California Central District Court
Judge:Terry J Hatter, Jr
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:15-cv-08169
Nature of Suit720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations
Cause29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2015
Terminated:Dec 08, 2016
Last checked: Thursday Apr 14, 2016 2:43 AM PDT
Defendant
Actors Equity Association
Plaintiff
Simon Levy
Represented By
Steven J Kaplan
Steven J Kaplan Law Offices
contact info
Martha S Doty
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Vanessa Stewart
Represented By
Steven J Kaplan
Steven J Kaplan Law Offices
contact info
Martha S Doty
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
French Stewart
Represented By
Steven J Kaplan
Steven J Kaplan Law Offices
contact info
Martha S Doty
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Stern
Represented By
Steven J Kaplan
Steven J Kaplan Law Offices
contact info
Martha S Doty
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael A Shepperd
Represented By
Steven J Kaplan
Steven J Kaplan Law Offices
contact info
Martha S Doty
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lawrence Pressman
Represented By
Steven J Kaplan
Steven J Kaplan Law Offices
contact info
Martha S Doty
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tom Ormeny
Represented By
Steven J Kaplan
Steven J Kaplan Law Offices
contact info
Martha S Doty
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy Madigan
Represented By
Steven J Kaplan
Steven J Kaplan Law Offices
contact info
Martha S Doty
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Karen Kondazian
Represented By
Steven J Kaplan
Steven J Kaplan Law Offices
contact info
Martha S Doty
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Veralyn Jones
Represented By
Steven J Kaplan
Steven J Kaplan Law Offices
contact info
Martha S Doty
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Salome Jens
Represented By
Steven J Kaplan
Steven J Kaplan Law Offices
contact info
Martha S Doty
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ed Harris
Represented By
Steven J Kaplan
Steven J Kaplan Law Offices
contact info
Martha S Doty
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gary Grossman
Represented By
Steven J Kaplan
Steven J Kaplan Law Offices
contact info
Martha S Doty
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Gobetti
Represented By
Steven J Kaplan
Steven J Kaplan Law Offices
contact info
Martha S Doty
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Flynn
Represented By
Steven J Kaplan
Steven J Kaplan Law Offices
contact info
Martha S Doty
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregg Daniel
Represented By
Steven J Kaplan
Steven J Kaplan Law Offices
contact info
Martha S Doty
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tom Bower
Represented By
Steven J Kaplan
Steven J Kaplan Law Offices
contact info
Martha S Doty
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ed Asner
Represented By
Steven J Kaplan
Steven J Kaplan Law Offices
contact info
Martha S Doty
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Mary McColl
Terminated: 12/08/2015


1. Acting Up Against the Minimum Wage (wsj.com)
Submitted Tue 10/20/2015
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, December 08, 2016
34 34 order Dismiss Thu 12/08 11:11 AM
ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: GRANTING WITHOUT PREJUDICE24 MOTION to Dismiss Case. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (shb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2016
33 33 order Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting (CV 104A) Mon 11/28 5:05 PM
NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: Re Letter sent to Judge received on 2016, Local Rule 83-205 no letters to the judge. The person is not listed on the docket as a party. The document is NOT to be filed, but instead REJECTED, and is ORDERED returned to counsel. Counsel shall immediately notify in writing, all parties previously served with the attached documents that the said documents have not been filed with the court by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. (shb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2016
32 32 29 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 09/02 2:32 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint 24 filed by Defendant Actors Equity Association. (Gottlieb, Ira)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2016
31 31 34 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 08/17 9:18 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint 24 filed by Plaintiffs Ed Asner, Tom Bower, Gregg Daniel, John Flynn, Maria Gobetti, Gary Grossman, Ed Harris, Salome Jens, Veralyn Jones, Karen Kondazian, Simon Levy, Amy Madigan, Tom Ormeny, Lawrence Pressman, Michael A Shepperd, Joseph Stern, French Stewart, Vanessa Stewart. (Kaplan, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2016
30 30 attorney Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06) Tue 08/09 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Steven J Kaplan counsel for Plaintiffs Ed Asner, Tom Bower, Gregg Daniel, John Flynn, Maria Gobetti, Gary Grossman, Ed Harris, Salome Jens, Veralyn Jones, Karen Kondazian, Simon Levy, Amy Madigan, Tom Ormeny, Lawrence Pressman, Michael A Shepperd, Joseph Stern, French Stewart, Vanessa Stewart. Changing Address to 1880 Century Park East, Suite 614, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Attorney Steven J. Kaplan. (Kaplan, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2016
29 29 order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Thu 07/28 12:30 PM
ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, re Stipulation to Continue Dates to Set Briefing Schedule on Defendant's motion to Dismiss,28 . 1. That the Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Motion), currently set for August 29, 2016 [UNDER SUBMISSION], be continued to September 19, 2016 [UNDER SUBMISSION];2. That Plaintiffs shall file their papers in Opposition to the Motionno later than August 17, 2016; 3. That Defendant shall file its Reply papers in support of the Motion no later than September 5, 2016. (shb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2016
28 28 stip Continue Tue 07/26 12:23 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date and to Set Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss from August 29, 2016 to September 19, 2016 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint 24 filed by Plaintiffs Ed Asner, Tom Bower, Gregg Daniel, John Flynn, Maria Gobetti, Gary Grossman, Ed Harris, Salome Jens, Veralyn Jones, Karen Kondazian, Simon Levy, Amy Madigan, Tom Ormeny, Lawrence Pressman, Michael A Shepperd, Joseph Stern, French Stewart, Vanessa Stewart.(Doty, Martha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 21, 2016
