In N Out Burgers v. Doordash
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Josephine L Staton |
Referred: | Jay C Gandhi |
Case #: | 8:15-cv-01826 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 06, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 19, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 04, 2016 2:21 AM PDT |
Defendant
DOORDASH
|
|
Defendant
Doordash
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
IN-N-OUT BURGERS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
In N Out Burgers
|
Represented By
|
1. | In-N-Out Files Lawsuit Against Food Delivery Startup DoorDash (social.techcrunch.com) |
Submitted Thu 11/12/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, January 15, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 01/15 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff In N Out Burgers. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Zaitlen, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, January 06, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 01/06 8:46 AM
ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days)13 . IT IS ORDERED that Defendants time to answer or otherwise respond to the initial complaint shall be extended to January 22, 2016. (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, December 30, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Wed 12/30 5:39 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 01/22/2016 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendant Doordash.(Wegner, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, December 16, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 12/16 3:05 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Doordash answer now due 12/31/2015, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendant Doordash.(Wegner, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, November 24, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 11/24 5:45 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Doordash answer now due 12/18/2015, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendant Doordash.(Attorney Matthew K Wegner added to party Doordash(pty:dft))(Wegner, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 11/12 1:55 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff In N Out Burgers, upon Defendant Doordash served on 11/10/2015, answer due 12/1/2015. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Seigle, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, November 10, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 11/10 8:33 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) |
|
Monday, November 09, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 11/09 3:07 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to defendant Doordash. (twdb) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 11/09 3:05 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (twdb) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 11/09 3:04 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (twdb) |
|
Friday, November 06, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Fri 11/06 4:32 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by IN-N-OUT BURGERS. (Zaitlen, Richard) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 11/06 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff IN-N-OUT BURGERS, identifying None. (Zaitlen, Richard) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Fri 11/06 4:24 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 IN-N-OUT BURGERS. (Zaitlen, Richard) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 11/06 4:21 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff IN-N-OUT BURGERS. (Zaitlen, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
16
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 11/06 4:18 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16749285 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Richard H Zaitlen added to party IN-N-OUT BURGERS(pty:pla))(Zaitlen, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-S |