Maryland District Court
Judge:Peter J Messitte
Case #: 8:15-cv-03324
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2015
Terminated:Jan 21, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 27, 2016 5:06 AM EDT
Defendant
FanDuel Inc.
19 Union Square West 9th Floor
New York, NY 10003
Plaintiff
Pierre Garcon
Represented By
Geoffrey J Moul
Murray Murphy Moul And Basil LLP
contact info
Brian K Murphy
Murray Murphy Moul And Basil LLP
contact info
Joseph F Murray
Murray Murphy Moul And Basil LLP
contact info
Athanasios Basdekis
Bailey And Glasser LLP
contact info


1. NFL Player Sues Fantasy Sports Company FanDuel (wsj.com)
Submitted Mon 11/02/2015
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 21, 2016
20 20 order Order Thu 01/21 10:19 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and CLOSING case. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/20/2015. (rass, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2016
19 19 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 01/13 12:52 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pierre Garcon (Basdekis, Athanasios)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2015
18 18 order Order Mon 11/30 2:54 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING17 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/30/2015. (rass, Chambers)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Stipulation Mon 11/30 12:22 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order by Pierre Garcon.(Basdekis, Athanasios)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, November 12, 2015
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 11/12 2:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pierre Garcon. FanDuel Inc. served on 11/11/2015, answer due 12/2/2015. (Basdekis, Athanasios)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2015
15 15 order Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Mon 11/09 12:59 PM
Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. (Basdekis, Athanasios)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 06, 2015
14 14 order Order on Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/06 9:54 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting11 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joseph F Murray. Directing attorney Joseph F Murray to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 11/6/2015. (srd, Intern)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order on Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/06 9:50 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting10 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Geoffrey J Moul. Directing attorney Geoffrey J Moul to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 11/6/2015. (srd, Intern)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/06 9:47 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brian K Murphy. Directing attorney Brian K Murphy to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 11/6/2015. (srd, Intern)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice - Corrected Mon 11/02 2:50 PM
CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph F. Murray by Pierre Garcon. The fee has already been paid.(Basdekis, Athanasios)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice - Corrected Mon 11/02 2:48 PM
CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Geoffrey J. Moul by Pierre Garcon. The fee has already been paid.(Basdekis, Athanasios)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice - Corrected Mon 11/02 2:47 PM
CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian K. Murphy by Pierre Garcon. The fee has already been paid.(Basdekis, Athanasios)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Mon 11/02 2:41 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to FanDuel Inc. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice QC Notice - Pro Hac - Signatures Mon 11/02 10:52 AM
QC NOTICE:4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Pierre Garcon needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Intern)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice QC Notice - Pro Hac - Signatures Mon 11/02 10:51 AM
QC NOTICE:3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Pierre Garcon needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Intern)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice QC Notice - Pro Hac - Signatures Mon 11/02 10:50 AM
QC NOTICE:2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Pierre Garcon needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Intern)
Related: [-]
notice Deficiency Notice - AO 120 Mon 11/02 2:41 PM
Deficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 11/12/2015.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/30 5:16 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Geoffrey J. Moul ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-5682255.) by Pierre Garcon (Basdekis, Athanasios)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/30 5:13 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph F. Murray ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-5682248.) by Pierre Garcon (Basdekis, Athanasios)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/30 5:09 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian K. Murphy ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-5682238.) by Pierre Garcon (Basdekis, Athanasios)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/30 4:51 PM
COMPLAINT against FanDuel Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-5682184.), filed by Pierre Garcon.(Basdekis, Athanasios)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons