Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Daniel P Jordan, III
Referred: F Keith Ball
Case #: 3:10-cv-00358
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2010
Terminated:Mar 07, 2014
Last checked: Monday Mar 16, 2015 5:08 AM CDT
Defendant
Keith Booth
Represented By
Pieter Teeuwissen
Pieter Teeuwissen, PLLC
contact info
Claire Barker - City Gov
City Of Jackson
contact info
Lara E. Gill
contact info
Defendant
John and Jane Does A-Z
Plaintiff
William B. Skinner
Represented By
Charles R. McRae
Chuck Mcrae Law Office
contact info
Greta L. Kemp
Kemp Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
James N. Scarff, II
The Scarff Law Firm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Lurenza Clincy
Terminated: 02/28/2014
Represented By
J. Lawson Hester
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs - Jackson
contact info
Jason Edward Dare
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs - Jackson
contact info
Steven L. Lacey
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Hinds County Sheriff Department
Terminated: 10/17/2013
Represented By
J. Lawson Hester
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs - Jackson
contact info
Jason Edward Dare
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Hinds County, Mississippi
Terminated: 01/29/2014
Represented By
J. Lawson Hester
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs - Jackson
contact info
Jason Edward Dare
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Sheriff Malcolm McMillan
Terminated: 01/29/2014
Represented By
J. Lawson Hester
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs - Jackson
contact info
Jason Edward Dare
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Milton Reed
Terminated: 02/28/2014
Represented By
J. Lawson Hester
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs - Jackson
contact info
Jason Edward Dare
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs - Jackson
contact info
Steven L. Lacey
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
The City of Jackson, Mississippi
Terminated: 01/29/2014
Represented By
Pieter Teeuwissen
Pieter Teeuwissen, PLLC
contact info
Claire Barker - City Gov
City Of Jackson
contact info
Lara E. Gill
contact info



Create an account to get the full docket for this case.