Armwood v. Windham Professionals, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Katherine B Forrest |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-08368 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 23, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 20, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 20, 2016 5:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
Windham Professionals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfonso Armwood
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 20, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 01/20 12:43 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff Alfonso Armwood and Defendant Windham Professionals, Inc., through their respective counsel, that Plaintiff hereby voluntarily dismisses the Complaint and all claims and causes of action against Defendant with prejudice and without costs or fees to either party. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 1/19/2016) (lmb) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error
Wed 01/20 9:21 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Sarah Wieselgren to E-MAIL Document 10 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal to judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. (jk) |
||
Tuesday, January 19, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 01/19 3:22 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Windham Professionals, Inc. and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Windham Professionals, Inc..(Wieselgren, Sarah) |
|
Monday, November 30, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 11/30 3:30 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for Plaintiff Alfonso Armwood and counsel for Defendant Windham Professionals, Inc., that the Defendant's time to answer the complaint, or otherwise move, is extended from November 27, 2015 to December 28, 2015. Counsel: See my Indiv. Rules-I don't typically take stips. on extensions (but will this time). Windham Professionals, Inc. answer due 12/28/2015. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 11/30/2015) (mro) |
|
Saturday, November 28, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Sat 11/28 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ronald Andrew Giller on behalf of Windham Professionals, Inc.. (Giller, Ronald) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Sat 11/28 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah L. Wieselgren on behalf of Windham Professionals, Inc.. (Wieselgren, Sarah) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 11/16 2:05 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Windham Professionals, Inc. served on 11/6/2015, answer due 11/27/2015. Service was accepted by Maureen Cogan, authorized agent. Document filed by Alfonso Armwood. (Shaked, Dan) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Mon 10/26 9:10 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Lead counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference ("IPTC") on Friday, January 22, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. as further set forth in this order. Initial Conference set for 1/22/2016 at 02:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/26/2015) (lmb) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 10/26 9:15 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Windham Professionals, Inc.. (rch) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Mon 10/26 9:12 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Dan Shaked. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx. (rch) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 10/26 9:19 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (rch) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 10/26 9:19 AM
Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (rch) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 10/26 9:20 AM
Case Designated ECF. (rch) |
||
Friday, October 23, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 10/23 10:30 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Windham Professionals, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Alfonso Armwood. (Shaked, Dan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 10/23 10:29 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Shaked, Dan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/23 10:28 AM
COMPLAINT against Windham Professionals, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11542794)Document filed by Alfonso Armwood.(Shaked, Dan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |