Lanning v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Magnuson |
Referred: | Hildy Bowbeer |
Case #: | 0:15-cv-04036 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Nov 05, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 03, 2016 4:12 AM CDT |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diann Lanning
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
CIGNA
Terminated: 01/08/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 06/30 3:20 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 6/30/2016. (JEP) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 06/29 4:58 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Settlement Conference held on 6/29/2016. Settlement reached. Final agreement signed. Any transcript of the terms of settlement is Confidential and shall be SEALED, with access being allowed only to the parties and their counsel. (AUDIO (2:07-2:14 PM)). (lmb) |
|
Wednesday, March 30, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Wed 03/30 3:07 PM
ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 6/29/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/30/2016. (lmb) |
|
Friday, March 11, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 03/11 9:38 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 06/01/2016; Discovery due by 06/01/2016; Non-Dispositive Motions due by 06/01/2016; Dispositive Motions due by 10/01/2016; Ready For Trial by 11/01/2016. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 03/10/2016. (LLM) |
|
Thursday, March 10, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Thu 03/10 12:26 PM
**TEXT ENTRY ONLY** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/10/2016. Present: Brandon Operana for Pl.; Michael Berger for Def. (JEP) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Wed 03/02 9:53 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Diann Lanning. Jointly Signed by Life Insurance Company of North Amercia.(Operana, Brandon) |
|
Thursday, February 04, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 02/04 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Setting Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2016 12:00 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 734 (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (JEP) |
|
Monday, January 11, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 01/11 11:35 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel K. Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/11/2016. (JLW) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Fri 01/08 3:28 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Connecticut General Corporation is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. CIGNA Holdings, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. CIGNA Corporation is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Berger, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/08 3:24 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Berger, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order
Fri 01/08 12:59 PM
ORDER approving6 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/8/2016. (lmb) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Fri 01/08 11:06 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-4723336 by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Thursday, January 07, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Thu 01/07 4:43 PM
STIPULATION for Voluntary Dismissal and Reformation of the Pleadings Pursuant to Rule 41 by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Diann Lanning. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Friday, November 20, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 11/20 6:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 11/9/2015, answer due 1/8/2016; CIGNA waiver sent on 11/9/2015, answer due 1/8/2016. (Berger, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order
Fri 11/20 4:48 PM
AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014. (JEP) |
|
Thursday, November 05, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 11/05 3:25 PM
Summons Issued as to CIGNA, Life Insurance Company of North America. (lmb) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Thu 11/05 3:24 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 15-cv-4036 (PAM/HB). (lmb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 11/05 12:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, CIGNA. (Filing fee $400 receipt number AMNDC-4639179.) Filed by Diann Lanning. Filer requests summons issued.. (Operana, Brandon) Modified text on 11/5/2015 (lmb) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |