Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:15-cv-01072
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2015
Terminated:Aug 10, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Apr 03, 2016 4:36 AM CDT
Defendant
Safe Harbor of Nashville, LLC.
Represented By
Jeff Weintraub
Weintraub, Stock, P.C.
contact info
Gabriel P. McGaha
Fisher & Phillips, Llp (memphis Office)
contact info
Plaintiff
Trevor Cayce
Represented By
Michael L. Russell
Gilbert Russell Mcwherter Plc (franklin Tn Office)
contact info
Emily S. Emmons
Gilbert Russell Mcwherter Plc (franklin Tn Office)
contact info

GPO Dec 07 2015
ORDER granting 11 MOTION to Reschedule Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 12/16/2015 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/7/15. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, August 10, 2016
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 08/10 9:21 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Trevor Cayce. (Russell, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Wed 08/10 2:46 PM
Case Terminated per23 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Trevor Cayce. No order to enter. (dt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2016
misc Docket Annotation Mon 03/14 3:31 PM
BAR STATUS for Attorney, Gabriel P. McGaha of TN, verified as active on this date. (afs)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2016
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/11 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel P. McGaha on behalf of All Defendants (McGaha, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/11 2:20 PM
*DISREGARD ENTERED IN ERROR* NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel P. McGaha on behalf of All Defendants (McGaha, Gabriel) Modified on 3/11/2016 (dt)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Fri 03/11 2:33 PM
DISREGARD DE#21 ENTERED IN ERROR. (dt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2016
20 20 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/09 3:15 PM
ORDER SETTING BENCH TRIAL: Bench Trial set for 2/28/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 873 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2017 at 01:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Exhibit List due by 2/21/2017. Witness List due by 2/21/2017. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/21/2017. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/9/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(afs)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 03/09 1:51 PM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/5/2016. Discovery due by 9/1/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 10/3/2016. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/9/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(afs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2016
18 18 misc Proposed Case Management Order Tue 03/08 12:01 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Revised filed by Trevor Cayce. (Russell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2016
minutes Case Management Conference Mon 03/07 3:27 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger: Case Management Conference held on 3/7/2016. Plaintiff's counsel to file a revised case management order. Joint mediation report due 8/25/16. (kb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 04, 2016
17 17 misc Proposed Case Management Order Fri 03/04 2:41 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Joint Amended Proposed Case Management Order filed by All Defendants. (Weintraub, Jeff)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2016
16 16 order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 01/08 3:06 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Continue. The Case Management Conference will be reset to March 7, 2016 at 2:15 p.m.. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/8/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(afs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2016
15 15 motion Continue Thu 01/07 1:55 PM
MOTION to Continue Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference by Safe Harbor of Nashville, LLC.. (Weintraub, Jeff)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2015
14 14 order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 12/14 10:50 AM
ORDER: Motion13 GRANTED. ICMC reset for 1/7/16 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/14/15. (afs)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2015
13 13 motion Continue Fri 12/11 11:29 AM
MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Trevor Cayce. (Russell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2015
12 12 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 12/07 4:35 PM
ORDER granting11 MOTION to Reschedule Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 12/16/2015 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/7/15. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 12/07 2:24 PM
MOTION to Reschedule Case Management Conference by Safe Harbor of Nashville, LLC.. (Weintraub, Jeff)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2015
10 10 misc Proposed Case Management Order Wed 12/02 5:28 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Trevor Cayce. (Emmons, Emily)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2015
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 11/23 4:13 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Safe Harbor of Nashville, LLC. answer due 11/20/2015. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/23/15. (afs)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2015
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/20 5:10 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint by Safe Harbor of Nashville, LLC..(Weintraub, Jeff)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Fri 11/20 3:12 PM
BAR STATUS for attorney, Jeff Weintraub of TN, verified as active on this date. (afs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2015
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 11/18 8:20 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Safe Harbor of Nashville, LLC.. (Weintraub, Jeff)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2015
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 11/05 11:28 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the1 Complaint. Safe Harbor of Nashville, LLC. answer due 11/18/2015. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/5/15. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2015
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 11/04 4:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Safe Harbor of Nashville, LLC..(Weintraub, Jeff)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order will be emailed to the Judge
Wednesday, October 07, 2015
4 4 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Wed 10/07 7:39 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2015 at 03:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (afs)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/07 7:39 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (afs)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 10/07 7:37 AM
Summons issued as to Safe Harbor of Nashville, LLC, and mailed to counsel. (afs)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Wed 10/07 7:41 AM
BAR STATUS for Attorneys, Emily Emmons and Michael Russell of TN, verified as active on this date. (afs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/06 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Safe Harbor of Nashville, LLC. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2072512), filed by Trevor Cayce.(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet