Warner Chilcott (US), LLC et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Referred: | Roy S Payne |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-01740 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 09, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday May 07, 2016 5:12 AM CDT |
Defendant
Mylan Laboratories Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Qualicaps Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Warner Chilcott (US), LLC
100 Enterprise Drive
Rockaway, NJ 07866 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Thu 12/21 11:49 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL re38 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Allergan Sales, LLC, Qualicaps Co., Ltd.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/20/2017. (nkl, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 12/20 3:34 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Allergan Sales, LLC, Qualicaps Co., Ltd..(Fair, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
appeal
Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT
Tue 11/21 4:07 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Qualicaps Co., Ltd., Allergan Sales, LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-6562394. (Hill, Jack) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 09/28 5:59 PM
ORDER finding as moot8 Motion to Dismiss in view of the Motion to Dismiss filed as Dkt. No. 96 in 2:15-cv-1471 based on the Amended Complaint filed therein as Dkt. No. 93. All arguments urged in Dkt. No. 8 will be considered with Dkt. No. 96. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 09/28/2016.(no document attached)(Payne, Roy) |
|
Monday, June 27, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Dismiss
Mon 06/27 3:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue by Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc..(Stockwell, Mitchell) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 27, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Wed 04/27 10:24 AM
ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw Attorney John Frederick Bufe and Michael E Jones terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/26/2016. (ch, ) |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 03/24 2:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Warner Chilcott (US), LLC, Qualicaps Co., Ltd., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC for Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Mylan, Inc.(nkl, ) |
|
Att: 1 Summons(es) | ||
Friday, March 04, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Create Case Association
Fri 03/04 9:06 AM
ORDER granting28 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases. ORDERED that C.A. No. 2:15-cv-01740 (Mylan action) isCONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, C.A. No. 2:15- cv-01471, Warner Chilcott (US), LLC v. Teva Pharms. USA, Inc. (Teva action). All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/3/16. (ch, ) |
|
Monday, February 29, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Discovery Disclosure
Mon 02/29 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Qualicaps Co., Ltd., Warner Chilcott (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC regarding Compliance with PR 3-8(b) (Jones, Michael) |
|
Thursday, February 25, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/25 10:26 AM
NOTICE by Qualicaps Co., Ltd., Warner Chilcott (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC Joint Notice of Agreed Mediator (Jones, Michael) |
|
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 02/23 2:53 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 2/22/16. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; deadlines for submitting Mediator names (3 days); and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.)(jml) |
||
Friday, February 19, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 02/19 5:06 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) |
|
Thursday, February 18, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Consolidate Cases
Thu 02/18 11:56 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Qualicaps Co., Ltd., Warner Chilcott (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC.(Jones, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A--D.E. 44 Docket Control Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B--Consolidated Docket Control Order, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 11, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 02/11 3:28 PM
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue filed by Qualicaps Co., Ltd., Warner Chilcott (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC . (Jones, Michael) |
|
Friday, February 05, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 02/05 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Qualicaps Co., Ltd., Warner Chilcott (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC (Bufe, John) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/05 10:37 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy D Cobb on behalf of Qualicaps Co., Ltd., Warner Chilcott (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5599030. (Cobb, Jeremy) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/05 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael N Kennedy on behalf of Qualicaps Co., Ltd., Warner Chilcott (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5599021. (Kennedy, Michael) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/05 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey B Elikan on behalf of Qualicaps Co., Ltd., Warner Chilcott (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5599017. (Elikan, Jeffrey) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/05 10:32 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by George F Pappas on behalf of Qualicaps Co., Ltd., Warner Chilcott (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5599010. (Pappas, George) |
|
Thursday, February 04, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 02/04 3:35 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason Woodard Cook terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/04/2016. (nkl, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 03, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 02/03 6:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jason Woodard Cook by Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc..(Capshaw, Sidney) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 02/03 5:05 PM
ORDER and NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2016 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml) Modified on 2/3/2016 (jml, ) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 02/01 4:46 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue filed by Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc. . (Stockwell, Mitchell) |
|
Tuesday, January 26, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 01/26 1:36 PM
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2016 01:30 PM before the Honorable Rodney Gilstrap and the Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/26/2016. (nkl, ) |
|
Monday, January 25, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 01/25 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc. (Capshaw, Sidney) |
|
Friday, January 22, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 01/22 2:45 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue filed by Qualicaps Co., Ltd., Warner Chilcott (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC .(Jones, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, January 04, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 01/04 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mitchell G Stockwell on behalf of Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc. (Stockwell, Mitchell) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 01/04 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan David Olinger on behalf of Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc. (Olinger, Jonathan) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 01/04 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Clay Holloway on behalf of Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc. (Holloway, David) |
|
Tuesday, December 29, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 12/29 2:53 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue Responses due by 1/22/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/28/2015. (nkl, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 12/22 10:16 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue by Qualicaps Co., Ltd., Warner Chilcott (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC.(Jones, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, December 16, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 12/16 9:48 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Abbott Laboratories, Corporate Parent Mylan Inc., Corporate Parent Mylan N.V. for Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Corporate Parent Abbott Laboratories, Corporate Parent Mylan N.V. for Mylan, Inc.. (Cook, Jason) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss
Wed 12/16 9:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue by Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc..(Cook, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Thomas W. Jenkins, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Rajeev Mukundan, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Frank Mullery, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, December 02, 2015 | ||
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Wed 12/02 11:24 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Mylan, Inc. to 12/16/2015; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to 12/16/2015; Mylan Laboratories Limited to 12/16/2015. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) |
||
Tuesday, December 01, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 12/01 6:18 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc..( Cook, Jason) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 11/12 3:41 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/12/2015. (ch, ) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 11/12 3:40 PM
Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Thu 11/12 3:41 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, ) |
||
Monday, November 09, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 11/09 4:39 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc..(nkl, ) |
|
Att: 1 Summons(es) Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc | ||
4 | 4
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 11/09 3:27 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Qualicaps Co., Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Mitsubishi Chemical Holdings Corporation for Qualicaps Co., Ltd.. (Jones, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 11/09 3:26 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Warner Chilcott (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Warner Chilcott Corporation for Warner Chilcott (US), LLC; Corporate Parent WC Pharmaceuticals I Limited, Corporate Parent Actavis Puerto Rico Holdings Inc. for Warner Chilcott Company, LLC. (Jones, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Mon 11/09 3:24 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Jones, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/09 3:23 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5475474.), filed by Warner Chilcott (US), LLC, Qualicaps Co., Ltd., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC.(Jones, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Prescribing information, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - US6649180B1, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |