California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Victoria S Kaufman
Case #: 1:15-bk-13518
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2015
Dismissed:Nov 02, 2015
Terminated:Mar 29, 2016

Debtor
The Eclipse Group LLP
6345 Balboa Blvd Ste 325
Encino, CA 91316-1580
Represented By
The Eclipse Group LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Petitioning Creditor
Francisco Rubio
2020 Main St #600
Irvine, CA 92614
Represented By
John D Faucher
Faucher & Associates
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Gregory B Gulliver
100 S Altinson Rd
Grayslake, IL 60030
Represented By
John D Faucher
Faucher & Associates
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 91007


Docket last updated: 10/22/2015 12:00 PM PDT
Thursday, October 22, 2015
1 1 3 pgs Chapter 7 Involuntary Petition. Fee Amount $335 Re: The Eclipse Group LLP Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s):Francisco Rubio (attorney John D Faucher), Gregory B Gulliver (attorney John D Faucher) . (Holbert, Ellen)
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs Involuntary Summons Issued on The Eclipse Group LLP (Garcia, Patty)
Related: [-]
3 3 Hearing Set Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/3/2015 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 301, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Victoria S. Kaufman (Garcia, Patty)
Related: [-] 1 Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor The Eclipse Group LLP, Petitioning Creditor Francisco Rubio, Petitioning Creditor Gregory B Gulliver