Lloyd Richard v. Willy Martin, Jr., et al
Original Case: 2:12-cv-01513
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:13-usc-30959 |
Type | united states civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Sep 16, 2013 |
Terminated: | Dec 04, 2013 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 13, 2016 8:08 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
WILLY J. MARTIN, JR.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
LLOYD A. RICHARD
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/13/2016 8:08 AM CST |
Monday, September 16, 2013 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Lloyd A. Richard 13-30959 (SBS) |