Garcia et al v. Atlas Facilities Maintenance, Inc.
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Anna J Brown |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-02000 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 |
Case Filed: | Oct 22, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 05, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 19, 2016 2:08 AM PDT |
Defendant
Atlas Facilities Maintenance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amilcar Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Noelia Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, June 17, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
1 - Scheduling
Fri 06/17 9:03 AM
Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. At the request of the parties via an email request, a 30 day extension of the Order of Dismissal is granted. The 60 Day Order of Dismissal is extended to 8/5/2016. (bb) |
|
Thursday, May 05, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Dismissal (60-day) - Terminate Case
Thu 05/05 12:20 PM
60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to LR 41-1, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. All pretrial deadlines and any trial date are stricken. By Clerk of Court Mary L. Moran. (bb) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/21 5:52 PM
Corrected Answer to1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Atlas Facilities Maintenance, Inc.. (Ryan, Sarah) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/21 5:40 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Atlas Facilities Maintenance, Inc.. (Ryan, Sarah) |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition
Thu 03/24 12:00 PM
ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer9 . Answer or responsive pleading is now due 4/21/2016. (bb) |
|
Tuesday, March 22, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
oth_doc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/22 5:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Filed on Behalf of Defendant . Filed by All Defendants. (Ryan, Sarah) |
|
10 | 10
oth_sup
Declaration
Tue 03/22 4:28 PM
Declaration of Sarah J. Ryan in Support of Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Answer . Filed by All Defendants. (Ryan, Sarah) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition
Tue 03/22 4:26 PM
Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by All Defendants. (Ryan, Sarah) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Attorney Substitution
Tue 03/22 3:41 PM
Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Sarah J. Ryan and Chrisine Slattery is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney David P. R. Symes and Brian K. Weeks Filed by All Defendants (Ryan, Sarah) |
|
Wednesday, March 09, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition
Wed 03/09 2:30 PM
ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion ti Extend Deadline for Filing Responsive Pleading5 . Answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint is now due 3/22/2016. (bb) |
|
Monday, March 07, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
oth_sup
Declaration
Mon 03/07 9:48 AM
Declaration of Brian K. Weeks In Support of Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Responsive Pleading . Filed by Atlas Facilities Maintenance, Inc.. (Weeks, Brian) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition
Mon 03/07 9:46 AM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Responsive Pleading . Filed by Atlas Facilities Maintenance, Inc.. (Weeks, Brian) |
|
Tuesday, February 16, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
1 - Scheduling
Tue 02/16 3:29 PM
Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court STRIKES the Court set dates in the Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order2 . The Court will schedule a R16 Conference after an answer has been filed. (bb) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Summons
Tue 01/12 5:14 PM
Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by All Defendants. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Swift, Marcus) |
|
Friday, October 23, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
order
3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT
Fri 10/23 8:18 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 2/22/2016. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/21/2016. Pretrial Order is due by 3/21/2016. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (dsg) |
|
Thursday, October 22, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 10/22 4:55 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4337270 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Noelia Garcia, Amilcar Garcia against Atlas Facilities Maintenance, Inc.. (Swift, Marcus) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |