Johnson v. Staats Bros, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:15-cv-04682 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA) |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 18, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 05, 2016 2:13 AM PDT |
Defendant
Jass 2233, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Staats Bros, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Jamie L. Dupree
Futterman Dupree Dodd Croley Maier LLP 180 Sansome St., 17th Fl.
San Francisco, CA 94104 |
|
Plaintiff
Scott Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, May 18, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 05/18 3:40 PM
ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 19 Stipulation Dismissing Action with Prejudice. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016) |
|
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 05/13 9:29 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Dismiss Case Pursuant to F.R.CIV.P.41(a)(1 ) filed by Scott Johnson.(Grace, Phyl) (Filed on 5/13/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, March 17, 2016 | ||
adr
Pre MED phone conference
Thu 03/17 2:20 PM
Pre MED phone conference held on 3/17/2016. A further pre mediation phone conference is scheduled for 3/31/2016 at 11:00 AM. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016) |
||
Tuesday, March 08, 2016 | ||
adr
Pre MED phone conference
Tue 03/08 11:59 AM
Pre MED phone conference scheduled on 3/17/2016 at 1:30 PM. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016) |
||
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator
Wed 03/02 3:17 PM
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Jamie L. Dupree as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016) |
|
Wednesday, February 10, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Errata
Wed 02/10 4:21 PM
ERRATA re16 Notice of Need for Mediation by Scott Johnson.(Potter, Mark) (Filed on 2/10/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Errata Amended Notice of Need for Mediation, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
utility
Case Referred to Mediation
Wed 02/10 7:21 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016) |
||
Tuesday, February 09, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
adr
Notice of Need for Mediation - ADA Cases Only
Tue 02/09 4:21 PM
Notice of Need for Mediation by Mark Dee Potter(Potter, Mark) (Filed on 2/9/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, November 23, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Statement
Mon 11/23 4:17 PM
Statement Corporate Disclosure by Staats Bros, Inc.. (Barranti, Kirsten) (Filed on 11/23/2015) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 11/23 4:16 PM
STAATS BROS, INC., ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byStaats Bros, Inc.. (Barranti, Kirsten) (Filed on 11/23/2015) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Statement
Mon 11/23 4:14 PM
Statement Corporate Disclosure by Jass 2233, LLC. (Barranti, Kirsten) (Filed on 11/23/2015) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 11/23 4:09 PM
JASS 2233, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byJass 2233, LLC. (Barranti, Kirsten) (Filed on 11/23/2015) |
|
Tuesday, November 17, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 11/17 3:39 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Jass 2233, LLC served on 11/13/2015, answer due 12/4/2015. (Potter, Mark) (Filed on 11/17/2015) |
|
Friday, November 13, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Fri 11/13 11:31 AM
STIPULATION To Extend Time to Answer Complaint filed by Staats Bros, Inc.. (Barranti, Kirsten) (Filed on 11/13/2015) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Thu 11/12 5:13 PM
STIPULATION Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint filed by Staats Bros, Inc.. (Barranti, Kirsten) (Filed on 11/12/2015) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Thu 11/12 2:12 PM
Electronic filing error. Blank Document. Please re-file in its entirety. Re:8 Stipulation filed by Staats Bros, Inc. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015) |
||
Tuesday, November 10, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Tue 11/10 11:05 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER filed by Staats Bros, Inc.. (Barranti, Kirsten) (Filed on 11/10/2015) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 10/30 6:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Staats Bros, Inc. served on 10/20/2015, answer due 11/10/2015. (Potter, Mark) (Filed on 10/30/2015) |
|
Friday, October 09, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 10/09 8:19 AM
Summons Issued as to Jass 2233, LLC, Staats Bros, Inc.. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2015) |
|
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
Fri 10/09 8:14 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2015) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 10/09 7:54 AM
Case assigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2015) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Fri 10/09 12:03 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson (Potter, Mark) (Filed on 10/9/2015) Modified on 10/13/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). |
|
Thursday, October 08, 2015 | ||
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Potter, Mark) (Filed on 10/8/2015) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9902824.). Filed byScott Johnson.(Potter, Mark) (Filed on 10/8/2015) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |