Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Eduardo C Robreno
Referred: David R Strawbridge
Case #: 2:10-cv-67894
Nature of Suit368 Torts - Personal Injury - Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Case Filed:May 14, 2010
Terminated:Jul 23, 2012
Case in other court:WI-E, 00-01150

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, September 21, 2012
128 128 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY MOTION FOR A VACATUR AND STAY OF JUDGMENTS PENDING APPEAL IS DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/21/12. 9/21/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(lisad, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case List
Thursday, September 20, 2012
127 127 CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY MOTION FOR A VACATUR AND STAY OF JUDGMENTS PENDING APPEAL(stwe, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Friday, September 14, 2012
126 126 PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY MOTION FOR A VACATUR AND STAY OF JUDGEMENTS PENDING APPEAL.(uh, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PROPOSED ORDER,
Att: 2 EXHIBIT A,
Att: 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE