ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY v. R&Q REINSURANCE COMPANY
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Berle M Schiller |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-05528 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2015 |
Re-opened: | Jun 02, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 02, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 04, 2016 4:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
R&Q REINSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, June 02, 2016 | ||
49 | 49
![]() MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO.15 ), IS GRANTED. THE CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 6/2/2106. 6/2/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
48 | 48
![]() MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 6/2/2016. 6/2/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Wednesday, May 11, 2016 | ||
47 | 47
![]() ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY TO HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER AS RELATED TO R&Q REINSURANCE COMPANY V. ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, C.A. NO. 16-CV-1473. SIGNED BY MICHAEL E. KUNZ, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/11/2016. 5/11/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
46 | 46
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY Telephone Conference held on 5/9/2016 (amas) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
45 | 45
![]() Report of Recorded Telephone Conference for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY on 5/6/16. (kw, ) |
|
Thursday, May 05, 2016 | ||
44 | 44
![]() Response To LETTER TO JUDGE SLOMSKY; FROM LLOYD A. GURA; DATED 4/25/2016 (Docket Number 42) by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (OBERMAN KHAGI, IRENE) |
|
Wednesday, May 04, 2016 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Transcript - No PDF
Wed 05/04 11:58 AM
TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING held on 3/3/16 before Judge JOEL H. SLOMSKY. Court Reporter: VERITEXT TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE.. (jaa, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 26, 2016 | ||
42 | 42
![]() LETER TO JUDGE SLOMSKY; FROM LLOYD A. GURA; DATED 4/25/2016; RE: RESPONS TO ST. PAUL'S 4/22/2016 LETTER RE: R&Q'S REQUEST THAT THE COURT DISMISS THIS SECOND-FILED ACTION IN FAVOR OF A FIRST-FILED ACTION THAT WAS RECENTLY TRANSFERRED FROM THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. (amas) |
|
41 | 41
![]() LETTER TO JUDGE SLOMSKY; FROM DAVI S. ATTISANI; DATED 4/22/2016; RE: RESPOND TO DEFENDANT R&Q REINSURANCE CO.'S 4/20 LETTER INAPPROPRIATELY REQUESTING DISMISSAL OF ST. PAUL'S AFFIRMATIVE CLAIMS CURRENTLY PENDING IN THIS COURT. (amas) |
|
40 | 40
![]() LETTER TO JUDGE SLOMSKY; FROM LLOYD A. GURA; DATED 4/20/2016; RE: THE OUTCOME OF ST. PAUL'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. (amas) |
|
39 | 39
![]() ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL DOCKET THE ATTACHED LETTERS DATED 4/20/2016, 4/22/2016, AND 4/25/2016. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 4/26/2016. 4/26/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Monday, April 25, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
![]() ORDER THAT A STATUS TELEPHONE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 5/6/2016, AT 11:30 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 4/25/2016. 4/25/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Thursday, March 03, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
![]() ORDER THAT THE 12/18/2015 ORDER DENYING THE MOTION TO STAY , IS VACATED, AND THE UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STAY THESE PROCEEDINGS (DOC. NO.15 ), IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THIS CASE IN SUSPENSE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 3/3/2016. 3/3/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
36 | 36
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY Motion Hearing held on 3/3/2016 re15 MOTION to Dismiss /In the Alternarive, Stay These Proceedings filed by R&Q REINSURANCE COMPANY Court Reporter: ESR. (amas) |
|
Monday, February 29, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
![]() Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including The Travelers Companies, Inc. by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY.(KACZYNSKI, PAOLA) |
|
Tuesday, February 09, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
![]() ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF SAMANTHA KRASNER, ESQUIRE, IRENE OBERMAN KHAGI, ESQUIRE, DIANE SEOL, ESQUIRE, ROBERT A. KOLE, ESQUIRE AND DAVID A. ATTISANI, ESQUIRE (DOC. NOS.21 ,22 ,23 ,24 AND25 ), ARE GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 2/9/2016.2/9/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL WITH ECF APPLICATIONS AND E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Monday, February 08, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
![]() (FILED IN ERROR AS DUPLICATE) APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF SAMANTHA KRASNER, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. SPONSER STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. ($40.00 FILING FEE RECEIVED, RECEIPT #135113) (amas) Modified on 2/9/2016 (amas ) |
|
32 | 32
![]() (FILED IN ERROR AS DUPLICATE) APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DIANE SEOL, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. SPONSER STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. ($40.00 FILING FEE RECEIVED, RECEIPT #135113) (amas) Modified on 2/9/2016 (amas ) |
|
31 | 31
![]() (FILED IN ERROR AS DUPLICATE) APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DAVID A. ATTISANI, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. SPONSER STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. ($40.00 FILING FEE RECEIVED, RECEIPT #135113) (amas) Modified on 2/9/2016 (amas ) |
|
Thursday, February 04, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
![]() APPLICATION/PETITION Application for Attorneys to Practice in this Court - David Attisani, Esquire by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (KACZYNSKI, PAOLA) |
|
29 | 29
![]() APPLICATION/PETITION for Attorney Seek Practice to this Court - Robert A. Kole, Esquire by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (KACZYNSKI, PAOLA) |
|
28 | 28
![]() APPLICATION/PETITION of Diane Seol, Esquire to Practice in this Court, fee is being sent to the Court under separate cover by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (KACZYNSKI, PAOLA) |
|
27 | 27
![]() APPLICATION/PETITION of Irene Oberman Khagi, Esquire to Practice in this Court, fee is being sent to the Court under separate cover by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (KACZYNSKI, PAOLA) |
|
26 | 26
![]() APPLICATION/PETITION of Samantha Krasner, Esquire to Practice in Eastern District application fee to be sent to the Court under separate cover by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (KACZYNSKI, PAOLA) |
|
25 | 25
![]() MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of David A. Attisani, Esquire filed by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY.Order, Verified Application.(KACZYNSKI, PAOLA) |
|
24 | 24
![]() MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Robert A. Kole, Esquire filed by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY.Order, Verified Application.(KACZYNSKI, PAOLA) |
|
23 | 23
![]() MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Diane Seol, Esquire filed by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY.Order, Verified Application.(KACZYNSKI, PAOLA) |
|
22 | 22
![]() MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Irene Oberman Khagi filed by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY.Order and Verified Application.(KACZYNSKI, PAOLA) |
|
21 | 21
![]() MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Samatha Krasner, Esquire filed by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY.Order, Verified Application.(KACZYNSKI, PAOLA) |
|
Wednesday, January 20, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
![]() RESPONSE in Support re15 MOTION to Dismiss /In the Alternarive, Stay These Proceedings filed by R&Q REINSURANCE COMPANY. (HINO, MICHAEL) |
|
Friday, January 15, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER THAT A HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO.15 ) WILL BE HELD ON 3/3/2016, AT 10:00 AM, IN COURTROOM 13A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 1/15/2016. 1/15/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss /In the Alternarive, Stay These Proceedings filed by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY.(KACZYNSKI, PAOLA) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Att: 18
![]() |
||
Att: 19
![]() |
||
Att: 20
![]() |
||
Att: 21
![]() |
||
Att: 22
![]() |
||
Friday, December 18, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS , BY 1/13/2016. THE UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STAY INCLUDED AS PART OF DOC. NO.15 ), IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 12/18/2015. 12/18/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Thursday, December 17, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
![]() RESPONSE in Support re15 MOTION to Dismiss /In the Alternarive, Stay These Proceedings filed by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY.(KACZYNSKI, PAOLA) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, December 16, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
![]() MOTION to Dismiss /In the Alternarive, Stay These Proceedings filed by R&Q REINSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum of Law in Support and Certificate of Service.(HINO, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Friday, December 11, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER THAT THE PARTIES STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY THIRTY (30) DAYS, RECEIVED BY THE COURT ON DECEMBER 10, 2015, IS DENIED. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY DECEMBER 16, 2015. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 12/10/15. 12/11/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 12/11/2015 (jaa, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MICHAEL H. GOLDSTEIN, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO.7 ), IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 12/9/2015.12/10/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
12 | 12
![]() ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF LLOYD GURA, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO.8 ), IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 12/9/2015.12/10/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Tuesday, December 01, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF NICHOLAS H. HORSMON (DOC. NO.6 ), IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 12/1/2015.12/1/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Friday, November 13, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT INA REINSURANCE COMPANY IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 12/12/2015, TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 11/13/2015. 11/13/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
9 | 9
![]() ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (DOC. NO.4 ), IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 11/13/2015.11/13/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Tuesday, November 10, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
![]() MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of LLoyd Gura filed by R&Q REINSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(HINO, MICHAEL) |
|
7 | 7
![]() MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michael H. Goldstein filed by R&Q REINSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(HINO, MICHAEL) |
|
6 | 6
![]() MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas H. Horsmon filed by R&Q REINSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(HINO, MICHAEL) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Randall & Quilter Investment Holdings, Ltd., a Bermuda domiciled company which is publically traded in the United Kingdowm by R&Q REINSURANCE COMPANY.(HINO, MICHAEL) |
|
4 | 4
![]() MOTION to Stay /UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS filed by R&Q REINSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service and Certificate of Counsel.(HINO, MICHAEL) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Randall & Quilter Investment Holdings, Ltd.. a Bermuda domiciled company whis is publicly traded in the United Kingdom by R&Q REINSURANCE COMPANY.(HINO, MICHAEL) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
![]() AFFIDAVIT of Service by John D. Scanlon re: served Complaint upon Chris Reichow by Personal on 10/22/2015 (KACZYNSKI, PAOLA) |
|
Wednesday, October 07, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against R&Q REINSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE128714), filed by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY.(jmv, ) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Thu 10/08 10:05 AM
Summons Issued as to R&Q REINSURANCE COMPANY. Forwarded To: 1 Orig mailed to counsel on 10/8/15 (jmv, ) |