guilford, 3rd Party Plaintiff Denarius Hemhill, Defendant Denarius Hemhill, 3rd Party Plaintiff Ronald Jeter, Defendant Ronald Jeter, 3rd Party Plaintiff Corey Joseph, Defendant Corey Joseph, 3rd Party Plaintiff Eric LaSure, Defendant Eric LaSure, 3rd Party Plaintiff Dennis Leonard, Defendant Dennis Leonard, 3rd Party Plaintiff Marcos Lopez, Defendant Marcos Lopez, 3rd Party Plaintiff Carter Mangan, Defendant Carter Mangan, 3rd Party Plaintiff Lamont Nickerson, Defendant Lamont Nickerson, 3rd Party Plaintiff Jesse Quadrel, Defendant Jesse Quadrel, 3rd Party Plaintiff Majeedah Shariah, Defendant Majeedah Shariah, Counterclaim, Third-Party Complaint
Tuesday, October 13, 2015
4 4 court Summons Issued Tue 10/13 2:37 PM
Third Party Summons Issued to David Hoffman on behalf of Third Party Plaintiffs for Service on Edwin Stier, Answer due on 11/12/2015; Honorable Dorothea Wefing, Answer due on 11/12/2015; Honorable James R. Zazzali, Answer due on 11/12/2015. (clb)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer|cmp|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim|Third-Party Complaint Tue 10/13 2:23 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by David M Hoffman on behalf of Michael Awertschenko, Marvin Bailey, Arthur Beauchamp, Aubrey Beckles, Kevin Bennett, Jr., Karrim Beverett, Jacqueline P. Brown, Angel Colon, Shon Dixon, Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Darnell Frost, Vasant Gosai, Praful Goswami, Kevin Greer, Myles Guilford, Denarius Hemhill, Aniyan Jacob, Ronald Jeter, Jewayne Jones, Corey Joseph, Eric LaSure, Dennis Leonard, Robert Lincoln, Marcos Lopez, Carter Mangan, Edwin S. Moran, Robert Murray, Al-Hassan Neblett, Lamont Nickerson, Jesse Quadrel, Majeedah Shariah, Counterclaim by David M Hoffman on behalf of Michael Awertschenko, Marvin Bailey, Arthur Beauchamp, Aubrey Beckles, Kevin Bennett, Jr., Karrim Beverett, Jacqueline P. Brown, Angel Colon, Shon Dixon, Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Darnell Frost, Vasant Gosai, Praful Goswami, Kevin Greer, Myles Guilford, Denarius Hemhill, Aniyan Jacob, Ronald Jeter, Jewayne Jones, Corey Joseph, Eric LaSure, Dennis Leonard, Robert Lincoln, Marcos Lopez, Carter Mangan, Edwin S. Moran, Robert Murray, Al-Hassan Neblett, Lamont Nickerson, Jesse Quadrel, Majeedah Shariah against NWCDC , Third-Party Complaint by David M Hoffman on behalf of Michael Awertschenko, Marvin Bailey, Arthur Beauchamp, Aubrey Beckles, Kevin Bennett, Jr., Karrim Beverett, Jacqueline P. Brown, Angel Colon, Shon Dixon, Kovao-Eric Ekoue, Darnell Frost, Vasant Gosai, Praful Goswami, Kevin Greer, Myles Guilford, Denarius Hemhill, Aniyan Jacob, Ronald Jeter, Jewayne Jones, Corey Joseph, Eric LaSure, Dennis Leonard, Robert Lincoln, Marcos Lopez, Carter Mangan, Edwin S. Moran, Robert Murray, Al-Hassan Neblett, Lamont Nickerson, Jesse Quadrel, Majeedah Shariah against Edwin Stier, Dorothea Wefing, James R. Zazzali. (clb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 10/06 2:07 PM
Summons Issued to Newark Watershed Conservation & Development Corp. for Service on Michael Awertschenko Answer due on 11/5/2015; Marvin Bailey Answer due on 11/5/2015; Arthur Beauchamp Answer due on 11/5/2015; Aubrey Beckles Answer due on 11/5/2015; Kevin Bennett, Jr. Answer due on 11/5/2015; Karrim Beverett Answer due on 11/5/2015; Jacqueline P. Brown Answer due on 11/5/2015; Angel Colon Answer due on 11/5/2015; Shon Dixon Answer due on 11/5/2015; Kovao-Eric Ekoue Answer due on 11/5/2015; Darnell Frost Answer due on 11/5/2015; Vasant Gosai Answer due on 11/5/2015; Praful Goswami Answer due on 11/5/2015; Kevin Greer Answer due on 11/5/2015; Myles Guilford Answer due on 11/5/2015; Denarius Hemhill Answer due on 11/5/2015; Aniyan Jacob Answer due on 11/5/2015; Ronald Jeter Answer due on 11/5/2015; Jewayne Jones Answer due on 11/5/2015; Corey Joseph Answer due on 11/5/2015; Eric LaSure Answer due on 11/5/2015; Dennis Leonard Answer due on 11/5/2015; Robert Lincoln Answer due on 11/5/2015; Marcos Lopez Answer due on 11/5/2015; Carter Mangan Answer due on 11/5/2015; Edwin S. Moran Answer due on 11/5/2015; Robert Murray Answer due on 11/5/2015; Al-Hassan Neblett Answer due on 11/5/2015; Lamont Nickerson Answer due on 11/5/2015; Jesse Quadrel Answer due on 11/5/2015; Majeedah Shariah Answer due on 11/5/2015 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/10/2015 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (clb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Attachments
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/06 9:29 AM
Adversary case 15-02266 Complaint by Newark Watershed Conservation and Development Corporation against Michael Awertschenko ; Marvin Bailey ; Arthur Beauchamp ; Karrim Beverett ; Jacqueline P. Brown ; Kovao-Eric Ekoue ; Vasant Gosai ; Praful Goswami ; Kevin Greer ; Aniyan Jacob ; Jewayne Jones ; Robert Lincoln ; Edwin S. Moran ; Robert Murray ; Aubrey Beckles ; Kevin Bennett, Jr. ; Angel Colon ; Shon Dixon ; Darnell Frost ; Myles Guilford ; Denarius Hemhill ; Ronald Jeter ; Corey Joseph ; Eric LaSure ; Dennis Leonard ; Marcos Lopez ; Carter Mangan ; Al-Hassan Neblett ; Lamont Nickerson ; Jesse Quadrel ; Majeedah Shariah. Fee Amount $ 350.. (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Stolz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Summons
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Tue 10/06 9:30 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 15-02266 VFP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 30792992, fee amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1