Original Case: 2:07-md-01840

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:15-cv-03254
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2015
Terminated:Sep 21, 2017
Last checked: Friday Sep 22, 2017 2:31 AM MDT
Defendant
WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Represented By
Brian L. Duffy
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Naomi Beer
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Defendant
BP WEST COAST PRODUCTS, LLC
Represented By
Michael F. Saunders
Spencer Fane Britt & Browne
contact info
Sean Morris
Arnold & Porter, LLP
contact info
Erika Norman
Arnold & Porter, LLP
contact info
Ronald C. Redcay
Arnold & Porter, LLP
contact info
Nancy Milburn
Arnold & Porter
contact info
Defendant
CASEY'S GENERAL STORES, INC.
Represented By
Martin M. Loring
Husch Blackwell
contact info
Michael E. Norton
Husch Blackwell
contact info
Defendant
CITGO PETROLEUM CORPORATION
Represented By
Richard M. Hutson II
Hutson Law Office
contact info
Nathan P. Eimer
Eimer Stahl
contact info
David E. Everson Jr.
Stinson Leonard Street
contact info
Ameri Giannotti
Eimer Stahl
contact info
Vanessa G. Jacobsen
Eimer Stahl
contact info
Defendant
CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY
Represented By
Daniel Simon Mason
Zelle Hofmann Voelbel & Mason
contact info
Defendant
EQUILON ENTERPRISES LLC, DBA Shell Oil Products US
Represented By
David Micheal Harris
Greensfelder, Hemker & Gale
contact info
Defendant
MOTIVA ENTERPRISES LLC
Represented By
David Micheal Harris
Greensfelder, Hemker & Gale
contact info
Defendant
EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
Represented By
David R. Singh
Weil Gotshal & Manges
contact info
James W. Quinn
Weil Gotshal & Manges
contact info
David Jason Lender
Weil Gotshal & Manges
contact info
Kevin F. Meade
Weil Gotshal & Manges
contact info
Defendant
MOBIL OIL GUAM, INC.
Represented By
David R. Singh
Weil Gotshal & Manges
contact info
James W. Quinn
Weil Gotshal & Manges
contact info
David Jason Lender
Weil Gotshal & Manges
contact info
Kevin F. Meade
Weil Gotshal & Manges
contact info
Defendant
ESSO VIRGIN ISLANDS, INC.
Represented By
David R. Singh
Weil Gotshal & Manges
contact info
James W. Quinn
Weil Gotshal & Manges
contact info
David Jason Lender
Weil Gotshal & Manges
contact info
Kevin F. Meade
Weil Gotshal & Manges
contact info
Defendant
SAM'S EAST, INC.
Represented By
Brian L. Duffy
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Defendant
SAM'S WEST, INC.
Represented By
Brian L. Duffy
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Defendant
WAL-MART STORES, INC.
Represented By
Brian L. Duffy
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Naomi Beer
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Ericka D. McCaskill
Berkowitz Oliver Williams Shaw & Eisenbrandt
contact info
Sharon A. Stallbaumer
Berkowitz Oliver Williams Shaw & Eisenbrandt
contact info
Defendant
BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC.
Represented By
Sean Morris
Arnold & Porter, LLP
contact info
Defendant
SINCLAIR OIL CORPORATION
Represented By
William Frank Ford
Lathrop & Gage
contact info
Defendant
VALERO MARKETING AND SUPPLY COMPANY
Represented By
Patrick J. Whalen
Spencer Fane Britt & Browne
contact info
Chad A. Stegeman
Carroll, Burdick & McDonough
contact info
Selena Evans
Dowd Bennett
contact info
James P. Tuite
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld
contact info
James F. Bennett
Dowd Bennett
contact info
Defendant
SUNOCO, INC. (R&M)
Represented By
Daniel Hodes
Rouse Hendricks German May
contact info
Heather A. Ritch
Reed Smith
contact info
Defendant
B-B OIL COMPANY, INC.
Represented By
Sherry Perkins Bartley
Mitchell Williams
contact info
Defendant
COULSON OIL COMPANY, INC.
Represented By
Sherry Perkins Bartley
Mitchell Williams
contact info
Defendant
DIAMOND STATE OIL, LLC
Represented By
Sherry Perkins Bartley
Mitchell Williams
contact info
Defendant
FLASH MARKET, INC.
Represented By
Sherry Perkins Bartley
Mitchell Williams
contact info
Defendant
J&P FLASH, INC.
Represented By
Sherry Perkins Bartley
Mitchell Williams
contact info
Defendant
MAGNESS OIL COMPANY
Represented By
Sherry Perkins Bartley
Mitchell Williams
contact info
Defendant
PORT CITIES OIL, LLC
Represented By
Sherry Perkins Bartley
Mitchell Williams
contact info
Defendant
E-Z MART STORES, INC.
Represented By
Sherry Perkins Bartley
Mitchell Williams
contact info
John J. Griffin Jr.
Crowe & Dunlevy
contact info
Defendant
LOVE'S TRAVEL STOP & COUNTRY STORES, INC.
Represented By
John J. Griffin Jr.
Crowe & Dunlevy
contact info
Defendant
WORLD OIL CORPORATION
Represented By
Michael George Romey
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Defendant
WR HESS COMPANY
Represented By
Thomas B. Staley
Robinson Staley Marshall & Duke
contact info
Defendant
M.M. FOWLER, INC., DBA Family Fare
Represented By
Daniel Hodes
Rouse Hendricks German May
contact info
Richard M. Hutson II
Hutson Law Office
contact info
James C. Adams
Brooks Pierce McLendon Humphrey & Leonard LLP
contact info
Defendant
DANSK INVESTMENT GROUP, INC., FKA USA Petroleum Corporation
Represented By
Robert R. Begland
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Defendant
TESORO REFINING AND MARKETING COMPANY
Represented By
Daniel Hodes
Rouse Hendricks German May
contact info
Craig Joseph de Recat
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
David G. Hosenpud
Lane Powell PC
contact info
Robert R. Begland
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Defendant
THORNTONS, INC.
Represented By
Daniel Hodes
Rouse Hendricks German May
contact info
Defendant
G&M OIL COMPANY, INC.
Represented By
Martin M. Loring
Husch Blackwell
contact info
Michael E. Norton
Husch Blackwell
contact info
Defendant
G&M OIL CO., LLC
