California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Deborah J Saltzman
Case #: 6:09-bk-19355
Case Filed:May 05, 2009
Creditor Meeting:Aug 04, 2009
Terminated:Jan 31, 2014

Debtor
Soyo Group, Inc.
1290 E Elm St
Ontario, CA 91761-4025
Represented By
John Chu
Corporate Counsel Law Group LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Patricia J Zimmermann (TR)
31566 Railroad Canyon Rd. Ste 306
Canyon Lake, CA 92587
Represented By
Amy L Goldman
contact info
Scott Lee
contact info
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Patricia J Zimmermann (TR)
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 06/15/2016 11:16 AM PDT
Tuesday, May 05, 2009
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(6:09-bk-19355) [misc,volp7] ( 299.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 9149526. Fee amount 299.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $299 Filed by Soyo Group, Inc. Section 316 Incomplete Filings due by 6/19/2009. Schedule A due 05/20/2009. Schedule B due 05/20/2009. Schedule C due 05/20/2009. Schedule D due 05/20/2009. Schedule E due 05/20/2009. Schedule F due 05/20/2009. Schedule G due 05/20/2009. Schedule H due 05/20/2009. Schedule I due 05/20/2009. Schedule J due 05/20/2009. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/20/2009. Statement - Form 22A Due: 05/20/2009. Petition Prep Signature due 05/20/2009. Exhibit B due 05/20/2009.Statement of Related Case due 05/20/2009. Notice of available chapters due 05/20/2009. Statement of assistance of non-attorney due 05/20/2009. Summary of schedules due 05/20/2009. Declaration concerning debtors schedules due 05/20/2009. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor due 05/20/2009. Disclosure of compensation of bankruptcy petition preparer due 05/20/2009. Declaration of attorney limited scope of appearance due 05/20/2009. Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 05/20/2009. Decl. and Ntc. by Petition Preparer (Form 19) due by 05/20/2009. Statistical Summary due 05/20/2009. Exhibit D due 05/20/2009. Corporate Ownership Statement due by 05/20/2009. Debtor Certification of Employment Income due by 05/20/2009. Statement of Social Security Number(s) Form B21 due by 05/20/2009. Incomplete Filings due by 05/20/2009. (Chu, John) CORRECTION: Case is also deficient for Electronic Filing Declaration due by 5/20/09. Case is not deficient for Schedule C, Schedule I, Schedule J, Statement - Form 22A, Petition Prep Signature, Exhibit B, Notice of Avail. Chapters, Statement Assist non-Atty, Discl. Comp Pet. Prepr., Certificate of Credit Counseling, Decl. Pet Prep., Statistical Summary, Exhibit D, Debtor's Cert. of Empl. Income, and Statement of Social Security Number Form B21. Modified on 5/11/2009 (Avalos, Marie). Modified on 5/11/2009 (Avalos, Marie).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing
2 2 Matrix (Mailing List) Filed by Debtor Soyo Group, Inc.. (Chu, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 Verification of creditor matrix Filed by Debtor Soyo Group, Inc.. (Chu, John)
Related: [-]