Alabama Middle District Court
Case #: 2:10-cv-00524
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2010
Terminated:Mar 04, 2011
Counter Claimant
The Guaranty Company of North America, USA
Counter Defendant
Wiregrass Construction Company, Inc.
Defendant
The Guarantee Company of North America (US) Holdings, Ltd.
Defendant
The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Defendant
The Guaranty Company of North America, USA
Plaintiff
Construction Partners, Inc.
Plaintiff
CW Roberts Contracting, Inc.
Plaintiff
Wiregrass Construction Company, Inc.

GPO Mar 04 2011
JUDGMENT, the court having been informed that this cause is now settled, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that this lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, as further set out in order; further ORDERING that all pending motions are denied as moot; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; this case is closed. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 3/4/11. (Attachments: # (1) civil appeals checklist). Furnished to calendar group & AG (terminates Pretrial Conference 03/04/2011; Non-Jury Trial 04/04/2011).(djy, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.