27 27 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/22 12:19 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting20 Non-Resident Attorney Susan Davis APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Actors' Equity Association, designating Ira L. Gottlieb as local counsel. (lt)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/22 12:18 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting19 Non-Resident Attorney Wendy M. LaManque APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Actors' Equity Association, designating Ira L. Gottlieb as local counsel. (lt)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/22 12:16 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting18 Non-Resident Attorney Evan R. Hudson-Plush APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Actors' Equity Association, designating Ira L. Gottlieb as local counsel. (lt)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Thu 07/21 4:17 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by DEFENDANT Actors Equity Association. Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Gottlieb, Ira)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 32 pgs Memorandum of Points & Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration of Evan Hudson-Plush,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5 to Declaration,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6 to Declaration,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7 to page 118 of Decl,
Att: 10 Exhibit 7 from pg 119 of Decl,
Att: 11 Exhibit 8 to Declaration,
Att: 12 Exhibit 9 to Decl,
Att: 13 Proposed Order
Friday, July 15, 2016
23 23 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 07/15 1:52 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vanessa Stewart, Joseph Stern, Michael A Shepperd, Ed Harris, Tom Bower, Ed Asner, Tom Ormeny, Amy Madigan, Gary Grossman, Simon Levy, Gregg Daniel, Veralyn Jones, Salome Jens, John Flynn, French Stewart, Karen Kondazian, Lawrence Pressman, Maria Gobetti, upon Defendant Actors Equity Association served on 7/9/2016, answer due 8/1/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Doug Carfrae, Officer in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned.(Kaplan, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A
22 22 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) Fri 07/15 11:44 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Wendy M. LaManque to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Actors Equity Association (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18183903)19 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Susan Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Actors Equity Association (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18183964)20 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Evan R. Hudson-Plush to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Actors Equity Association (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18183761)18 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Form is out-of-date. Attorney failed to use current form but used current Proposed Order. Form was updated and amended as of May 1, 2016. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2016
21 21 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 07/14 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Actors Equity Association, identifying Ed Asner, Tom Bower, Gregg Daniel, John Flynn, Maria Gobetti, Gary Grossman, Ed Harris, Salome Jens, Veralyn Jones, Karen Kondzian, Simon Levy, Amy Madigan, Tom Ormeny, Lawrence Pressman, Michael A. Shepperd, Joseph Stern, French Stewart, Vanessa Stewart, Alterra America Insurance Company, Actors' Equity Association. (Gottlieb, Ira)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Thu 07/14 10:53 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Susan Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Actors Equity Association (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18183964) filed by Defendant Actors Equity Association. (Gottlieb, Ira)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Thu 07/14 10:48 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Wendy M. LaManque to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Actors Equity Association (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18183903) filed by Defendant Actors Equity Association. (Attachment s: #1 Proposed Order) (Gottlieb, Ira)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Thu 07/14 10:37 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Evan R. Hudson-Plush to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Actors Equity Association (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18183761) filed by Defendant Actors Equity Association. (Attachm ents: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Ira Lawrence Gottlieb added to party Actors Equity Association(pty:dft)) (Gottlieb, Ira)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2016
17 17 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Thu 06/16 2:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) - NEW CASE by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. (See attached document for requirements.) (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2016
16 16 order Transferring Case purs GO 14-03 (Related Case)(CV 34) Tue 06/14 3:32 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:88-cv-05374 TJH(GHKx). Case transferred from Judge George H. Wu to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:15-cv-08169 TJH(JPRx). Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr (rn)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2016
15 15 order Order Mon 06/06 9:55 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' THIRD REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT14 by Judge George H. Wu. It is hereby ORDERED that the Request is GRANTED. GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, Plaintiffs' shall have until July 15, 2016 to serve the Summons and Complaint. There will be no further continuances as to service. (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2016
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/01 1:19 PM
NOTICE Re Plaintiffs' Request for Additional Time to Serve Summons and Complaint Until July 15, 2016 filed by Plaintiffs Ed Asner, Tom Bower, Gregg Daniel, John Flynn, Maria Gobetti, Gary Grossman, Ed Harris, Salome Jens, Veralyn Jones, Karen Kondazian, Simon Levy, Amy Madigan, Tom Ormeny, Lawrence Pressman, Michael A Shepperd, Joseph Stern, French Stewart, Vanessa Stewart.(Doty, Martha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Martha S. Doty,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, March 25, 2016
13 13 order Continue Tue 03/29 8:37 AM
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: Upon consideration of the Plaintiffs'12 REQUEST for Additional Time to Serve Summons and Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the Request is GRANTED. GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, Plaintiffs' shall have until Wednesday, June 1, 2016 to serve the Summons and Complaint. (mg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2016
12 12 motion Continue Thu 03/24 2:02 PM
Second REQUEST to Continue time to serve Summons and Complaint from March 25, 2016 to June 1, 2016 Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,1 , Summons Request,4 filed by Plaintiffs Ed Asner, Tom Bower, Gregg Daniel, John Flynn, Maria Gobetti, Gary Grossman, Ed Harris, Salome Jens, Veralyn Jones, Karen Kondazian, Simon Levy, Amy Madigan, Tom Ormeny, Lawrence Pressman, Michael A Shepperd, Joseph Stern, French Stewart, Vanessa Stewart. (Doty, Martha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Martha S. Doty,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, January 25, 2016
11 11 order Continue Mon 01/25 10:29 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT10 by Judge George H. Wu. It is hereby ORDERED that the Request is GRANTED. GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, Plaintiffs' shall have until Friday, March 25, 2016 to serve the Summons and Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2016
10 10 motion Continue Wed 01/20 11:18 AM
First REQUEST to Continue time to serve Summons & Complaint from February 17, 2016 to April 1, 2016 Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,1 , Summons Request,4 filed by plaintiff Ed Asner, Tom Bower, Gregg Daniel, John Flynn, Maria Gobetti, Gary Grossman, Ed Harris, Salome Jens, Veralyn Jones, Karen Kondazian, Simon Levy, Amy Madigan, Tom Ormeny, Lawrence Pressman, Michael A Shepperd, Joseph Stern, French Stewart, Vanessa Stewart. (Kaplan, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration ISO Request for Additional Time,
Att: 2 Proposed Order re Request for Additional Time
Friday, December 04, 2015
9 9 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Fri 12/04 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Vanessa Stewart, Joseph Stern, Michael A Shepperd, Ed Harris, Tom Bower, Ed Asner, Tom Ormeny, Amy Madigan, Gary Grossman, Simon Levy, Gregg Daniel, Veralyn Jones, Salome Jens, John Flynn, French Stewart, Karen Kondazian, Lawrence Pressman, Maria Gobetti pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) with prejudice as to Mary McColl. (Kaplan, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2015
8 8 order Order Tue 10/27 9:33 AM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2015
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 10/19 9:42 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Actors Equity Association, Mary McColl. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 10/19 9:30 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 10/19 9:27 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 18, 2015
4 4 notice Summons Request Sun 10/18 11:10 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,,3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,1 filed by plaintiff Ed Asner, Tom Bower, Gregg Daniel, John Flynn, Maria Gobetti, Gary Grossman, Ed Harris, Salome Jens, Veralyn Jones, Karen Kondazian, Simon Levy, Amy Madigan, Tom Ormeny, Lawrence Pressman, Michael A Shepperd, Joseph Stern, French Stewart, Vanessa Stewart. (Kaplan, Steven)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 17, 2015
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Sat 10/17 6:03 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff All Plaintiffs,(Attorney Steven J Kaplan added to party Simon Levy(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J Kaplan added to party Amy Madigan(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J Kaplan added to party Tom Ormeny(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J Kaplan added to party Lawrence Pressman(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J Kaplan added to party Michael A Shepperd(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J Kaplan added to party Joseph Stern(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J Kaplan added to party French Stewart(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J Kaplan added to party Vanessa Stewart(pty:pla))(Kaplan, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Additional Parties
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Sat 10/17 5:31 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Ed Asner, Tom Bower, Gregg Daniel, John Flynn, Maria Gobetti, Gary Grossman, Ed Harris, Salome Jens, Veralyn Jones, Karen Kondazian. (Kaplan, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 37 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Sat 10/17 5:06 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16633499 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Gary Grossman, Gregg Daniel, Ed Harris, Veralyn Jones, Tom Bower, Salome Jens, Ed Asner, John Flynn, Karen Kondazian, Maria Gobetti. (Attorney Steven J Kaplan added to party Ed Asner(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J Kaplan added to party Tom Bower(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J Kaplan added to party Gregg Daniel(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J Kaplan added to party John Flynn(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J Kaplan added to party Maria Gobetti(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J Kaplan added to party Gary Grossman(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J Kaplan added to party Ed Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J Kaplan added to party Salome Jens(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J Kaplan added to party Veralyn Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J Kaplan added to party Karen Kondazian(pty:pla))(Kaplan, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Part 1 - 99 Seat Plan,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Part 2 99-Seat Plan,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Hart Survey,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Promulgated Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Wyman FB Post,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Cahn Email