Shofner v. Branding Iron Holdings, Inc. et al
Illinois Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Phil Gilbert |
Referred: | Donald G Wilkerson |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-01166 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim |
Case Filed: | Oct 21, 2015 |
Terminated: | Nov 29, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 18, 2016 4:07 AM CDT |
Defendant
Branding Iron Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Holten Meats, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brandy Mormino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jaclyn Shofner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, November 29, 2016 | ||
40 | 40
order
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 11/29 9:56 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/29/2016. (jdh) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 11/21 11:54 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jaclyn Shofner. (Brunton, Michael) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
order
Order 60 Day
Thu 09/29 10:16 AM
60 DAY ORDER. Judgment to enter 12/1/2016. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/29/2016. (jdh) |
|
Wednesday, July 13, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice Striking Electronically Filed Documents
Wed 07/13 2:23 PM
NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking36 Notice filed by Branding Iron Holdings, Inc. Pursuant to Local Rule 26.1(b), no discovery material shall be filed, including general notices. (rah) |
|
Tuesday, July 12, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/12 2:17 PM
NOTICE by Branding Iron Holdings, Inc. Plaintiff's Deposition (O'Neal, Brian) |
|
Monday, June 27, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 06/27 2:24 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: GRANTING33 First MOTION for Extension of Time of Case Management Order Deadlines (Joint Motion) filed by Jaclyn Shofner. Discovery due by 10/3/2016, Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2016, Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2017 at 9:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert, Jury Trial set for 2/27/2017 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/27/16. (sgp) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 06/27 2:24 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference RESET for 10/5/2016 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. (sgp) |
||
Monday, June 13, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 06/13 9:57 AM
ORDER MOOTING32 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 29, a Court Order is not required if the parties agree to modify deadlines that would not affect the discovery deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/13/16. (sgp) |
|
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 06/10 4:48 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time of Case Management Order Deadlines (Joint Motion) by Jaclyn Shofner. (Brunton, Michael) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 05/27 3:28 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by All Defendants. (O'Neal, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, May 18, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
minutes
Discovery Dispute Conference
Wed 05/18 10:33 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference held on 5/17/2016. Attorney Brunton for Plaintiff and attorney O'Neal for Defendants. Parties indicate that their dispute has been resolved.(Court Reporter n/a.) (sgp) |
|
Tuesday, May 17, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
order
Protective Order
Tue 05/17 11:16 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/17/16. (sgp) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 05/06 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference set for 5/17/2016 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Defendant indicates that there is a dispute as to medical records authorizations. Defendant to initiate the phone conference. (sgp) |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 04/19 12:54 PM
ANSWER to23 Amended Complaint by All Defendants.(LeMoine, Bryan) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice Striking Electronically Filed Documents
Tue 04/19 11:47 AM
NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking26 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Branding Iron Holdings, Inc., Brandy Mormino, Holten Meats, Inc.. Caption of document is inconsistent with the case in which it is filed. Document must be re-filed with the appropriate caption.(cjo) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 04/18 3:06 PM
ANSWER to23 Amended Complaint by All Defendants.(LeMoine, Bryan) |
|
Tuesday, April 05, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Errors and/or Deficiencies
Tue 04/05 1:55 PM
NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re24 Sealed Document filed by Jaclyn Shofner. Docket text modified to reflect that document is an exhibit to the Amended Complaint filed at doc 23. (rah) |
|
Monday, April 04, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Sealed Document
Mon 04/04 4:36 PM
Sealed Document. (Brunton, Michael) |
|
23 | 23
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 04/04 4:35 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jaclyn Shofner.(Brunton, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
Wednesday, March 23, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Protective Order
Wed 03/23 3:30 PM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by All Defendants.(O'Neal, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, March 09, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 03/09 11:17 AM
Set Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/8/2016. (rah) |
||
Tuesday, March 08, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
11
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 03/08 2:22 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the Court GRANTS the defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc.9 ); DISMISSES Shofner's complaint without prejudice; and ORDERS that Shofner shall have up to and including April 8, 2016, to file an amended complaint that cures the deficiencies noted in this order. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/8/2016. (jdh) |
|
Monday, January 11, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 01/11 5:01 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jaclyn Shofner.(Brunton, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D | ||
Tuesday, January 05, 2016 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 01/05 9:49 AM
Reset Deadlines as to9 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 1/11/2016 (cjo) |
||
Monday, January 04, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 01/04 11:48 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time. Response due 1/11/16. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/4/16. (tlp) |
|
Wednesday, December 30, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 12/30 3:29 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss by Jaclyn Shofner. (Brunton, Michael) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order Regarding Discovery
Wed 12/30 10:57 AM
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 12/17/2015. (jmp) |
|
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 12/30 10:54 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/8/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 7/22/2016. Settlement Conference set for 8/1/2016 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 12/17/2015. (jmp) |
|
Thursday, December 17, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order 1 - Terminate Hearings
Thu 12/17 12:29 PM
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/22/15 is hereby CANCELLED. Scheduling Order to issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 12/17/15. (sgp) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Scheduling and Discovery Conference
Wed 12/09 1:39 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Telephone Scheduling/Discovery Conference set for 12/22/2015 at 2:30 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. (jmp) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 12/04 9:11 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re9 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 1/4/2016. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/4/15. (tlp) |
|
Tuesday, December 01, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 12/01 2:09 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to9 MOTION to Dismiss ,10 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Jaclyn Shofner. (Brunton, Michael) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
CJRA Track
Thu 11/12 10:18 AM
CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2016 at 9:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Jury Trial set for 11/21/2016 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/12/2015. (tag) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
8
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 10/28 4:59 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Branding Iron Holdings, Inc., Holten Meats, Inc., Brandy Mormino. (LeMoine, Bryan) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Wed 10/28 4:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Branding Iron Holdings, Inc., Holten Meats, Inc., Brandy Mormino. Responses due by 12/3/2015 (LeMoine, Bryan) |
|
Thursday, October 22, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
utility
Case Opening Notification
Thu 10/22 8:41 AM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 15-1166 JPG-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (rah) |
|
Wednesday, October 21, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 10/21 1:44 PM
NOTICE by Branding Iron Holdings, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal, (LeMoine, Bryan) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 10/21 1:41 PM
NOTICE by Branding Iron Holdings, Inc., Holten Meats, Inc., Brandy Mormino re1 Notice of Removal, (LeMoine, Bryan) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 10/21 11:39 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Holten Meats, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Branding Iron Holdings, Inc. for Holten Meats, Inc.. (LeMoine, Bryan) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 10/21 11:36 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Branding Iron Holdings, Inc.. (LeMoine, Bryan) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/21 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. O'Neal on behalf of All Defendants (O'Neal, Brian) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/21 11:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan D. LeMoine on behalf of All Defendants (LeMoine, Bryan) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 10/21 10:58 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial Circuit Court St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 15-L-503 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-2756960), filed by Brandy Mormino, Holten Meats, Inc., Branding Iron Holdings, Inc..(LeMoine, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |