Calvert v. Genopath Solutions LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:13-bk-19298
Lead BK case is: 2:13-bk-19298
Washington Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marc Barreca |
Case #: | 2:15-ap-01361 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Oct 19, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 03, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Genopath Solutions LLC, an Alabama limited liability company
905 Bob Wallace Avenue
Huntsville, AL 35801 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Calvert, Trustee
Perkins Coie LLP c/o John S. Kaplan 1201 Third Avenue Suite 4900
Seattle, WA 98101 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 1:07 PM PDT |
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
misc
Request for No Future Electronic Notice
Fri 04/06 12:26 PM
Request for No Future Electronic Notice. Attorney no longer requires notice of action in this case.. Filed by Binah B. Yeung on behalf of Genopath Solutions LLC. (Yeung, Binah) |
||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
order
Close Adversary
Thu 08/03 10:04 AM
CLOSED. Adversary Case 2:15-ap-1361 Closed . (RQC) |
||
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Dismissing Adversary Case (order)
Wed 07/12 2:48 PM
ORDER Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Case Can Close: 8/2/2017. . (RQC) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
court
Minutes - Hearing Not Held
Tue 07/11 11:58 AM
Minutes.Trial Not Held. No Appearances. |
||
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Received UNSIGNED Order
Fri 07/07 4:02 PM
|
|
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss Adversary Case
Fri 07/07 3:50 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Case Filed by John S Kaplan on behalf of Mark Calvert (Kaplan, John) |
|
court
Minutes - Hearing Held
Tue 07/25 10:18 AM
Minutes. Hearing Held. Appearances: |
||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
misc
Set Hearing
Mon 05/08 1:48 PM
Set Hearing on Final Pretrial Conference. . The Hearing date is set for 7/7/2017 at 01:30 PM at Judge Barreca's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7106. (KEK) |
||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
court
Minutes - Hearing Not Held Matter Withdrawn
Tue 04/25 12:34 PM
Minutes. Hearing Not Held. Matter has been withdrawn. |
||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
court
Minutes - Hearing Held
Wed 04/19 12:11 PM
Minutes. |
||
misc
Notice to Court Motion Withdrawn, Hearing Stricken (no PDF)
Wed 04/19 3:48 PM
Notice to Court Motion Withdrawn, Hearing Stricken on Date of Hearing: 5/4/2017. Filed by Binah B. Yeung on behalf of Genopath Solutions LLC. . (Yeung, Binah) |
||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
misc
Notice to Court of Intent to Argue (no PDF)
Fri 04/14 11:51 AM
Notice to Court of Intent to Argue. Date of Hearing: 4/20/2017. Filed by Laurin S Schweet on behalf of Genopath Solutions LLC. . (Schweet, Laurin) |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Mediation Certification (ADR)
Thu 03/23 2:58 PM
|
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Notice of Trial and Order Setting Deadlines
Tue 02/28 2:26 PM
Second Amended Notice of Trial and ORDER Setting Deadlines . (RQC) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Received UNSIGNED Order
Mon 02/27 10:07 AM
|
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
court
Minutes - Hearing Held
Thu 02/16 2:58 PM
Minutes. Continued Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 and 07/14/2017 at 09:30 AM at Judge Barreca's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7106. Two day trial. Counsel to prepare Revised Scheduling Order. (KEK ) |
||
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
misc
Notice to Court Requesting Continuance of Hearing on Motion (no PDF)
Tue 02/14 2:59 PM
