Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Roy B Dalton, Jr
Referred: Leslie Hoffman Price
Case #: 6:15-cv-01698
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2015
Re-opened:May 08, 2017
Terminated:Aug 01, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 05, 2016 5:30 AM EDT
Defendant
New Destiny Christian Center Church, Inc.
Represented By
Erica K. Williams
Guideone Insurance
contact info
Eric Vincent Hires
Law Office Of Eric V. Hires, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Paula Michelle Ministries, Inc.
Represented By
Erica K. Williams
Guideone Insurance
contact info
Eric Vincent Hires
Law Office Of Eric V. Hires, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Paula Michelle White
Represented By
Erica K. Williams
Guideone Insurance
contact info
Eric Vincent Hires
Law Office Of Eric V. Hires, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shirley Jn Johnson
individual P.O. Box 58818
Seattle, WA 98138


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, May 31, 2024
336 336 misc Exhibits destruction Fri 05/31 12:10 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS re 335 Notice to Counsel of Exhibit Destruction. Exhibits have been disposed of pursuant to the Local Rules. DATE OF DESTRUCTION: 5/31/24. (ALL)
Related: [-]