Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Referred: John K Larkins, III
Case #: 1:15-cv-03541
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2015
Terminated:Feb 26, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Apr 03, 2016 4:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Appfolio, Inc.
Represented By
Diana Sarju Kim
Seyfarth Shaw, Llp-Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Valerie Ivey
Represented By
Jeffrey Sand
The Weiner Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Andrew Weiner
The Weiner Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, February 26, 2016
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 02/26 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Valerie Ivey (Sand, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Fri 02/26 4:08 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING15 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). Each party to bear its own costs and fees. (mdy)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 02/26 4:10 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge John K Larkins, III terminated from case. (mdy)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2016
14 14 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 02/12 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Appfolio, Inc. (Kim, Diana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/19 2:33 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III. Magistrate Judge Gerrilyn G. Brill no longer assigned to case. -- NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD : The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:15-cv-3541-ELR- JKL . Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case.-- (bdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2016
misc Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP Thu 01/07 1:47 PM
Clerks Notation re13 Certificate of Interested Persons. APPROVED by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mdy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2016
13 13 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 01/06 4:36 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Appfolio, Inc.. (Kim, Diana)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 01/06 4:32 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint by Appfolio, Inc.. Discovery ends on 6/6/2016.(Kim, Diana)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 01/06 2:18 PM
ORDER granting9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re7 Amended Complaint. Appfolio, Inc. Answer due 1/6/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerrilyn G. Brill on 1/5/2016. (bdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2016
10 10 discov Certificate of Service Mon 01/04 4:09 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Rule 34 Requests to Defendant by Valerie Ivey.(Sand, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 01/04 4:22 PM
Submission of9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Plaintiff's Amended Complaint . Submitted to Magistrate Judge Gerrilyn G. Brill. (bdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2015
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Mon 12/14 2:48 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Appfolio, Inc..(Kim, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, December 07, 2015
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/07 9:32 AM
ORDER granting the6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Appfolio, Inc.'s Answer due 12/22/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerrilyn G. Brill on 12/4/15. (aaq)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2015
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/02 3:42 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Appfolio, Inc.with Jury Demand, filed by Valerie Ivey.(Weiner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2015
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Tue 12/01 2:28 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, Second Extension by Appfolio, Inc..(Kim, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 28, 2015
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 10/28 2:04 PM
ORDER (by docket entry) GRANTING5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer complaint. Appfolio, Inc. Answer due 12/1/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerrilyn G. Brill on 10/28/2015. (dlm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2015
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Tue 10/27 4:29 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Appfolio, Inc..(Kim, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, October 15, 2015
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Thu 10/15 2:42 PM
Return of Service Executed by Valerie Ivey. Appfolio, Inc. served on 10/8/2015, answer due 10/29/2015. (Weiner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2015
3 3 order Order Reassigning Case Tue 10/13 5:39 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Eleanor L. Ross for all further proceedings. Judge Marvin H. Shoob no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:15-cv-03541-ELR-GGB . Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Marvin H. Shoob on 10/13/2015. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2015
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 10/06 3:48 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to AppFolio, Inc.. (eop)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/06 3:45 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Valerie Ivey. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-6082117.)(eop)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet