Indiana Southern District Court
Judge:Tanya Walton Pratt
Referred: Denise K Larue
Case #: 1:15-cv-01747
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday May 03, 2016 5:11 AM EDT
Defendant
NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Gregory L. Curtner
Schiff Hardin, Llp - Michigan
contact info
Jacob K. Danziger
contact info
Robert James Wierenga
Schiff Hardin, Llp - Michigan
contact info
Kathy Lynn Osborn
Faegre Baker Daniels Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Kimberly K. Kefalas
Schiff Hardin, Llp - Michigan
contact info
Daniel E. Pulliam
Faegre Baker Daniels Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Cherie Phears O'Reilly
Schiff Hardin Llp Atlanta
contact info
Suzanne L. Wahl
Schiff Hardin, Llp - Michigan
contact info
Plaintiff
DEVIN PUGH
Represented By
Joseph N. Williams
Riley Williams & Piatt, LLC
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Elizabeth A. Fegan
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro, LLP
contact info
Sara Willingham
The Paytner Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Stuart McKinley Paynter
The Paynter Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Daniel J. Kurowski
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
William N. Riley
Riley Williams & Piatt, LLC
contact info

GPO Sep 27 2016
ENTRY ON PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS - For the reasons stated herein, the Court GRANTS the NCAA's Motion for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint. (Filing No. 34.) Count II of the Complaint, related to Sherman Act violations regarding the NCAA's transfer rules, is DISMISSED with prejudice. In addition, Pugh's request for injunctive relief is also DISMISSED. This action remains pending on Pugh's claims of Sherman Act violations regarding the NCAA's football scholarship restrictions. **SEE ORDER** Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/27/2016. (JLS)
GPO Dec 06 2016
ENTRY ON MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OR CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL - For the reasons set forth above, Pugh's Motion for Final Judgment and Certification of Interlocutory Appeal is DENIED. (Filing No. 49) (See Entry.) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/6/2016. (JLS)
Docket last updated: 11/09/2015 3:23 PM EST
Thursday, November 05, 2015
1 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, filed by DEVIN PUGH. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-3663097)(Riley, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William N. Riley on behalf of Plaintiff DEVIN PUGH. (Riley, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph N. Williams on behalf of Plaintiff DEVIN PUGH. (Williams, Joseph)
Related: [-]
4 4 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (AAM)
Related: [-]
5 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAM)
Related: [-]