Notice to Court Requesting Continuance of Hearing on Motion - from: Date of Hearing: 2/16/2017 at 9:30 am. to: 4/20/17 at 9:30 am. Filed by Laurin S Schweet on behalf of Genopath Solutions LLC. . (Schweet, Laurin) |
||
court
Minutes - Hearing Held
Tue 02/14 3:57 PM
Minutes. |
||
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
misc
Notice to Court of Intent to Argue (no PDF)
Fri 02/10 12:00 PM
Notice to Court of Intent to Argue. Date of Hearing: 2/16/2017. Filed by Laurin S Schweet on behalf of Genopath Solutions LLC. . (Schweet, Laurin) |
||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
court
Minutes - Hearing Held
Tue 01/17 11:47 AM
Minutes. |
||
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
misc
Notice to Court Requesting Continuance of Hearing on Motion (no PDF)
Thu 01/12 6:14 PM
Notice to Court Requesting Continuance of Hearing on Motion - from: Date of Hearing: 1/19/2017 at 9:30 am. to: 2/16/2017 at 9:30 am. Filed by Binah B. Yeung on behalf of Genopath Solutions LLC. . (Yeung, Binah) |
||
Monday, November 28, 2016 | ||
court
Minutes - Hearing Held
Mon 11/28 10:22 AM
Minutes. |
||
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
misc
Notice to Court Requesting Continuance of Hearing on Motion (no PDF)
Tue 11/22 5:42 PM
Notice to Court Requesting Continuance of Hearing on Motion - from: Date of Hearing: 12/1/2016 at 9:30 a.m.. to: 1/19/2016 at 9:30 a.m.. Filed by Binah B. Yeung on behalf of Genopath Solutions LLC. . (Yeung, Binah) |
||
Tuesday, August 16, 2016 | ||
court
Minutes - Hearing Held
Tue 08/16 12:15 PM
Minutes. .: Trial continued to 03/23/2017; 03/24/2017; 03/27/2017 at 09:30 AM - 4:30 PM; 03/28/2017 at 9:30 AM to Noon and 03/30/2017 at 1:30 PM to 4:30 PM at Judge Barreca's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7106. Four days of trial. Counsel prepared and filed Amended Trial Order (#14). (KEK ) |
||
Monday, August 15, 2016 | ||
court
Minutes - Hearing Held
Mon 08/15 8:57 AM
Minutes. |
||
Friday, August 12, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Notice of Trial and Order Setting Deadlines
Fri 08/12 3:11 PM
Notice of Trial and ORDER Setting Deadlines . (RQC) |
|
13 | 13
order
Notice of Trial and Order Setting Deadlines
Fri 08/12 1:40 PM
Notice of Trial and ORDER Setting Deadlines . (SLA) |
|
Thursday, August 11, 2016 | ||
misc
Notice to Court Requesting Continuance of Hearing on Motion (no PDF)
Thu 08/11 4:44 PM
Notice to Court Requesting Continuance of Hearing on Motion - from: Date of Hearing: 8/18/2016 at 9:30 a.m.. to: 12/1/2016 at 9:30 a.m.. Filed by Binah B. Yeung on behalf of Genopath Solutions LLC. . (Yeung, Binah) |
||
Wednesday, August 10, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Received UNSIGNED Order
Wed 08/10 8:23 PM
|
|
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Wed 08/10 5:44 PM
Stipulation by and between Plaintiff and Defendant to Continue Trial Date . Filed by Binah B. Yeung on behalf of Genopath Solutions LLC. (Yeung, Binah) |
|
Tuesday, July 19, 2016 | ||
court
Minutes - Hearing Held
Tue 07/19 3:05 PM
Minutes. Appearance : Binah B. Yeung Continued Hearing scheduled for 08/18/2016 at 09:30 AM at Judge Barreca's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7106. (KEK ) |
||
Monday, July 18, 2016 | ||
misc
Notice to Court Requesting Continuance of Hearing on Motion (no PDF)
Mon 07/18 3:56 PM
Notice to Court Requesting Continuance of Hearing on Motion - from: Date of Hearing: 7/21/2016 at 9:30 a.m.. to: 8/18/2016 at 9:30 a.m.. Filed by Binah B. Yeung on behalf of Genopath Solutions LLC. . (Yeung, Binah) |
||
Monday, June 13, 2016 | ||
misc
Notice to Court Requesting Continuance of Hearing on Motion (no PDF)
Mon 06/13 10:36 AM
Notice to Court Requesting Continuance of Hearing on Motion - from: Date of Hearing: 6/16/2016 at 9:30 a.m.. to: 7/21/2016 at 9:30 a.m.. Filed by Binah B. Yeung on behalf of Genopath Solutions LLC. . (Yeung, Binah) |
