Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:August B Landis
Case #: 2:15-bk-15722
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Feb 11, 2016
Claims Deadline:Feb 10, 2016
Terminated:Aug 11, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Dec 05, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
CAPRIATI CONSTRUCTION CORP. INC.
1020 Wigwam Pkwy
Henderson, NV 89074-8162
Represented By
A.J. KUNG
contact info
BRANDY L BROWN
Kung & Associates
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11
300 LAS VEGAS BOULEVARD S. SUITE 4300
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101


Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
1084 1084 order Final Decree (Chapter 11) Tue 08/11 1:57 PM
Order Entering Final Decree (cly)
Related: [-]