OSF Healthcare System an Illinios not for profit corporation d/b/a Saint Francis Medical Center v. Star Transport, Inc. Health Care Plan Exact Name Unknown et al
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sara Darrow |
Referred: | Jonathan E Hawley |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-01436 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Oct 23, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 20, 2016 4:31 AM CDT |
Defendant
Star Transport Inc n/k/a Star Transport and Star Leasing
|
|
Defendant
Star Transport, Inc. Health Care Plan Exact Name Unknown
|
|
Plaintiff
OSF Healthcare System an Illinios not for profit corporation d/b/a Saint Francis Medical Center
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/14/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Judgment
Mon 07/03 12:11 PM
JUDGMENT entered on 7/3/2017. (LN, ilcd) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Mon 06/26 3:24 PM
ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on June 26, 2017. Plaintiff's8 motion for default judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in Plaintiff's favor against Defendants, jointly and severally, for $192,195.78 in unpaid medical bills, $4,295 in legal fees, and court costs of $492.50. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment against Defendant Star Transport Inc., n/k/a Star Transport and Star Leasing, in the amount of $67,400 under 29 U.S.C. § 1132(c)(1)(B). The Clerk is directed to close the case. (SC, ilcd) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thu 02/02 3:48 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on February 2, 2017. Plaintiff's5 Motion for Default Judgment is MOOT in light of Plaintiff's8 Motion for Default Judgment. (HR, ilcd) |
||
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 12/12 4:25 PM
TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the filing of a8 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by OSF Healthcare System an Illinois not for profit corporation d/b/a Saint Francis Medical Center, the Status conference set for 12/13/16 at 1:30 PM is VACATED. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 12/12/16. (WG, ilcd) |
||
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 12/09 3:29 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff OSF Healthcare System an Illinios not for profit corporation d/b/a Saint Francis Medical Center. Responses due by 12/23/2016(Nieminski, Kristin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Monday, November 28, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Lift Stay ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 11/28 1:36 PM
TEXT ORDER granting7 Motion to Lift Stay. Status Conference set for Tuesday, 12/13/2016 at 1:30 PM by telephone from Peoria (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 11/28/16. (WG, ilcd) |
||
Tuesday, November 08, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Lift Stay
Tue 11/08 12:49 PM
MOTION to Lift Stay by Plaintiff OSF Healthcare System an Illinios not for profit corporation d/b/a Saint Francis Medical Center. Responses due by 11/25/2016(Gregory, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, July 12, 2016 | ||
order
Order
Tue 07/12 4:40 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on July 12, 2016. On July 11, 2016, Plaintiff OSF Healthcare System filed6 Notice responding to the Court's July 8, 2016 Order to Show Cause why the Court should not stay this case due to Glenn Werry, Jr.'s (alleged sole owner of Defendant Star Transport, Inc. Healthcare Plan) bankruptcy petition. OSF asserts a stay is not necessary because default judgment was entered on April 21, 2016. Default, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a), was entered on April 21, 2016. Default Judgment, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b), has not yet been entered. A bankruptcy petition "operates as a stay, applicable to all entities, of the... continuation, including the issuance... of a judicial, administrative, or other action or proceeding against the debtor that was commenced" before the bankruptcy petition was filed. 11 U.S.C. 362. Therefore, this case is STAYED. OSF is directed to file a status report in 120 days and every 120 days thereafter. (HR, ilcd) |
||
utility
Case Stayed Set/Reset Deadlines (including Answer ddl)
Tue 07/12 4:44 PM
Case Stayed, Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Status Report due by 11/9/2016.) (LN, ilcd) |
||
Monday, July 11, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Stay
Mon 07/11 3:38 PM
Notice Regarding Stay by Plaintiff OSF Healthcare System an Illinios not for profit corporation d/b/a Saint Francis Medical Center. Responses due by 7/28/2016 (Nieminski, Kristin) Modified on 7/11/2016 to correct event (RK, ilcd) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines (including Answer ddl)
Mon 07/11 12:11 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 7/15/2016. (LN, ilcd) |
||
Friday, July 08, 2016 | ||
order
Order
Fri 07/08 11:58 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on July 8, 2016. OSF Healthcare System filed a motion to stay, ECF No. 6, in OSF Healthcare System v. Star Transport Healthcare Plan, 15-1460 because Glenn Werry, Jr., the sole owner of Star Transport, Inc., has filed a Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Petition. See Central District of Illinois Bankruptcy Case # 16-80146 Magistrate Judge Jonathan Hawley entered an order staying that case on June 21, 2016. Plaintiff OSF Healthcare System is order to show cause by July 15, 2016, why this case, which also seeks a judgment against Star Transport Healthcare Plan, should not be stayed. (HR, ilcd) |
||
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
order
Order
Thu 04/21 11:35 AM
TEXT ORDER: The docket in this case reflects that the Defendant Star Transport, Inc. Health Care Plan's (Exact Name Unknown) and Defendant Star Trasnport, Inc.'s (n/k/a Star Transport and Star Leasing) officer, President Glenn Werry, was served on November 12, 2015. The Defendants' answers or other responsive pleadings were due by December 3, 2015. No answers or other responsive pleadings have been filed. Because the Defendants have failed to plead or defend, the Clerk is directed to enter their default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). The Request for Default Judgment5 remains pending before the District Judge. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 4/21/2016. (KZ, ilcd) |
||
order
Entry of Default
Thu 04/21 12:27 PM
ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Star Transport Inc n/k/a Star Transport and Star Leasing, Star Transport, Inc. Health Care Plan Exact Name Unknown.(LN, ilcd) |
||
Wednesday, January 13, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 01/13 4:14 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff OSF Healthcare System an Illinios not for profit corporation d/b/a Saint Francis Medical Center. Responses due by 2/1/2016(Nieminski, Kristin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit b, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 | ||
Thursday, December 17, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer)
Thu 12/17 10:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by OSF Healthcare System an Illinios not for profit corporation d/b/a Saint Francis Medical Center. Star Transport, Inc. Health Care Plan Exact Name Unknown served on 11/12/2015, answer due 12/3/2015. (Nieminski, Kristin) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer)
Thu 12/17 10:51 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by OSF Healthcare System an Illinios not for profit corporation d/b/a Saint Francis Medical Center. Star Transport Inc n/k/a Star Transport and Star Leasing served on 11/12/2015, answer due 12/3/2015. (Nieminski, Kristin) |
|
Friday, October 23, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 10/23 2:41 PM
Summons Issued as to Star Transport Inc n/k/a Star Transport and Star Leasing, Star Transport, Inc. Health Care Plan Exact Name Unknown. (SW, ilcd) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Attorney Complaint
Fri 10/23 1:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Star Transport Inc n/k/a Star Transport and Star Leasing, Star Transport, Inc. Health Care Plan Exact Name Unknown ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2186037.), filed by OSF Healthcare System an Illinios not for profit corporation d/b/a Saint Francis Medical Center.(Nieminski, Kristin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit a, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit b, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit c, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit d, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E&F, | ||
Att: 7 summons | ||
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 10/23 2:28 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Due to a Conflict this Case is reassigned to Judge Sara Darrow for all further proceedings. Entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 10/23/15. (SW, ilcd) |