Minnesota District Court
Judge:Richard H Kyle
Referred: Tony N Leung
Case #: 0:15-cv-03930
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2015
Terminated:Apr 21, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Apr 23, 2016 4:04 AM CDT
Defendant
Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By
William D Hittler
Nilan Johnson Lewis PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Gladys Rios
Represented By
Stephen J Fields
Fields Law Office, Ltd
contact info
Brandon Operana
Fields Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/20/2021 11:59 PM CST
Thursday, April 21, 2016
15 15 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Thu 04/21 10:04 AM
JUDGMENT(MMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
14 14 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 04/21 8:48 AM
ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice, with the Court retaining jurisdiction for 60 days to permit any party to move to reopen for good cause shown or to seek enforcement of the settlement terms re:13 Letter. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 4/21/16. (KLL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2016
13 13 misc Letter to Magistrate Judge Wed 04/20 4:21 PM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gladys Rios cancellation of settlement conference; settlement agreement reached . (Operana, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2016
12 12 order Order Tue 03/08 1:46 PM
ORDER FOR EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 4/29/2016 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/8/16. (LEG)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/08 1:43 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (ERISA BENEFITS CASE): Amended Pleadings due by 4/7/2016. Motions (disp) due by 10/1/2016. Ready for trial due by 1/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/8/16. (LEG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2016
10 10 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 03/08 10:19 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference held on 3/7/2016. Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. (LEG)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 29, 2016
9 9 misc Rule 26(f) Report Mon 02/29 10:54 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Gladys Rios. Jointly Signed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Co..(Operana, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2016
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 02/12 3:42 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: AMENDED Notice of Hearing: The Pretrial Conference is now set for 3/7/2016 at 3:30 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (St. Paul) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (HAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2016
7 7 order Order Fri 01/22 2:06 PM
NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2016 01:00 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/22/16.(LEG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Wednesday, January 13, 2016
6 6 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Wed 01/13 3:51 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company states that it is an indirect wholly-owned subsidiary of Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. which is a publicly-traded corporation in Japan.(Hittler, William) Modified on 1/13/2016 (MMP)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/13 3:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Hittler, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 28, 2015
4 4 order Order Wed 10/28 10:40 AM
ORDER regarding Judge Richard H. Kyle's dispositive motion procedure. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 10/28/15. (KLL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 10/26 4:28 PM
Summons Issued as to Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (MMP)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Mon 10/26 4:27 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 15-cv-3930 (RHK/TNL). (MMP)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/26 4:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Gladys Rios. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-4620277.) Filed by Gladys Rios. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet