Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Ron Clark
Case #: 4:15-cv-00706
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2015
Terminated:Feb 05, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Apr 10, 2016 4:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Michael W Broderick
Represented By
Brett J Vottero
Fein, Emond & Applebaum, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.
901 Main Street Suite 5500
Dallas, TX 75202
Represented By
John L Krenn
Gray Plant Mooty Mooty & Bennett, Pa - Minneapolis
contact info
Kenneth E Carroll
Carrington Coleman Sloman & Blumenthal LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, February 10, 2016
service Acknowledgment of Receipt Wed 02/10 4:44 PM
DETAILS: Case transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT for the CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA as case 8:16-cv-00231, filed 02/10/2016. (cm, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 05, 2016
21 21 order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 02/05 1:17 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA AND DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT denying14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/5/16. (cm, )
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer Fri 02/05 1:18 PM
Interdistrict transfer to the Central District of California. (cm, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2016
20 20 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 01/13 4:17 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.(Krenn, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix 1
Tuesday, January 12, 2016
19 19 notice Notice of Discovery Disclosure Tue 01/12 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Michael W Broderick Rule 26 (c) Initial Disclosure (Vottero, Brett)
Related: [-]
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 01/12 2:06 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint filed by Michael W Broderick . (Vottero, Brett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2016
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/07 10:50 AM
NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A. of Initial Disclosure (Carroll, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2016
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 01/05 2:33 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A. .(Carroll, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Decl of Craig Etchegoyen,
Att: 2 Exhibit Decl of Brad Davis,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, January 04, 2016
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 01/04 3:55 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A. .(Carroll, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Craig Etchegoyen,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Brad Davis,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 18, 2015
14 14 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 12/18 4:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint by Michael W Broderick.(Vottero, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Michael W. Broderick
Monday, December 14, 2015
13 13 order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 12/14 4:17 PM
ORDER - DENYING AS MOOT, without prejudice to reassertion of the same with respect to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/11/2015. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2015
12 12 respm Response to Motion Fri 12/04 3:13 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or Transfer filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A. . (Carroll, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/04 2:12 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael W Broderick, filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A..(Carroll, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2015
10 10 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 11/19 1:42 PM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS, ( Rule 16 Management Conference set for 2/9/2016 03:00 PM in Video Conf Rm (Sherman) before Judge Ron Clark.). Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/19/15. (cm, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2015
9 9 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 11/18 2:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or Transfer by Michael W Broderick.(Vottero, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, November 09, 2015
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Mon 11/09 9:18 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Michael W Broderick to 11/23/2015. 17 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( cm, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 06, 2015
8 8 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Fri 11/06 9:01 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Michael W Broderick.( Vottero, Brett)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 11/06 8:46 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, 7, submitted by Michael W Broderick. Request to be refiled using the "Application to Extend Answer Time Form". Correction should be made by one business day. (cm, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2015
7 7 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 11/05 4:16 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Michael W Broderick.( Vottero, Brett)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/05 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brett J Vottero on behalf of Michael W Broderick. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5471097. (Vottero, Brett)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
5 5 service Return of Service Executed Wed 11/04 10:52 AM
Return of Service Executed as to Michael W Broderick on 10/16/2015, answer due: 11/6/2015. (cm, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
4 4 order Protective Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 10/26 5:27 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 10/26/2015. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2015
3 3 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/21 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John L Krenn on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5446990. (Krenn, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2015
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 10/15 3:25 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Michael W Broderick. (cm, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/13 9:35 AM
COMPLAINT against Michael W Broderick ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5433105.), filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A..(Carroll, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons(es)
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/13 5:14 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Ron Clark. (cm, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Tue 10/13 5:15 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (cm, )
Related: [-]