California Central District Court
Case #: 2:15-cv-07816
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2015
Terminated:Oct 09, 2015
Last checked: Sunday Apr 03, 2016 2:13 AM PDT
Defendant
William Henry "Bil Cosby, Jr.
Plaintiff
Chloe Goins


1. Cosby accuser drops sexual assault lawsuit (ew.com)
Submitted Wed 02/03/2016
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, October 09, 2015
3 3 1 pgs utility Terminate Attorney Civil Case Opening - optional html form Fri 10/09 4:52 PM
In response to the opening of this case, the Clerk issued a Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Attorney Case Opening. The Notice indicated that unless counsel corrected the identified discrepancy within two business days, the docket for this case number would be closed and no further filings would be permitted under this case number. Counsel has not corrected the discrepancy. Accordingly, this case is now closed. No further filings may be made under this case number, except, if applicable, to request a refund of fees using a Form G-124, Application for Refund of Fees. Should you wish to pursue this action, a new case must be filed and a new case number issued. cc: tiffany@chunglegal.com (Case Terminated.) (car)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2015
2 2 1 pgs notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Wed 10/07 11:54 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: You have attempted to open this case electronically but have failed to upload successfully the required PDF version of any initiating document, such as a complaint or notice of removal. You must file an initiating document within two business days of this notice or the docket for this case number will be closed. cc: tiffany@chunglegal.com (car)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2015
1 1 3 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 10/06 10:03 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chloe Goins. (Chung, Tiffany)
Related: [-]