Represented By
Martin M. Loring
Husch Blackwell
contact info
Michael E. Norton
Husch Blackwell
contact info
Defendant
UNITED EL SEGUNDO, INC.
Represented By
Mark Gilmartin
Mark B. Gilmartin Law Offices
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION
Represented By
David Frank McDowell Jr.
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Joseph R. Palmore
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Purvi Govindlal Patel
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Gregory L. Musil
Douthit Frets Rouse Gentile & Rhodes
contact info
Bryan Leitch
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CHEVRON U.S.A., INC.
Represented By
Darius C. Ogloza
Ogloza Fortney
contact info
Garrett Long
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Kirsten Marie Ferguson
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Thomas J. Heiden
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Mary Rose Alexander
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Objector
THE PANTRY, INC.
Represented By
Tristan Layle Duncan
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Objector
WAWA, INC.
Represented By
Tristan Layle Duncan
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Objector
SHEETZ, INC.
Represented By
Tristan Layle Duncan
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Objector
QUIKTRIP CORPORATION
Represented By
Tristan Layle Duncan
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Objector
RACETRAC PETROLEUM, INC.
Represented By
Tristan Layle Duncan
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Objector
PTCAA TEXAS, LP
Represented By
Tristan Layle Duncan
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Objector
FLYING J INC.
Represented By
Tristan Layle Duncan
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Objector
PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC
Represented By
Tristan Layle Duncan
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Objector
MURPHY OIL USA, INC.
Represented By
Tristan Layle Duncan
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Objector
MARATHON PETROLEUM COMPANY LP
Represented By
Tristan Layle Duncan
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Objector
KUM&GO, L.C.
Represented By
Tristan Layle Duncan
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Objector
CIRCLE K STORES, INC.
Represented By
Tristan Layle Duncan
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Objector
7-ELEVEN, INC.
Represented By
Tristan Layle Duncan
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Objector
SPEEDWAY LLC
Represented By
Tristan Layle Duncan
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Plaintiff
IN RE: MOTOR FUEL TEMPERATURE SALES PRACTICES LITIGATION
Plaintiff - Appellee
GARY KOHUT
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ANNIE SMITH
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CHRISTOPHER PAYNE
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
PHYLLIS LERNER
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
HERB GLAZER
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MARA REDSTONE
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
BRENT CRAWFORD
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
VICTOR RUYBALD
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ZACH WILSON
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LISA MCBRIDE
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
RAPHAEL SAGALYN
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
BRENT DONALDSON
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
RICHARD GAULAUSKI
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CHARLES BYRAM
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JEAN NEESE
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SHONNA BUTLER
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
GERALD PANTO, JR.
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JOANN KORLESKI
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
TAMARA MILLER
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
PRISCILLA CRAFT
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JEFF JENKINS
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JAMES GRAHAM, Class Representatives
Represented By
Thomas Vincent Bender
Walters, Bender, Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C.
contact info
Amelia Frenkel
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Joseph A. Kronawitter
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
Daniel Vernon Dorris
Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel
contact info
Robert A. Horn
Horn, Aylward & Bandy
contact info
David Charles Frederick
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick
contact info

GPO Aug 23 2017
[10492444] Affirmed. Terminated on the merits after oral hearing. Written, signed, published. Judges Lucero, Phillips and Moritz (authoring judge). Mandate to issue. [15-3221, 15-3227, 15-3228, 15-3254]

Docket last updated: 09/22/2017 2:31 AM MDT
Wednesday, October 21, 2015
[10313154] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/21/2015. Transcript order form and docketing statement due 11/05/2015 for Costco Wholesale Corporation. Notice of appearance due on 11/05/2015 for Costco Wholesale Corporation, Shonna Butler, Charles Byram a/k/a Bryan, Priscilla Craft, Brent Crawford, Brent Donaldson, Richard Gaulauski, Herb Glazer, James Graham, Jeff Jenkins, Gary Kohut, Joann Korleski, Phyllis Lerner, Lisa McBride, Tamara Miller, Jean Neese, Gerald Panto Jr., Christopher Payne, Mara Redstone, Victor Ruybald, Raphael Sagalyn, Annie Smith, and Zach Wilson 15-3254
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1186 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 3 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil