Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:David L Russell
Case #: 5:10-cv-00451
Nature of Suit450 Other Statutes - Commerce
Case Filed:May 03, 2010
Terminated:Apr 11, 2011
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 28, 2016 7:27 PM CST
Counter Claimant
Chase Bank USA NA
Represented By
Adam J Strange
Fee Smith Sharp & Vitullo LLP
contact info
James E Weger
Jones Gotcher & Bogan
contact info
Michael Y Scudder
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom Llp-Chicago
contact info
Lara A Riley
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom Llp-Chicago
contact info
Counter Defendant
Karis Barnett
4125 Castelrock Road
Norman, OK 73072
Represented By
Jerri K Neighbors
Atkins & Markoff
contact info
Counter Defendant
Shane Barnett
Represented By
Louis M Green
Louis M Green Attorney At Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Chase Bank USA NA
Represented By
Adam J Strange
Fee Smith Sharp & Vitullo LLP
contact info
James E Weger
Jones Gotcher & Bogan
contact info
Michael Y Scudder
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom Llp-Chicago
contact info
Lara A Riley
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom Llp-Chicago
contact info
Defendant
Equifax Inc
Represented By
Michael D Douglas
King & Spalding-Atlanta
contact info
Thomas B McLemore
Mee Mee Hoge & Epperson Pllp
contact info
Arthur F Hoge, III
Mee Mee Hoge & Epperson Pllp
contact info
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By
Jimmy K Goodman
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
James R Williams, Jr
Jones Day-Atlanta
contact info
Regan Grace S Beatty
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Defendant
FIA Card Services NA
Represented By
Thomas P Howell, IV
Christensen Law Group PLLC
contact info
Joel W Harmon
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Joe E Edwards
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Represented By
Thomas G Wolfe
contact info
Erik J Grohmann
Strasburger & Price-Frisco
contact info
Juston R Givens
contact info
Ginny E Webb
Strasburger & Price-Frisco
contact info
Plaintiff
Shane Barnett
Represented By
Louis M Green
Louis M Green Attorney At Law PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Bank of America NA
Terminated: 11/29/2010
Represented By
Thomas P Howell, IV
Christensen Law Group PLLC
contact info
Joel W Harmon
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Joe E Edwards
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Third Party Defendant
Karis Barnett
Terminated: 09/21/2010
Represented By
Jerri K Neighbors
Atkins & Markoff
contact info
Third Party Plaintiff
Chase Bank USA NA
Terminated: 09/21/2010
Represented By
Adam J Strange
Fee Smith Sharp & Vitullo LLP
contact info
James E Weger
Jones Gotcher & Bogan
contact info
Michael Y Scudder
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom Llp-Chicago
contact info
Lara A Riley
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom Llp-Chicago
contact info



Create an account to get the full docket for this case.