Silicon Graphics, Inc.
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Burton R Lifland |
Case #: | 1:06-bk-10977 |
Case Filed: | May 08, 2006 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jun 23, 2006 |
Terminated: | Aug 15, 2011 |
Plan Confirmed: | Sep 19, 2006 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Aug 07, 2006 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50,001-100,000 |
Est. Assets | More than $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | More than $1 billion |
Debtor
Silicon Graphics, Inc.
1500 Crittenden Ln
Mountain View, CA 94043-2776 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Claims and Noticing Agent
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC
|
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Mount Vernon Monetary Management Corp., et al, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Winston & Strawn 200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Wilmington Trust FSB
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10004 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago |
Monday, August 15, 2011 | ||
Case Closed. (Cantrell, Deirdra) |