||
court
Minutes - Hearing Held
Mon 06/13 1:10 PM
Minutes |
||
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
misc
Notice to Court of Intent to Argue (no PDF)
Fri 06/10 9:23 AM
Notice to Court of Intent to Argue. Date of Hearing: 6/16/2016. Filed by Laurin S Schweet on behalf of Genopath Solutions LLC. . (Schweet, Laurin) |
||
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
ans
Objection
Thu 06/09 10:53 PM
Trustee's Objection to Motion To Compel Plaintiff To Answer and Respond to Disvoery Requests ... Filed by John S Kaplan on behalf of Mark Calvert. (Kaplan, John) |
|
Thursday, May 26, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
~generic~ Motion
Thu 05/26 9:56 PM
Defendant's Motion Compel Compliance with Discovery Requests with Notice of Hearing. Filed by Binah B. Yeung on behalf of Genopath Solutions LLC The Hearing date is set for 6/16/2016 at 09:30 AM at Judge Barreca's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7106. Response due by 6/9/2016. (Yeung, Binah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 05, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Notice of Trial and Order Setting Deadlines
Fri 02/05 1:10 PM
Notice of Trial and ORDER Setting Deadlines. Trial to commence 9:30am 9/6/2016 . (DLP) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2016 | ||
court
Minutes - Hearing Held
Mon 01/25 11:20 AM
Minutes. Hearing Held. Appearances: John Kaplan representing plaintiff; Binah Yeung representing defendant. . Four day Trial is scheduled for 9/6/2016 through 9/9/2016 at 09:30 AM at Judge Barreca's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7106. (PBR) |
||
Thursday, January 07, 2016 | ||
court
Minutes - Hearing Held
Thu 01/14 4:03 PM
Minutes. Hearing Held. Appearances: John Kaplan representing plaintiff; Binah Yeung representing defendant. Continued Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2016 at 09:00 AM at Judge Barreca's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7106. (KEK ) |
||
Thursday, December 17, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Mediation Certification (ADR)
Thu 12/17 10:19 AM
|
|
Wednesday, November 25, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
ans
Statement
Wed 11/25 12:10 PM
Statement re Corporate Disclosure ... Filed by Binah B. Yeung on behalf of Genopath Solutions LLC. (Yeung, Binah) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 11/25 12:09 PM
Answer to Complaint . Filed by Binah B. Yeung on behalf of Genopath Solutions LLC. (Yeung, Binah) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Proof of Service
Fri 10/30 10:15 AM
Proof of Service . Filed by John S Kaplan on behalf of Mark Calvert. . (Kaplan, John) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice Regarding Final Adjudication and Consent
Fri 10/30 10:14 AM
Plaintiff's Notice Regarding Final Adjudication and Consent to Entry of Final Orders . Filed by John S Kaplan on behalf of Mark Calvert. (Kaplan, John) |
|
Tuesday, October 27, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons and Pretrial Conference (Seattle)
Tue 10/27 4:12 PM
Summons and Pretrial Conference (Original Summons issued electronically via the Court's ECF System to Plaintiff's Attorney) to be served on Genopath Solutions LLC Answer Due 11/27/2015 . Pretrial scheduled for 1/7/2016 at 01:30 PM at Judge Barreca's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7106. (KEK) |
|
Wednesday, October 21, 2015 | ||
misc
Receipt of Fee (Generic)
Thu 10/22 7:30 AM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $0.00 by JA. Receipt Number 216633. Chargetoestate (admin) |
||
Monday, October 19, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Mon 10/19 4:07 PM
Adversary case 15-01361 Complaint by Mark Calvert (attorney John S Kaplan) against Genopath Solutions LLC. . Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Kaplan, John) |