BioNitrogen Holdings, Corp.
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert A Mark |
Case #: | 1:15-bk-29505 |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2015 |
Creditor Meeting: | Nov 30, 2015 |
Claims Deadline: | Feb 29, 2016 |
Dismissed: | Jun 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
BioNitrogen Holdings, Corp.
8300 NW 53rd St Ste 350
Miami, FL 33166-7712 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Represented By
|
1. | BioNitrogen Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Protection (wsj.com) |
Submitted Thu 11/05/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago |